Federal National Mortgage Association v. Olympia Mortgage Corporation et al
Case Number: 1:2004cv04971
Filed: November 6, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Nina Gershon
Presiding Judge: Marilyn D. Go
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 900 OPINION AND ORDER: On the basis of the evidence submitted and for the reasons set forth above, Olympia's motion for the entry of default judgment is granted. The crossclaims asserted against Avruhum Donner are hereby severed, and the Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment, on default, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54, as follows (see order for details). Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 6/6/2014. (fwd for judgment) (Fernandez, Erica)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 800 OPINION & ORDER re 762 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted to Fannie Mae on its constructive fraud claim against Samuel Pinter in the amount of $853,790.34. Fannie Mae asks the court to award interest starting o n July 1, 2000, the date halfway between the first and last fraudulent transfer. The court finds July 1, 2000 to be a reasonable intermediate date on which to begin calculating interest on the transfers from which Sam benefitted. So Ordered by Judge Nina Gershon on 10/22/2012. (Lee, Tiffeny)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 645 Motion for Summary Judgment: Summary judgment is granted in favor of Olympia, and against Abe Donner, in the amount of $498,575.15, for Abe Donner's breach of fiduciary duty, for transfers from Olympia to the Donner Relatives. In addition, pursuant to Rule 56(g) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, I find that Olympia was insolvent at least since December 31, 1997, and possibly for its entire existence. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference, pursuant to Rule 56(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, it appears that summary judgment is warranted in favor of Olympia on Sections 273 ad 276 of New York Debtor and Creditor Law for $498,575.15. Pursu ant to Rule 56(f), I hereby give Donner until Tuesday, December 27, to file papers in opposition to such a grant of summary judgment. See attached order for further details. So ordered. Ordered by Senior Judge Nina Gershon on 12/12/2011. (Chelst, Dina)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 629 OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, the Donner Relatives' motion for summary judgment is denied. Summary judgment is granted to Olympia on its crossclaims against the Donner Relatives on constructive and actual fraud pursuant to New York Debtor and Creditor Law § § 273 and 276.Olympia is awarded damages against the Donner Relatives in the following amounts, with interest from the specified dates: (1) Toby Donner: S1619.88, interest from July 31, 2004; (2) Nachema D onner: $171,743.41, interest from November 15, 2001; (3) Chaim Donner: $10,962.01, interest from November 15, 2000; (4) Perry Lerner: $65,384.89, interest from May 15, 2000; (5) Yocheved Donner: $136,755.41, interest from December 1, 2001; (6) Sarah Donner: $82,543.44, interest from November 15, 2000; and (7) Naftali Donner: $29,566.11, interest from September 15, 2003. Ordered by Senior Judge Nina Gershon on 6/15/2011. (Fernandez, Erica)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 628 OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, Olympia's motion for partial summary judgment is granted against the Entity Defendants on constructive fraud pursuant to New York Debtor and Creditor Law § 273. Olympia's motion to pi erce the corporate veil as to Samuel Pinter is also granted, and Olympia will be granted judgment against Samuel Pinter in the sum of $44.8 million. Olympia's request for entry of a partial final judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Nina Gershon on 6/7/2011. (Fernandez, Erica)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Olympia Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?