Visser v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico
Plaintiff: Mitchell Visser
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico
Case Number: 2:2024cv00021
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Mitchell Visser re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Mitchell Visser (Crow, B.J.)
March 6, 2024 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Mitchell Visser. (Crow, B.J.)
February 21, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Return, #2 Exhibit 2: Complaint) (Gooch, Christina)
February 13, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico (Gooch, Christina)
February 13, 2024 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico. (Gooch, Christina)
February 7, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand by Mitchell Visser. (Crow, B.J.)
February 7, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 16 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico, 17 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Mitchell Visser. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cfa)
February 6, 2024 Filing 17 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Mitchell Visser voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Crow, B.J.)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 1, 2024 Filing 16 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Gooch, Christina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 30, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mitchell Visser. (Crow, B.J.)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DEFER THE ISSUANCE OF A SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (es)
January 16, 2024 Filing 13 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gooch, Christina)
January 16, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico (Gooch, Christina)
January 16, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Because a dispositive motion has been filed in this case, the parties are reminded, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as the trial judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by 2/6/2024 . The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (mjm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 16, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico. (Gooch, Christina)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 1003925 (da)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico Noitice of Good Standing - Wyrick (Gooch, Christina)
January 9, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico Notice of Good Standing - Deegan (Gooch, Christina)
January 9, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico Noitice of Good Standing - M. Bishop (Gooch, Christina)
January 9, 2024 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico by Christina Muscarella Gooch on behalf of: Dianna C. Wyrick Reed Smith 10 South Wacker Drive, 40th FloorChicago, IL 60606-7507 312-207-1000 Fax 312-207-6400 mbishop@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Gooch, Christina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 9, 2024 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico by Christina Muscarella Gooch on behalf of: Robert C. Deegan Reed Smith 10 South Wacker Drive, 40th FloorChicago, IL 60606-7507 312-207-1000 Fax 312-207-6400 mbishop@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Gooch, Christina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico by Christina Muscarella Gooch on behalf of: Martin J. Bishop Reed Smith 10 South Wacker Drive, 40th FloorChicago, IL 60606-7507 312-207-1000 Fax 312-207-6400 mbishop@reedsmith.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Gooch, Christina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 8, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2023-09135. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gooch, Christina)
January 8, 2024 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
January 8, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and Chief United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Visser v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Visser
Represented By: B.J. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Mexico
Represented By: Christina Muscarella Gooch
Represented By: Dianna C. Wyrick
Represented By: Martin J. Bishop
Represented By: Robert C. Deegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?