-JO Jacob Friedman, Estelle Sapir and Miriam Stern, on Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated v. Union Bank of Switzerland, et al. (See Doc. No. 897)
Plaintiff: Jacob Friedman and Gizella Weisshaus
Defendant: Bank of Internationa, Banking Institutions # 1 - 100, Certain Swiss Bank Accounts described as follows: All accounts and funds maintained at Credit Suisse, or any other financial institutions in Switzerland held in the name or for the benefit of, David Schaecter, Leo Rechter, David Mermelstein, Alex Moskovic, Fred Taucher, Israel Arbeiter, Henry and Anita Schuster, Lea Weems, Herbert Karliner, Sam Gasson, Esther Widman, GK, FK, LK, DB, and JR, John Does # 1 - 100, Swiss Bank Corp., Swiss Bankers Assoc and Union Bank of Switzerland
:
Interested Party: Michael Bradfield, Claims Resolution Tribunal, Judith Cole, Dr. Wesley Fisher, Helen B Junz, Moshe Katz, Karl Lange, NYLAG, Burt Neuborne, Richard Pavlovec, Pink Triangle Coalition, Plaintiff's Executive Committee Settlement Class Counsel, Pierre Seel, Lubov Starodinskaya 27007, State of Israel, Deborah Sturman, Washington State Insurance Commissioner and Richard Weisberg
Movant: Susan E. Brune, Director of International Affairs and Representative to the United Nations of Agudath Israel World Organization, Disability Rights Advocates, David Haaker, Lawrence Haaker, Lisa Haaker, Suzanne Haaker, Polish American Defense Committee, Inc. and Irving Wolf
In Re: Holocaust Victim Assets
Claimant: Josef Kohn
See Doc. No. 897: Estelle Sapir and Miriam Stern
Intervenor Plaintiff: South Florida Holocaust Survivors Coalition, The World Jewish Restitution Organization and M.D. Thomas Weiss
Case Number: 1:1996cv04849
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Edward R. Korman
Presiding Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4966 ORDER denying 4893 motion to alter judgment and denying request for a stay. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 5/30/2014. (Taffet, Eric)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4892 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER AUTHORIZING APPROVAL OF FUNDS TO PAY CLAIMANT HANA PRUMMEROVA. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 6/4/2013. (Greene, Donna)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4836 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving Set 207: 1 Award Denial Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 8/22/2012. (Greene, Donna)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4822 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving Set 27: One Amendment to a Certified Adjustment Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process and Authorizing Payment from the Settlement Fund. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 4/16/2012. (Greene, Donna)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4817 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, it is impossible to conclude that the issues raised on appeal constitute a plausible suggestion of error. The appeal is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 3/15/2012. (Greene, Donna)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4810 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER directing the Clerk to open a file with respect to the appeal of the claimants from the certified denial on their claim to the accounts of Paul Wittgenstein etal. All previous filings with respect to this issue (Docket Nos. 4792, 4793, and 4794) will be duplicated in this file and any subsequent filings should be docketed under this docket number. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 1/23/12. (Greene, Donna)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4804 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, in accordance with the order of 12/8/00 and consistent with the terms of the Plan of Allocation and Distribution of Settlement Proceeds which were approved on 11/22/00, Memorandum and Order dated 9/25/02 and Memorandum and Order dated 11/17/03, the American Jewish Joint Distribution Committee has submitted its report on 2010 Welfare Programs for Jewish Nazi Victims in the Former Soviet Union. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 12/28/2011. (Greene, Donna)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4785 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER APPROVING THE AMENDED DECISION ON APEAL: IN RE ACCOUNT OF RUDOLF FRIEDL. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 12/1/2011. (Greene, Donna)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4781 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the recommendations set forth in the 10 November 2011 letter concerning the Arthur Freund Appeal are adopted in their entirety and the Appeal is hereby closed.. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/16/2011. ** See Order for more details ** (Greene, Donna)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4768 MEMORANDUM & ORDER Approving the Decision on Appeal: In Re Accounts of the Estate of Sophie Cohen, and Accounts of Alexander Oppler, Berthold Oppler, and Sigmund Oppler. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/9/2011. (Chee, Alvin)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4765 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving Set 204: 1 Award Denial Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 10/24/2011. (Greene, Donna)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4764 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving CRT Set 24: 1 Summary Denial to an Appeal as Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 30 of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 10/19/2011. (Greene, Donna)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4763 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER approving seven decisions on appeal: In Re Accounts of Alred Benesch, Else Benesch and Josef Benes; In Re Accounts of Leopold Herzog, Zdenka Herzog and Margarete Tedesko; In Re Account of Leiba Kochas; In Re Account of Lilein Lei nwand Unternemhung Bernhard Goldstein; In Re Account of Elsa and Emil Menyasz; In Re Accounts of Wilhelm Pappenheim; and In Re Accounts of Dr. Felix Pollak and Account of Elsa Pollak. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 10/17/2011. (Greene, Donna)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4760 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dated 10/11/11 Approving CRT Set 23:2 summary denials to appeals as certified by the claims resolution tribunal pursuant to Article 30 of the rules governing the claims resolution process. ORDERED that the 2 Appeals to the clai ms listed in Annex A shall be summarily denied and the relevant Appellants so informed; It is further ordered that the CRT shall provide the Court with the name and address of every Appellant whose appeal is herewith summarily denied, which information shall be filed with the Court under seal.( Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 10/11/2011 ) Associated Cases: 1:96-cv-04849-ERK-JO, 1:96-cv-05161-ERK-MDG, 1:97-cv-00461-ERK-MDG (Guzzi, Roseann)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4741 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving 1 Administrative Revision of an Award Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2)of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 8/10/2011. (Greene, Donna)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4718 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving 1 Administrative Revision of an Award Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 7/29/2011. (Greene, Donna)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4712 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving CRT Set 21:1 Summary Denial to an appeal as Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 30 of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 6/15/2011. (Greene, Donna)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4711 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving Set 20: 2 Awards, 1 Award Amendment upon request for reconsideration, 1 Award Denial, 1 Award Denial upon Appeal and Request for reconsideration, and 1 Letter closing claims certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process and Authorizing Payment from the settlement fund. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 6/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Batch CCI) (Greene, Donna)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4702 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving Set 21: 9 Adjustments Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process and Authorizing Payment from the Settlement Fund (This is Doc. No. 104 filed in 09 CV 160 on 5/26/11). Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 3/26/2011. (Greene, Donna)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4679 MEMORANDUM & ORDER Approving CRT Set 20: 4 Summary Denials to Appeals as Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 30 of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 4/29/2011. (Chee, Alvin)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4675 MEMORANDUM & ORDER Approving Eighteenth Set of Plausible Undocumented Awards and Corresponding Plausible Undocumented Award Increases Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal (Swiss Deposited Assets Program) Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process and Authorizing Payment from the Settlement Fund. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 4/15/2011. (Chee, Alvin)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4665 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the basis for the denial of Appellantt's appeal, as explained in Special Master Bradfield's letter to Mr. Roth of January 25, 2011, is confirmed. Ordered that the Appellant's Plausible Undocumented Award be processed and submitted to this Court for approval and subsequent payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 3/22/2011. (Greene, Donna)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4656 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving Set 20: 29 Adjustments Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process and Authorizing payment form the Settlement Fund. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 2/25/2011. Associated Cases: 1:96-cv-04849-ERK -JO, 1:09-cv-00160-ERK (Greene, Donna)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4644 Memorandum & Order Article Approving Set 18: 100 Adjustments Certified by the Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process and Authorizing Payment from the Settlement Fund. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 2/2/2011. (Marziliano, August)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4628 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving CRT Set 17: 75 Summary Denials to Appeals as Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 30 of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/10/10. (Attachments: # 1 CRT Batch 17) (Greene, Donna)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4589 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Ordering the Production of Information and Documents in In Re Accounts of Fanny Hatvany. (This is Doc. No. 79 filed in 09 cv 160 on 11/8/10). Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/5/2010. (Greene, Donna)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4587 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving Set 10: 87 Adjustments Certified By the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process and Authorizing Payment from the Settlement Fund. (This is Doc. #77 filed in 09 CV 160). Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 10/29/10. (Greene, Donna)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4568 MEMORANDUM & ORDER filed under 09-cv-3215: Mr. Fagan's motion for recusal is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 9/29/2010. (Chee, Alvin)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4564 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER APPROVING SET 198: 2 AWARDS, 2 AWARDS UPON REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION, 17 AWARD DENIALS AND 11 AWARD DENIALS UPON REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION CERTIFIED BY THE CLAIMS RESOLUTION TRIBUNAL PURSUANT TO ARTICLE 31(2) OF THE RULES GOVERNING THE CLAIMS RESOLUTION PROCESS AND AUTHORIZING PAYMENT FROM THE SETTLEMENT FUND. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 9/17/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Batch CXCVIII) (Greene, Donna)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4538 MEMORANDUM & ORDER filed in 10-cv-4346 (ERK): On a number of occasions I have directed the Clerk of the Court to give a particular matter in the Holocaust Victim Asset Litigation a separate docket number- a purely administrative mechanism that keeps all of the filings relating to the matter in one discrete file and that facilitates my ability to keep track of materials as they are filed. I am directing the Clerk to open such a file with respect to the consideration of the letter motion of Jeffre y P. Salinger and Dennis Salinger docketed on 8/18/10. All previous filings with respect to this issue (DE 4526, order dated 7/19/10, DE 4537) will be duplicated in this file (10-cv-4346) and any subsequent filings should be docketed under this number. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 9/23/2010. (Chee, Alvin)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4536 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving Set 4: 150 Adjustments Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing the Claims Resolution Process and Authorizing Payment from the Settlement Fund. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 7/23/2010. (This is Doc. No. 64, filed in 09 CV 160 on 7/28/10) (Greene, Donna)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4516 MEMORANDUM & ORDER TERMINATING APPEALS ININ RE ALFONS AND MARIA THORSCH. (This is Doc No. 32 filed in 09 CV 3785 on 3/8/10). Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 3/5/10. (Greene, Donna)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4500 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving the Decisions on Appeal: In Re Account of Adolf Maass and In Re Account of Felix Freund. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 5/31/2010. (Greene, Donna)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4474 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the signatories to the Settlement Fund are hereby directed to transfer immediately the sum of $6,732.614 to the JDC, which the JDC shall use for Hesed welfare program services for Jewish victims of Nazi persecution in the FSU for the period January 1, 2010 through December 31,2010 in accordance with the JDC letter of 2/4/10. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 2/8/2010. (Greene, Donna)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4457 MEMORANDUM & ORDER APPROVING SIXTY-SECOND SET OF 15 NO MATCHDECISIONS CERTIFIED BY THE CLAIMS RESOLUTION TRIBUNAL. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 1/2010. (Marziliano, August)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4449 MEMORANDUM & ORDER APPROVING SET 192: 11 AWARDS, 4 AWARD AMENDMENTS, AND 1 CORRECTED AWARD CERTIFIED BY THE CLAIMS RESOLUTION TRIBUNAL PURSUANT TO ARTICLE 31(2) OF THE RULES GOVERNING THE CLAIMS RESOLUTION PROCESS AND AUTHORIZINGPAYMENT FROM THE SETTLEMENT FUND. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 12/21/2009. (Marziliano, August)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4430 MEMORANDUM & ORDER APPROVING CRT SET 13:40 SUMMARY DENIALS TO APPEALS AS CERTIFIED BY THE CLAIMS RESOLUTION TRIBUNAL PURSUANT TO ARTICLE 30 OF THE RULES GOVERNING THE CLAIMS RESOLUTION PROCESS. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/23/2009. (Marziliano, August)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4419 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Authorizing approval of funds for the Awards-In Re account of Paul Roth and In Re accounts of Carl Fuchs. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/18/2009. (Greene, Donna)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4408 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving the Seventeenth Set of Inadmissibility Decision: 18 Inadmissibility Decisions Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 10/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Indmuissibility Decision - Set XVII - Annex A - Unredacted) (Greene, Donna)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4320 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving Set 187: 15 Award Denials Certified by The Claims Resolution Tribunal Pursuant to Article 31(2) of the Rules Governing The Claims Resolution Process. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 5/24/2009. (Greene, Donna)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4317 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See order for details). Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 4/9/2009. (Greene, Donna)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4298 Memorandum & Order Approving Set 9HBJ of Decisions on Appeal. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 5/11/2009. (Chee, Alvin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2009: # 1 Annex A) (Chee, Alvin).
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4289 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Approving Fifty-Fourth Set of 258 no Match Decisions Certified by the Claims Resolution Tribunal. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 2/27/09. (Greene, Donna)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4258 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Claims Conference transfer funds to the heirs of the three deceased Holocaust survivors eligible for Slave Labor Class I as described in the Thirty Third Claims Conference Report. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 1/29/09. (Greene, Donna)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: -JO Jacob Friedman, Estelle Sapir and Miriam Stern, on Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated v. Union Bank of Switzerland, et al. (See Doc. No. 897)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By: Roza Yentus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Internationa
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banking Institutions # 1 - 100
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Swiss Bank Accounts described as follows: All accounts and funds maintained at Credit Suisse, or any other financial institutions in Switzerland held in the name or for the benefit of
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schaecter, Leo Rechter, David Mermelstein, Alex Moskovic, Fred Taucher, Israel Arbeiter, Henry and Anita Schuster, Lea Weems, Herbert Karliner, Sam Gasson, Esther Widman, GK, FK, LK, DB, and JR
Represented By: Samuel J. Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does # 1 - 100
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiss Bank Corp.
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiss Bankers Assoc
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Bank of Switzerland
Represented By: Juanita A. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Bradfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Claims Resolution Tribunal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Judith Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Dr. Wesley Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Helen B Junz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Moshe Katz
Represented By: Marc D. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Karl Lange
Represented By: Irina Dragulev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NYLAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Burt Neuborne
Represented By: Samuel Issacharoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Richard Pavlovec
Represented By: Yisroel Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pink Triangle Coalition
Represented By: Irina Dragulev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Plaintiff's Executive Committee Settlement Class Counsel
Represented By: Nicholas E Chimicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pierre Seel
Represented By: Irina Dragulev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lubov Starodinskaya 27007
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Deborah Sturman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Washington State Insurance Commissioner
Represented By: Paul N. McCloskey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Richard Weisberg
Represented By: Richard H. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Susan E. Brune
Represented By: Nina M. Beattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Director of International Affairs and Representative to the United Nations of Agudath Israel World Organization
Represented By: Harry Reicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Disability Rights Advocates
Represented By: Sid Wolinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: David Haaker
Represented By: Scott Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Lawrence Haaker
Represented By: Scott Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Lisa Haaker
Represented By: Scott Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Suzanne Haaker
Represented By: Scott Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Polish American Defense Committee, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Irving Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Friedman
Represented By: Richard D. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gizella Weisshaus
Represented By: Burt Neuborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Holocaust Victim Assets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Josef Kohn
Represented By: Richard D. Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
See doc. no. 897: Estelle Sapir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
See doc. no. 897: Miriam Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: South Florida Holocaust Survivors Coalition
Represented By: Samuel J. Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: The World Jewish Restitution Organization
Represented By: Stanley M. Chesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: M.D. Thomas Weiss
Represented By: Samuel J. Dubbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?