Fleurchem, Inc. v. British Airways et al
Case Number: 1:2006cv00706
Filed: February 17, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Carol B. Amon
Presiding Judge: Viktor V. Pohorelsky
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER in case 1:06-cv-00706-JG-VVP; granting 2080 Motion for Settlement; granting 2082 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 2083 Motion for Settlement; granting 2085 Motion for Settlement in case 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP.For the reasons stated i n the attached memorandum and order 2362 , I approve the proposed settlement, allocation plan, and incentives awards, and I grant the request for attorneys' fees. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 10/9/2015. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Garcia, Lynda)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Finding no merit to the objections, Judge Pohorelsky's thorough and well-reasoned Report and Recommendations (R & R) 2055 is adopted in its entirety. Please see the attached order 2282 certfying t he class and appointing class counsel; granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' motions 1838 and 1839 to preclude certain testimony; and denying plaintiffs' motion 1840 to preclude certain testimony. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 7/10/2015. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Garcia, Lynda)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1717 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 1719 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; granting 1720 Motion for Approval of Proposed Plan of Allocation: For the reasons stated in the attached Memoran dum and Order, the Court hereby grants Plaintiffs' counsel's 1719 motion for final approval of Plaintiffs' settlement agreements with (1) Lan Airlines, S.A., Lan Cargo, S.A., and Aerolinhas Brasileiras, S.A. (collectively, "Lan"); (2) British Airways plc ("British Airways"); (3) South African Airways Ltd. ("South African"); (4) Malaysia Airlines ("Malaysia"); (5) Saudia Arabian Airlines, Ltd. ("Saudia"); (6) Emirates Airline d/b/ a Emirates ("Emirates"); (7) El Al Israel Airlines Ltd. ("El Al"); (8) Air Canada and AC Cargo LP (collectively, "Air Canada"); and (9) Salvatore Sanfilippo. Final judgments of dismissal as to the settling defendants wil l be entered separately. The Court also grants Plaintiffs' counsel's 1720 motion for final approval of the plan of allocation. The Court grants counsel's 1717 request for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses to the extent set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 8/2/2012. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Talbott, Rebecca)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleurchem, Inc. v. British Airways et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?