Sago v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Sago
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2024cv00491
Filed: May 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Matthew L Garcia
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by August 20, 2024. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for August 28, 2024 at 09:30 AM. (atc)
May 24, 2024 Filing 7 Wal-Mart Stores East, LP's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Hernandez, Daniel)
May 22, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
May 20, 2024 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Matthew L. Garcia as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Isaiah Kane on behalf of Anthony Sago (Kane, Samuel)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 20, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (dr)
May 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Twelfth Judicial District Court, case number D-1215-CV-2024-00244. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Demand, #5 Exhibit Corporate Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hernandez, Daniel)
May 18, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number BNMDC-9364637 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sago v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Daniel H Hernandez, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sago
Represented By: Samuel Isaiah Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?