Spilsbury v. Demchok et al
Plaintiff: Lindsay Spilsbury
Defendant: Vera Demchok and Carice Demchok
Case Number: 2:2024cv00404
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (bap)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez DISMISSING #1 Complaint without prejudice. (bap)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order United States District Judge Martha Vazquez assigned. (bc)
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Notice (Other). Mail sent to Lindsay Spilsbury (ac)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VERIFIED MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Lindsay Spilsbury (nr)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and DIRECTING Plaintiff to Show Cause. Plaintiff shall show cause why the Court should not dismiss this case and file an amended complaint within 21 days of entry of this Order. Failure to timely comply may result in dismissal. (ama)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (nr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CME/ECF PRO SE NOTIFICATION by Lindsay Spilsbury (nr)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lindsay Spilsbury. (nr)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carice Demchok, Vera Demchok, filed by Lindsay Spilsbury. (nr)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spilsbury v. Demchok et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Spilsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera Demchok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carice Demchok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?