Mikhlyn et al v. Bove et al Featured Case

Case Number: 1:2008cv03367
Filed: August 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Trademark Office
Presiding Judge: Ramon E. Reyes
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Sifton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1338 Trademark Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND CONSENT ORDER: This matter is hereby settled in accordance with the terms and conditions of the Stipulation of Settlement executed by the parties on March 28, 2012 (the "Stipulation of), which ishereby incorporated into this Consent Order, and a copy of which is annexed hereto as Exhibit A. This matter is hereby dismissed, with prejudice and without an award of fees or costs as to any party, except that the Court shall retain personal and subject matter jurisdiction of this matter for the purpose of enforcing the terms of this Consent Order and the terms of the Stipulation. Ordered by Senior Judge Allyne R. Ross on 4/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Lee, Tiffeny)
April 3, 2012 Filing 254 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND CONSENT ORDER by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mandel, Val)
March 21, 2012 Filing 253 Letter to Judge Reyes re: Settlement Status by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn (Mandel, Val)
February 10, 2012 Minute Order.for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Telephone Conference held on 2/10/2012. Appearances on record. Discussions held. 252 Motion for Extension of Time to File the finalize settlement agreement by March 16, 2012 is granted.(Tape #11:47:00 -11:5312 (N208).) (Vertus, Miriam)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re 252 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Mr. Berger shall initiate the call then contact chambers when all parties are on the line. Telephone Conference set for 2/10/2012 at 11:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/2/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
February 2, 2012 Notice regarding docket no. 252 Letter Requesting Extension by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov filed by(Berger, Jonathan) In the future, please adhere to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes' Individual Rules of Practice. II. Communications with Chambers: B. All letters to Magistrate Judge Reyes requesting Court intervention, including those sent pursuant to Local Civil Rules 37.1 and 37.3, or requesting an adjournment or extension of discovery deadlines, must be electronically filed under Motions and not Letter under Other Documents. (Vertus, Miriam)
February 2, 2012 Filing 252 Motion for Extension of Time to File:Letter requesting an extension of time to file the finalize settlement agreement by March 16, 2012 filed by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Berger, Jonathan) Modified on 2/2/2012 ADDED Motion for Extension of Time to File.(Vertus, Miriam).
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 251 Motion for Extension of Time to File final settlement agreement on or before Feb. 15,2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/5/2012. (Vertus, Miriam)
January 4, 2012 Filing 251 Letter Requesting an Extension to file settlement agreement on or before Feb. 15,2012 by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Berger, Jonathan)ADDED Motion for Extension of Time to File Modified on 1/5/2012 by(Vertus, Miriam).
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 250 : As the parties have reached a settlement in principle, all pending deadlines are adjourned. Parties shall have until 1/13/2012 to finalize settlement agreement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 11/14/2011. (Rivera, Marta)
November 14, 2011 Filing 250 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
October 19, 2011 Filing 249 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, "Return to Sender, Unclaimed-Unable to Forward." Copy of Order dated 9/22/11 previously sent to Ana Bove. (Galeano, Sonia)
October 13, 2011 Filing 248 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/7/11, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber TRANSCRIPTION PLUS II, Telephone number 718-987-4285. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2012. (Hong, Loan)
October 7, 2011 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Discovery Hearing held on 10/7/2011. Appearances on record. Discussions held. Granting in part and denying in part 241 Motion for Contempt; ranting 246 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal. Revised privilege log and production of non-privileged documents on 11/18/11. Tradeindicator to confer with plaintiff regarding supplemental responses by 10/14/11. Other rulings on record. ALL DISCOVERY TO BE COMPLETED BY 12/16/2011. NO FURTHER EXTENSION!!(Tape #10:10:43 -11:12:42.)(Vertus, Miriam)
October 3, 2011 Filing 247 Letter As to Service of DE 246 on Plaintiffs' Counsel by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
October 3, 2011 Filing 246 First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal the response by Pro Se Defendants containing Confidential Records by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Berger, Jonathan)
September 29, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 10/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., regarding 241 , plaintiffs' motion for contempt sanctions. (Reyes, Ramon)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER dated 9/26/11 that plaintiffs' 130 Motion for Sanctions is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants are ordered to pay monetary sanctions to plaintiffs' counsel in the amount of $42,034.08 within 30 days of this order. The Kogan Firm is ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $6,666.44 within 30 days of this order. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment is denied. Counsel for corporate defendant is ordered to serve a copy of this order on the Kogan Firm and pro se defendants. ( Ordered by Senior Judge Allyne R. Ross on 9/26/2011 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
September 23, 2011 Filing 244 RESPONSE to Motion re 241 First MOTION for Contempt by Corporate Defendants Only filed by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Berger, Jonathan)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 242 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 241 First MOTION for Contempt. Reply to Plaintiff's papers due 10/3/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/22/2011. (Rivera, Marta)
September 22, 2011 Filing 243 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/14/11, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber TRANSCRIPTION PLUS II, Telephone number 718-987-4285. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2011. (Hong, Loan)
September 21, 2011 Filing 242 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on behalf of Pro Se Defendants and Trade Indicator by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Berger, Jonathan)
September 19, 2011 Filing 241 First MOTION for Contempt by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Mandel, Val)
September 13, 2011 Filing 240 REPLY in Opposition re 238 Letter, filed by Boris Kogan. (Kogan, Boris)
September 8, 2011 Filing 239 Letter Regarding Service of DE 238 on Boris Kogan and Associates by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
September 8, 2011 Filing 238 Letter in response to Plaintiff's reply to Defendants' Objections by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Berger, Jonathan)
September 6, 2011 Filing 237 Letter Describing Service of Court Order Filed on 9/2/2011 by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 235 Motion for Leave to File by 9/8/2011. Counsel for corporate defendants ordered to serve a copy of this order on the Kogan Firm and pro se defendants and file proof of service. Ordered by Senior Judge Allyne R. Ross on 9/2/2011. (Tuttle, Gregory)
September 1, 2011 Filing 236 RESPONSE in Opposition re 235 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
September 1, 2011 Filing 235 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Berger, Jonathan)
August 31, 2011 Filing 234 DECLARATION re 230 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 233 Memorandum in Opposition, 231 Objection to Report and Recommendations by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn (Mandel, Val)
August 31, 2011 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 231 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
August 18, 2011 Filing 232 Letter Indicating Service on Boris Kogan and Associates the Objections filed on August 17, 2011 by Pro Se Defendants and Corporate Defendants by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
August 17, 2011 Filing 231 OBJECTION to 227 Report and Recommendations filed by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Berger, Jonathan)
August 17, 2011 Filing 230 OBJECTION to 227 Report and Recommendations Filed by Counsel on behalf of Pro Se Defendants filed by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 of Pro Se Defendants Objections, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 of Pro Se Defendants Objections) (Berger, Jonathan)
August 4, 2011 Filing 229 Letter Regarding Service of the D.E. 228 Discovery Order by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting in part 223 Motion for Discovery. Counsel for corporate defendants is directed to serve this Order on pro se defendants and file proof of service. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/4/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
August 3, 2011 Filing 227 SECOND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions, 191 and 193 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. A brief order re 223 Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery is forthcoming. Objections to R&R due by 8/17/2011. Counsel for corporate defendants ordered to serve a copy of the second R&R on the Kogan Firm and pro se defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/3/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
July 14, 2011 Minute Order for proceedings held on 7/14/2011 before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr: Appearances on record. Discussions held. 225 Motion for Sanctionsis denied without prejudice to renewal upon a showing from a qualified computer expert that there is some impropriety in the manner in which plaintiffs' quickbooks files (or other computer files) were maintained or produced. (Tape #4:03:15-4:28:36.) (Lee, Victoria)
July 14, 2011 Filing 226 Letter Filed by Pro Se Defendants for 4:00 pm Conference by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Berger, Jonathan)
July 13, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference re: 225 set for 7/14/2011 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Counsel for corporate defendants to initiate call to chambers once all parties are on the line (718-613-2120). (Lee, Victoria)
July 13, 2011 Filing 225 First MOTION for Sanctions by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 3, # 4 Exhibit Exh. 4) (Berger, Jonathan)
July 11, 2011 Filing 224 RESPONSE to Motion re 223 Third MOTION for Discovery filed by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Berger, Jonathan)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER re 223 Third MOTION for Discovery filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn. Per my individual practice rules (III.C), defendants ordered to respond by 7/11/2011. Response shall not exceed three (3) single-spaced pages. Any additional pages will not be considered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 7/7/2011. Corporate defendants' counsel is directed to serve individual defendants with a copy of this order. (Lee, Victoria)
July 7, 2011 Filing 223 Third MOTION for Discovery by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Mandel, Val)
June 27, 2011 Filing 222 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ana Bove, 2311 East 22nd Street, Apartment 1F, Brooklyn, NY 11229. Notation on return label: "Return to Sender. Unclaimed. Unable to Forward." (Manuel, Germaine)
June 20, 2011 Filing 221 Letter by Pro Se Defendants in response to Val Mandel Letter filed on 6/15/2011 by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Berger, Jonathan)
June 17, 2011 Filing 220 Letter Response to Reply by Boris Kogan and Associates LLC (D.E. 214) by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Tuvia Rotberg, # 2 Declaration Jonathan Berger) (Berger, Jonathan)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 219 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by 8/1/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 6/16/2011. (Rivera, Marta)
June 15, 2011 Filing 219 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER denying 218 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur Reply. Pro se defendants are not permitted to file another reply. However, to the extent that I find that the Kogan Firm's 5/27/2011 response raises or includes "new factual allegations," such new allegations raised for the first time therein will not be considered in the report & recommendation to Judge Ross. Counsel for the corporate defendants is directed to serve the individual defendants with this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 6/3/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
June 3, 2011 Filing 218 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Sur Reply by 6/17/2011. Letter from Pro Se Defendants to the Court f by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Berger, Jonathan) Modified on 6/3/2011 (Vertus, Miriam).
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 217 First MOTION for Leave to File Response by 6/17/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 6/2/2011. (Rivera, Marta)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER denying 215 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal. Defendants prohibited from filing any motion relative to the "Quick Books" issue, whether under seal or not, until after they satisfy their meet and confer obligations. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/2/2011. (Reyes, Ramon)
June 1, 2011 Filing 217 First MOTION for Leave to File Response by Levisohn Berger to Boris Kogan and Associates filing (DE 214) by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Berger, Jonathan)
June 1, 2011 Filing 216 RESPONSE to Motion re 215 First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
June 1, 2011 Filing 215 First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Berger, Jonathan)
May 27, 2011 Filing 214 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 189 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim MikhlynREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim MikhlynREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim MikhlynREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn, 210 First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal in Response to Opposition by Boris Kogan and Associates (Doc. No. 201)First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal in Response to Opposition by Boris Kogan and Associates (Doc. No. 201)First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal in Response to Opposition by Boris Kogan and Associates (Doc. No. 201), 201 Letter MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal, RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re 189 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim MikhlynREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim MikhlynREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim MikhlynREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn filed by Boris Kogan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-27-10 Email, # 2 Exhibit 5-7-10 Email, # 3 Exhibit 5-13-09 Letter, # 4 Exhibit 6-26-09 Letter Motion, # 5 Exhibit 8-14-09 Letter, # 6 Exhibit 11-2-09 Excerpt from Transcript, # 7 Exhibit List of Outstanding Discovery Owed by Plaintiffs, # 8 Exhibit BK&A Retainer Agreement, # 9 Exhibit 5-3-09 Letter, # 10 Exhibit 5-17-10 Email) (Kogan, Boris)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part 201 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 210 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal. Having considered the defendants arguments at the 4/29/11 telephone conference and in 211 as to why certain relevant documents should not be disclosed to plaintiffs or their counsel, and having reviewed unredacted versions of the documents in camera, the Court rules as follows: (1) Documents [201-9] and [201-15] shall remain sealed as they constitute attorney-client communications and they are not relevant to the discovery dispute at issue; (2) document [201-13] shall be produced in unredacted form as it is relevant, not privileged, and in any event the privilege was waived; (3) document [210-12] shall be produced to plaintiffs' counsel, "attorneys' eyes only"; and (4) documents [210-7], [210-8], [210-15], and [210-16] shall be produced as they are not attorney-client communications, and in any event the attorney-client privilege has been waived as previously held. The Court will prepare a set of the documents and have them delivered to plaintiffs' counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 5/18/2011. (Reyes, Ramon)
May 17, 2011 Filing 213 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 29, 2011, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber: Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number (203)929-9992. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2011. (Rocco, Christine)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 212 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Mr. Kogan's response to be filed by 5/27/11. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 5/11/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
May 11, 2011 Filing 212 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 210 First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal in Response to Opposition by Boris Kogan and Associates (Doc. No. 201)First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal in Response to Opposition by Boris Kogan and Associates (Doc. No. 201)First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal in Response to Opposition by Boris Kogan and Associates (Doc. No. 201) by Boris Kogan. (Kogan, Boris)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER re 211 Letter filed by Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Ana Bove. Defendants ordered to provide the Court with unredacted copies of the exhibits referenced in 211 Letter for in camera review. Defendants shall fax or mail these unredacted copies to the court by Friday, May 13, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 5/10/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
May 4, 2011 Filing 211 Letter Regarding Proposed Redactions for Documents Filed Under Seal in Doc. 210 Filing by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Berger, Jonathan)
April 28, 2011 Filing 210 First MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal in Response to Opposition by Boris Kogan and Associates (Doc. No. 201) by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Opposition Levisohn Berger LLP Memorandum, # 2 Memorandum in Opposition Pro Se Defendants Memorandum, # 3 Affidavit Sakirski affidavit, # 4 Affidavit Bove affidavit, # 5 Affidavit Dolginov affidavit, # 6 Exhibit exhibits to pro se defendants memorandum, # 7 Exhibit defendants memorandum) (Berger, Jonathan)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 209 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's reply due on April 28, 2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 4/25/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
April 25, 2011 Filing 209 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 201 Letter MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Berger, Jonathan)
April 18, 2011 Filing 208 Letter Filed As Per Court's Instructions for April 29, 2011 Conference by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Berger, Jonathan)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER re 207 Letter requesting clarification. The scheduled 4/29 telephone conference is to discuss defendants' position expressed in the 4/14 letter 206 that they be entitled to redaction of some documents filed by the Kogan firm and subject of the pending motion to seal. If defendants 4/14 letter did not fully express their position on the motion to seal 201 , they may file a supplemental letter by the original deadline 4/18. However, the "proposed redactions" should not be filed at this time. The court has copies of all the subject documents and can review them in camera to determine whether plaintiffs' stated grounds for redaction are appropriate and to what extent. Plaintiffs, defendants, and the Kogan firm should all participate in the conference since the underlying motion to seal will also be discussed. Defendants to initiate the call to chambers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 4/15/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
April 15, 2011 Filing 207 Letter Regarding Confusion with April 12, 2011 Order by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Berger, Jonathan)
April 14, 2011 Set Hearings: Telephone Conference re: defendants' letter 206 set for 4/29/2011 at 11:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Defendants to initiate call to chambers once all parties are on the line (718-613-2120). (Lee, Victoria)
April 14, 2011 Filing 206 Letter Requesting Instructions from Court as to Filing Proposed Redactions by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Berger, Jonathan)
April 12, 2011 Filing 205 REPLY in Opposition re 201 Letter MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
April 12, 2011 Filing 204 Letter by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov (Berger, Jonathan)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 203 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendants' reply due on or by April 25, 2011.Defendants' request that they be given until April 18, 2011 to respond to the Kogan Firm's request to seal documents is also granted. Additionally, in response to Plaintiffs' letter 202 , Boris Kogan's letter requesting to seal documents has been unsealed, though the attachments themselves remain sealed. Plaintiff's shall also have until April 18, 2011 to respond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 4/12/2011. (Lee, Victoria) Modified on 4/12/2011 (Vertus, Miriam).
April 11, 2011 Filing 203 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 201 Letter MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Berger, Jonathan)
April 11, 2011 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re 201 Letter MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mandel, Val)
April 8, 2011 Filing 201 Letter MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Document under Seal by Boris Kogan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Affirmation of Boris Kogan in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14) (Kogan, Boris)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 199 Motion for Extension of Time to File and 200 Response to Motion for Extension of time. Kogan Firm's time to file response to defendants' objections to R&R extended to 4/8/2011; Defendants' time to reply extended to 4/22/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 4/5/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
April 5, 2011 Filing 200 RESPONSE to Motion re 199 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration filed by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Berger, Jonathan)
April 5, 2011 Filing 199 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration by Boris Kogan. (Kogan, Boris)
March 18, 2011 Filing 198 DECLARATION re 194 Order,, of Eric Wertheim in Support of Award for Attorneys Fees and Costs by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mandel, Val)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 197 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Boris Kogan. Opposition to Defendants' motion for reconsideration due 4/5/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 3/17/2011. (Rivera, Marta)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 196 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Boris Kogan and Associates LLC submission by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. Responses due by 4/15/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 3/17/2011. (Rivera, Marta)
March 16, 2011 Filing 197 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File opposition to Defendants' motion for reconsideration by Boris Kogan. (Kogan, Boris)
March 16, 2011 Filing 196 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Boris Kogan and Associates LLC submission by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Berger, Jonathan)
March 4, 2011 Filing 195 Letter Confirming Service as Per D.N. 194 Order by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER re 191 Objection to Report and Recommendations, filed by Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Ana Bove. Counsel for the corporate defendants is directed to serve the attached order on the Kogan Firm and pro se defendants, and promptly file proof of service. At the same time, counsel for corporate defendants is directed to serve a copy of the individual defendants objections to the Report and Recommendation 191 on the Kogan Firm if not already served. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 3/4/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER dated 3/3/11 re defendant's 191 Objection to Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Reyes. The Court will construe defendants' 2/16/11 submission as a motion for reconsideration directed to Judge Reyes. Counsel for the corporate defendants is directed to serve the individual defendants with this order. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 3/3/2011 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
March 2, 2011 Filing 192 REPLY in Support re 191 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 189 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim MikhlynREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim MikhlynREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim MikhlynREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
February 17, 2011 Filing 191 OBJECTION to 189 Report and Recommendations filed by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Objections to Report and Recommendation, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit) (Berger, Jonathan)
February 7, 2011 Filing 190 Letter Regarding Service of Report and Recommendation (DE 189) by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER re: 189 Report & Recommendations re: Motion for Sanctions. Levisohn Berger Firm is directed to serve a copy of the R&R on Ana Bove and Polina Dolginov and file proof of service by Monday, 2/7/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/3/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
February 3, 2011 Filing 189 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn. I respectfully recommend that Plaintiffs motion for sanctions be granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, I recommend that Plaintiffs request for default judgment be denied, but that the Court instead award Plaintiffs costs as outlined above and reopen discovery for the limited purpose of completing party depositions, obtaining hard drive images for expert analysis, and for obtaining foreign financial recordsall done in a manner consistent with the discussions that took place at the January 4, 2011 hearing. I also recommend that Plaintiffs be awarded costs and fees associated with the motion for sanctions. Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 2/3/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying in part 130 Motion for Sanctions; denying 145 Motion for More Definite Statement. Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 1/31/2011. (Siegfried, Evan) Modified on 2/3/2011 (Siegfried, Evan)
January 26, 2011 Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/4/11, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number 203-929-9992. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2011. (Hong, Loan)
January 19, 2011 Filing 186 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 26, 2010, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number (203)929-9992. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/9/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2011. (Rocco, Christine)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 185 Motion to Stay. Plaintiffs' motion to stay additional discovery until Judge Ross rules on the Motion for Sanctions is granted. R&R on the motion for sanctions forthcoming, but discovery is stayed until such R&R is issued and Judge Ross rules on it. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 1/11/2011. (Lee, Victoria)
January 7, 2011 Filing 185 First MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Sanctions, Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,,,,, request that the Court issue a Report and Recommendation on the reopening of discovery, or on the plaintiffs Rule 37 motion, and hold discovery in abeyance until Plaintiffs have had a chance to raise the issue with Judge Ross by Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
January 6, 2011 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Berger on behalf of Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Berger, Jonathan)
January 4, 2011 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 1/4/2011.Appearances: Eric Wertheim, Esq & Daniel Akselrod for plaintiffs, Peter Berger Esq and Jonathan Berger, Esq for defendants Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.,and also present Alex Sakirski, a member of the corporations present with his son Eugene Sakirski. Pro Se defendant Ana Bove present, Pro Se defendant Polina Dolginov not present. Boris Kogan, Esq present as requested by the Court. Discussions held. Rulings made on the record re: 140 and part of 145 . Defendants' motion for an independent financial audit 145 is DENIED. Defendants' motion for removal of the attorneys only designation 140 , 145 is GRANTED, except that all customer information should be redacted.Recommendations made on the record re: part of 130 and part of 145 . For reasons stated on the record, I recommend that Defendants' motion to sever the IP claims from the financial counterclaims 145 be denied and that Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment against corporate defendants for lack of counsel 130 be denied. Parties have 14 days to make objections to these recommendations. Recommendation reserved on Plaintiff's motion for sanctions 130 . Parties ordered to submit computers to expert imaging process and supplement the record on or by Feb. 18, with reply due 1 week later. Defendants ordered to assist Plaintiffs in acquisition of financial records from foreign banks, with Plaintiffs paying any costs to obtain them. ( Contact the E.S.R Dept. @(718)613-2590 to order transcript)(Tape #2:05:24 - 4:07:35.) (Vertus, Miriam)
January 4, 2011 Filing 183 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (via Certified Mail w/Return Receipt) Executed upon Ana Bove, re: Electronic Order dated 12/3/10. Tracking #(s) 7010 0780 0000 8398 1406. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 28, 2010 Filing 182 REPLY in Opposition re 181 Letter filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
December 28, 2010 Filing 181 Letter by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
December 10, 2010 Filing 180 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (via Certified Mail w/Return Receipt) Executed upon Boris Kogan, Esq. re: Electronic Order dated 12/3/10. Tracking #(s) 7010 0780 0000 8398 1390. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 3, 2010 SET HEARING as to 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55. In-Person Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The Court will hear only those arguments concerning the defendants' alleged non-production and suppression of internet communications and financial records. The Kogan firm is ordered to appear at the hearing. The Kogan firm's appearance, however, is not in a representative capacity of the defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 12/3/2010. A copy of this order will be sent to the pro se defendants and the Kogan Firm via certified mail (# 7010 0780 000 8398 1390 and # 7010 0780 0000 8398 1406). (Lee, Victoria)
October 14, 2010 Filing 179 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (via Certified Mail w/Return Receipt) Executed upon pro se Ana Bove, re: Copy of the Court's 9/23/10 Electronic Order. Tracking # 7009 0820 0001 6196 3127. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
October 1, 2010 Filing 178 "Letter in Support of Mr. Berger's 176 entering the case as corporate attorney" filed by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginow and Alex Sakirski, dated 10/1/2010. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
October 1, 2010 Filing 177 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' 163 Opposition to Defendants' Three Motions; filed by Ana Bove, dated 10/1/2010. W/Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 3. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
September 30, 2010 Filing 176 Letter responding to Plaintiff's letter dated September 28, 2010 by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Peter)
September 28, 2010 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 171 Notice of Appearance, 173 Letter, 170 Notice of Appearance filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
September 28, 2010 Filing 174 Letter to the Clerk of the Court requesting to be removed from the ECF list by Mark S Mulholland (Mulholland, Mark)
September 27, 2010 Filing 173 Letter Supplementing the Notice of Appearance by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Peter)
September 24, 2010 Filing 172 Letter to be provided early next week regarding Notice of Appearance filed today by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Peter)
September 24, 2010 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter L. Berger on behalf of Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Berger, Peter)
September 24, 2010 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Berger on behalf of Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Berger, Jonathan)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER re 169 Letter from Ana Bove and Polina Dolginov requesting extension of date to reply to 163 plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition. Request is GRANTED. Defendants' reply, if any, is due 10/1/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 9/23/2010. C/M to pro se defendants. (Lee, Victoria)
September 22, 2010 Filing 169 Letter dated 9/22/10 from Ana Bove and Polina Dolginov to USMJ Reyes, requesting that Your Honor replace the following three days (Sept. 22, 23 and 24) for (Sept. 27,28 and Oct. 1), in observance of Sukkoth a Jewish holiday and allowing pro se defts to respond by Oct. 1, 2010. (Galeano, Sonia)
September 22, 2010 Filing 168 REPLY in Opposition re 167 Letter filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
September 21, 2010 Filing 167 Letter dated 9/21/10 from Ana Bove, Alex Sakirski and Polina Dolginov to USMJ Reyes, re: technical default against the corporations and intellectual property rights. (Galeano, Sonia)
September 17, 2010 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn re 161 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 162 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, 163 Memorandum in Opposition, 160 Reply in Support, 165 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 164 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, (Mandel, Val)
September 17, 2010 Filing 165 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 145 MOTION for More Definite Statement in Opposition of Defendants' Three Motions by Inga Mikhlyn filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
September 17, 2010 Filing 164 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 145 MOTION for More Definite Statement in Opposition of Defendants' Three Motions by Daniel Akselrod filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5) (Mandel, Val)
September 17, 2010 Filing 163 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 145 MOTION for More Definite Statement for Three Motions filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
September 17, 2010 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 of Daniel Akselrod filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14) (Mandel, Val)
September 17, 2010 Filing 161 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 of Inga Mikhlyn filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
September 17, 2010 Filing 160 REPLY in Support re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
September 15, 2010 Filing 159 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn re 156 Order, 158 Order, Order, (Mandel, Val)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying 146 motion to reconsider denial of appointed counsel, made in defendants' memorandum in opposition. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 9/15/2010. (Lee, Victoria)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER clarifying 156 order. Kogans Firm is to provide defendants all case documents and discovery materials except those marked Attorney Eyes Only. Mr. Kogan will retain those documents until directed otherwise by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 9/15/2010. (Lee, Victoria)
September 15, 2010 Filing 157 Letter for Clarification by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn (Mandel, Val)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER endorsed re 142 Letter dated 9/1/10 from pro se Ana Bove & Polina Dolginov. The application is GRANTED in part to the extent not already provided, the Kogan's Firm is to provide to defendants all "case documents" and discovery materials in an organized manner not later than 9/22/2010. (C/by chambers to Mr. Boris Kogan and pro se defendants). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 9/15/2010. (Rivera, Marta)
September 14, 2010 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn re 154 Order on Motion for Hearing (Mandel, Val)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying 150 Motion for Hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/14/2010. (Reyes, Ramon)
September 10, 2010 Filing 153 Letter dated 9/10/10 from defendants to Hon. Ramon E. Reyes in response to 151 plaintiffs' correspondence dated 9/9/10. (Manuel, Germaine)
September 10, 2010 Filing 152 Letter dated 9/10/10 from defendants to Hon. Ramon E. Reyes in response to 143 plaintiffs' Opposition to 134 defendants' Motion to defer ruling. Defendants reiterate their 150 request for a conference "to clarity the issue of corporate defendants." (Manuel, Germaine)
September 9, 2010 Filing 151 REPLY in Opposition re 150 Letter MOTION for Hearing filed filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
September 9, 2010 Filing 150 Letter MOTION for a Conference; filed by Ana Bove, Alex Sakirski and Polina Dolginov, dated 9/9/2010. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
September 7, 2010 Filing 144 Letter dated 9/7/10 from defendants to Hon. Ramon E. Reyes regarding a possible misunderstanding of procedure. If defendants must hire an attorney before the Court makes a decision, they respectfully request an additional 10 days. (Manuel, Germaine)
September 3, 2010 Filing 143 REPLY in Opposition re Order,, to Defendants' Motion to Defer Ruling on the Default of Corporate Defendants or for a 20 Day Extension to Obtain a Corporate Attorney filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
September 1, 2010 Filing 142 Letter dated 9/1/10 from pro se Ana Bove & Polina Dolginov to Judge Reyes Jr., requesting the Court's assistance in order to obtain defendants' "case documents" from their former attorney, Mr. Kogan. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
September 1, 2010 Filing 141 Letter dated 9/1/10 from pro se Ana Bove & Polina Dolginov to Judge Reyes Jr., in opposition to Plaintiffs' 130 "Motion for Sanctions and a Default Judgment," etc. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
September 1, 2010 Filing 140 Letter "MOTION to remove 'Attorney Eye Only' from PayPal" filed by Ana Bove, dated 9/1/2010. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 26, 2010 Filing 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn re Order,, Order, (Mandel, Val)
August 26, 2010 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, (Mandel, Val)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Plaintiffs to promptly serve copies of Docket Entries Nos. 124 & 125 (Orders denying Defendants' Motions to Appoint Counsel, dated 6/16/2010) on Defendants and file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 8/25/2010. (Gerecci, Melisa)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER re 135 Letter filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn. Plaintiffs' Response re 134 MOTION to defer ruling, or for a 20-day extension to find a corporate attorney due by 9/3/2010. Plaintiffs' Reply re 130 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 due by 9/17/2010. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' remaining motions, including the Motions to Remove Attorneys' Eyes Only Designation, for a Financial Audit, and to Divide the Case, due by 9/17/2010. Plaintiffs to promptly serve a copy of this order on Defendants and file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 8/25/2010. (Gerecci, Melisa)
August 25, 2010 Filing 137 Letter dated 8/25/10 from pro se Ana Bove & Polina Dolginov to Judge Reyes Jr., in opposition to plaintiffs' 8/24/10 request for an extension of time. (Re: doc.# 135 ) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 24, 2010 Filing 136 Letter dated 8/24/2010 from pro se Ana Bove & Polina Dolginov to Judge Reyes Jr., requesting the Court's further clarification of defendants' duties, etc. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 24, 2010 Filing 135 Letter re: Clarification of Briefing Schedule by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn (Mandel, Val)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part second 134 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 130 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55. Responses due by 9/3/2010. Replies due by 9/17/2010. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/17/2010. All subsequent papers to be filed on ECF when served. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS will be permitted for any reason whatsoever. Plaintiff to serve a copy of this order on defendants by mail on 8/23/10. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 8/23/2010. (Gerecci, Melisa)
August 19, 2010 Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time / "Motion to defer ruling, or for a 20-day extension to find a corporate attorney" filed by Ana Bove, Alex Sakirski, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's 130 motion for sanctions pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. to issue a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B). SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross, on 8/4/2010) C/mailed by Chambers. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 DECLARATION re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55, 131 Memorandum in Support by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34) (Mandel, Val)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM in Support re 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 and for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55 by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Ruel 37 Sanctions Motion. Responses due by 8/20/2010. Replies due by 9/3/2010. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/3/2010. Plaintiffs to file opening motion papers on ECF by 7/2/10. All subsequent papers to be filed on ECF when served. Plaintiff to serve a copy of this order on defendants by mail on 6/25/10. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/24/2010. (Reyes, Ramon)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Letter dated 6/22/10 from defendants Anna Bove and Polina Dolginov, in response to plaintiff's 128 letter dated 6/21/10. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE to Motion re 127 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mandel, Val)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment; filed by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, dated 6/21/10. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Letter dated 6/17/10 from defendants Anna Bove and Polina Dolginov informing the Court that they are in receipt of plaintiffs' opposition for appointing counsel, and will be submitting a response. They will send their "suggestions and reasoning regarding the briefing schedule for 'Rule 37 sanctions motion'" on Monday, June 21, 2010. (Manuel, Germaine)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying 111 Motion to Appoint Counsel. See attached order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 6/16/2010. (Gerecci, Melisa)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 110 Motion to Appoint Counsel. See attached order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 6/16/2010. (Gerecci, Melisa)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn re 122 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 121 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 120 Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mandel, Val)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 110 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed, 111 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Mandel, Val)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 110 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed, 111 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8) (Mandel, Val)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 110 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed, 111 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Letter dated 6/15/10 from Anna Bove and Polina Dolginov to Hon. Allyne R. Ross, enclosing defendants' correspondence to Hon. Ramon E. Reyes, for Your Honor's consideration. W/Attachments: # 1 Letter dated 6/8/10, # 2 Letter dated 5/28/10. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Letter dated 6/15/10 from Anna Bove and Polina Dolginov to Hon. Ramon E. Reyes, re: plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and a Default Judgment, and requesting the Court's assistance regarding this matter. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 117 Motion for Discovery. The "Attorneys Eyes Only" designation is stricken from only the financial records in the June 1 production. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 6/15/2010. (Gerecci, Melisa)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Second MOTION for Discovery Regarding "Attorneys Eye Only" Designation by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mandel, Val)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn of Motion Documents for Sanctions and a Default Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mandel, Val)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Letter in Response to Letter Dated 6/8/10 by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn (Mandel, Val)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Letter dated 6/8/10 from Anna Bove and Polina Dolginov to Hon. Ramon E. Reyes requesting that attorney Boris Kogan "would properly finish the discovery process" and "that the decision regarding corporations would be made only after the trial." They also ask Magistrate Judge Reyes to mediate between the plaintiffs and them. (Manuel, Germaine)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER of REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's anticipated motion pursuant to Rule 37 is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. to issue a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B). SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross, on 6/4/2010) C/mailed by Chambers. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Letter Regarding Intention to Oppose Motion by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn (Mandel, Val)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Polina Dolginov. (Manuel, Germaine)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ana Bove. (Manuel, Germaine)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER ENDORSED re 108 Reply in Opposition filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn. Rule 37 motion must be filed by 6/11/2010. Plaintiffs' counsel directed to segregate all material marked "Attorney-Client Privilege" and return it to Defendants' former counsel within seven (7) days of the date hereof. Plaintiffs' counsel may not copy or otherwise use or disclose the contents of said material. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 6/2/2010. (Gerecci, Melisa)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPLY in Opposition re 107 Jury Demand and Request for Clarification filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, w/request for a stay of "any decision on pending sanctions motions against defendants," etc.; filed by pro se Ana Bove & Polina Dolginov, dated 5/28/2010. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 106 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan Todd Berger terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 5/25/2010. (Reyes, Ramon)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney made by Levisohn Berger, LLP by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Berger, Jonathan)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 11, 2010, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2010. (Rocco, Christine)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Interim Pretrial Conference held on 5/11/2010. Eric Wertheim, Esq for plaintiffs, David Binson, Esq for defendants. Granting 102 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.Attorney Boris Kogan terminated; Orders entered on the record. Transcript of conference ordered to be produced and sent to defendants. Defendants' Boris Kogan counsel must provide all outstanding discovery documents to plaintiff due by 5/26/2010; Defendants' Anna Bove and Polina Dolginov new counsel must file a notice of appearance on ECF no later than 5/28/10; Plaintiffs' Rule 37 motion due by 6/4/2010. (Contact the ESR Dept.@(718)613-2590 to order transcript(Tape #11:07:37 - 11:35:46.) (Vertus, Miriam)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Letter Supplementing Withdrawal Request made by Boris Kogan and Associates by Anna Bove Collections, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE to Motion re 102 Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney By Boris Kogan filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order CORRECTION: ORDER re 102 Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney By Boris Kogan. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL ordered to respond by filing a letter on ECF by Monday, 5/10/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 5/7/2010. (Gerecci, Melisa)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER re 102 Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney By Boris Kogan. Defendant ordered to respond by filing a letter on ECF by 5/12/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 5/6/2010. (Gerecci, Melisa)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney By Boris Kogan by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Kogan, Boris)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings:The 3/15/2010 Final Pretrial Conference is adjourned to 5/11/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom N2E before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. (Vertus, Miriam)
March 6, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Good cause having been shown, the discovery period is extended an additional 60 days. In light of the protracted nature of this case, however, NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE PERMITTED. The Court notes that this is the second such warning the Court has given. If the parties do not completely satisfy their respective discovery obligations by 5/7/10, the Court will entertain a motion for appropriate relief pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A). If appropriate, the Court will issue a report and recommendation to the assigned district judge recommending that the action be dismissed or a default judgment be entered against defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/6/2010. (Reyes, Ramon)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY in Opposition re 100 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Ana Bove. (Kogan, Boris)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Telephone Conference held on 1/26/2010; granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Eric Wertheim, Esq for plaintiffs, Boris Kogan, Esq for defendants both appearing by telephone. Discussions held. Discovery extended to 3/5/2010. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS. THE 3/4/2010 Final Pretrial Conference is adjourned to 3/15/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. (Tape #4:13:50-4:27:53.) (Vertus, Miriam)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER deferring ruling on 97 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Telephone conference set for 1/26/2010 at 4:00 pm, Plaintiff's counsel to initiate call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/25/2010. (Gerecci, Melisa)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re 97 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Letter Reply by Levisohn Berger to Plaintiff's letter filed today in response to Extension Request filed by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Berger, Jonathan)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE to Motion re 97 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Ana Bove. (Kogan, Boris)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/22/2009. (Vertus, Miriam)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/22/2009. All counsel present. Discussions held. Plaintiff's quick books file to be produced in native format. Interpreter issue discussed and resolved, privileged e-mail issue discussed and parties will attempt to resolve. Eugene Sakirski's identity as a shareholder of Trabeludicator is not "attorneys' eyes only", but is confidential under terms of confidentiality order.(Tape #not recorded at parties request.) (Vertus, Miriam)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Letter Joint Request for Informal Conference by Ana Bove (Kogan, Boris)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery until 1/29/2010. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. The 12/22/2009 conference remains as previously scheduled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/15/2009. (Vertus, Miriam)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - Joint Request by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: 92 First MOTION for Discovery in Support of Request to Keep Certain Documents "Attorneys Eyes Only" filed by Ana Bove, 91 First MOTION for Discovery Regarding "Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation of Certain Documents filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn. These documents are not motions; they are letters. (Abdallah, Fida)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Judge Allyne R. Ross added. Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton no longer assigned to case. (Davis, Kimberly)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Letter Joint Deposition Schedule by Ana Bove (Kogan, Boris)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 2, 2009, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2010. (Rocco, Christine)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: CORRECTION Status Conference set for MONDAY 11/2/2009, NOT 11/3/2009, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/28/2009. (Gerecci, Melisa)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re 92 First MOTION for Discovery in Support of Request to Keep Certain Documents "Attorneys Eyes Only" filed by Ana Bove, 91 First MOTION for Discovery Regarding "Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation of Certain Documents filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn Status Conference set for 11/3/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/28/2009. (Gerecci, Melisa)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 First MOTION for Discovery in Support of Request to Keep Certain Documents "Attorneys Eyes Only" by Ana Bove. (Kogan, Boris)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 First MOTION for Discovery Regarding "Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation of Certain Documents by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: 89 First MOTION for Discovery Regarding "Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn, 90 MOTION for Discovery Letter Brief In Support of Request to Keep Certain Documents "Attorneys Eyes Only" filed by Ana Bove. These documents are not motions; they are letters. (Abdallah, Fida)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Discovery Letter Brief In Support of Request to Keep Certain Documents "Attorneys Eyes Only" by Ana Bove. (Kogan, Boris)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 First MOTION for Discovery Regarding "Attorneys' Eyes Only" Designation by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Subpoena by Ana Bove. (Attachments: # 1 Subpoena 1, # 2 Subpoena 2, # 3 Subpoena 3, # 4 Subpoena 4, # 5 Subpoena 5, # 6 Subpoena 6, # 7 Subpoena 7) (Kogan, Boris)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Subpoena by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Supplement) (Mandel, Val)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/9/09, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber TRANSCRIPTION PLUS II, Telephone number 516-358-7352. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2009. (Hong, Loan)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Letter Requesting Clarifications by Ana Bove (Kogan, Boris)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 83 STIPULATION and Protective Order by ABC All Consulting, Inc. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/10/2009. (Vertus, Miriam)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION and Protective Order by ABC All Consulting, Inc. (Mandel, Val)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:taking under advisement 80 Motion for Discovery; Status conference/Motion Hearing held on 9/9/2009 re 80 MOTION for Discovery filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn. Appearances: Eric Wertheim, Esq for plaintiffs, Boris Kogan, Esq and David Binson, Esq for defendants. Discussions held. Rulings on the record. Protective order due on 9/11/09 before the close of business 5:00p.m.; Discovery conference set for 9/16/09 to be held before Judge Reyes in courtroom N2E or at an agreed location reached by the parties in order to exchange documents. Parties to submit subpoenas to Judge Reyes by 9/16/09; Letter briefs due by 9/25/09 regarding copyrights. All documents to be produced including written responses due on or before by 9/30/09. (Tape #2:13:21 - 3:45:41.) (Vertus, Miriam)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER re 82 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Vadim Mikhlyn. Discovery issues will be addressed at next Status Conference scheduled for 9/9/2009 at 2:00 P.M. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/17/2009. (Rivera, Marta)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re 80 MOTION for Discovery filed by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re 80 MOTION for Discovery filed by Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript, June 18, 2009 conference, p.65, # 2 Exhibit PLaintiff's Subpoena to Microsoft Corp., # 3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Subpoena to Yahoo, Inc.) (Kogan, Boris)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Discovery by ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn, Vadim Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to B. Kogan - 8-11-09) (Mandel, Val)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER denying 76 Motion for Bifurcation of Discovery. Bifurcation of discovery is inefficient and unnecessary in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/7/2009. (Reyes, Ramon)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Letter regarding Status of Settlement by Ana Bove, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Kogan, Boris)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re 76 Letter MOTION for Discovery Bifurcation filed by Vadim Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 18, 2009, before Judge Reyes. Court Transcriber Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number 203-929-9992. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/21/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2009. (Rocco, Christine)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Letter MOTION for Discovery Bifurcation by Ana Bove, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc.. (Kogan, Boris)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Minute Order Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/18/2009. Daniel Akselrod, and Eric Wertheim appearing for plaintiffs, Boris Kogan appearing for defendants. Discovery ruling on the record for 71 , 72 and 73 . Parties to purchase transcript. Defendant to submit a letter brief no more than five pages on post-2008 financial records by 6/26/09; Plaintiff to respond by 7/3/09.Further scheduled as follows: Status Conference set for 9/9/2009 @2:00 PM,and Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/22/2009 @10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Joint discovery report due on 8/28/09. Joint status report on settlement conference due 7/3/09.(Tape #10:40:20 - 11:56:51.) (Vertus, Miriam)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial/Discovery Conference set for 6/18/2009 @10:00 AM will be held in Courtroom N2E located in the North Wing on the 2nd floor before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. (Vertus, Miriam)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 74 Motion to Adjourn Conference. NO ADDITIONAL ADJOURNMENTS WILL BE GRANTED. Pre-trial conference rescheduled for 6/18/09 @ 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/3/2009. (Rodriguez, Adam)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Ana Bove, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Binson, David)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re 71 First MOTION for Discovery Conference filed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. (Mandel, Val)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion re 71 First MOTION for Discovery Conference filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Email dated March 13, 2009, # 2 Letters dated March 13, 2009, # 3 Letter dated April 17, 2009, # 4 Email dated March 18, 2009, # 5 Email dated April 1, 2009, # 6 Proposed Stipulation and Protective Order, # 7 Letter dated May 12, 2009) (Kogan, Boris)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 First MOTION for Discovery Conference by Vadim Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn. (Attachments: # 1 April 22, 2009 Letter, # 2 April 29, 2009 Letter, # 3 May 5, 2009 Letter) (Mandel, Val)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Due to a change in the Court's calendar the 5/20/09 Final Pretrial Conference is adjourned to 6/3/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. (Vertus, Miriam)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Amend Answer and Counterclaims. The motion to amend is granted to the extent defendants have obtained actual registrations for the copyrights at issue. The motion is denied without prejudice with respect to those applications which have been filed, but registrations have not yet been obtained. When those registrations are obtained, the Answer and Counterclaim will be deemed amended. Defendants are to so advise plaintiff upon registration of each copyright. The motion is denied with prejudice with respect to copyright applications that have not yet been submitted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/7/2009. (Reyes, Ramon)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Reply ANSWER to 62 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 63 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference REQUESTING RULING ON QUESTION REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. (Mandel, Val)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY in Opposition re 67 Memorandum in Support filed by all defendants. (Binson, David)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Support re 63 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference REQUESTING RULING ON QUESTION REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Vadim Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc., Inga Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Support re 63 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference REQUESTING RULING ON QUESTION REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER filed by all defendants. (Binson, David)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Terminated Scheduling Order re 3/19/09 Status Conference is adjourned sine die. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/11/2009. (Vertus, Miriam)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Telephone Conference held on 3/6/2009.Appearances: Eric Wertheim for plaintiff, Boris Kogan and Jonathan Berger for defendants. Discussions held. Discussions held. Simultaneous five page letters on issue of copyright counterclaim due on 3/13/09; responses due on 3/20/09. Defendants to respond to plaintiffs' document request by 3/27/09. Parties to meet and confer in attempt to resolve discovery disputes. If not resolved, parties may raise issues in writing. (Tape #3:02:09 - 3:40:00.) (Vertus, Miriam)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY in Support re 63 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference REQUESTING RULING ON QUESTION REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER filed by all defendants. (Kogan, Boris)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE re 55 Scheduling Order, due to a change in the Court's calendar the 3/19/2009 in person Status Conference will be held at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A-North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. (Vertus, Miriam)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER re Set/Reset Hearings: Parties may disregard the previous entry that rescheduled the telephone conference to an in person status conference. The previous entry was incorrectly entered. The 3/6/2009 telephone conference is still on. Defendant's counsel is to initiate the telephone conference at 3:00 PM. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/3/2009. (Rodriguez, Adam)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: The telephone conference previously scheduled for 3/6/2009 is hereby changed to an IN PERSON Status Conference for TOMORROW, 3/4/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. (Rodriguez, Adam)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE to Motion re 63 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference REQUESTING RULING ON QUESTION REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn. (Mandel, Val)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendant's counsel is to initiate the Telephone Conference set for 3/6/2009 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. to discuss doc.# 63 motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/27/2009.(Vertus, Miriam)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference REQUESTING RULING ON QUESTION REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc., Anna Bove Collections, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Letter) (Kogan, Boris)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Defendants' Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6) (Kogan, Boris)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Telephone Conference held on 1/27/2009. Appearances: Eric Wertheim for plaintiff, Boris Kogan for defendants. Discussions held. Mediation schedule for next week. Rule 26 and disclosures done. Written discovery is proceeding. Parties urged to resolve eBay issue promptly.(Tape #11:31:38 -11:36:06.) (Vertus, Miriam)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Wertheim on behalf of all plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Mandel, Val) Modified on 6/18/2009 (Vertus, Miriam).
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: At the request of the parties the telephone Conference previously scheduled for TODAY at 10:30 is ADJOURNED to 1/27/2009 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/16/2009. (Reyes, Ramon)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Letter Requesting Adjournment of Telephone Conference by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Binson, David)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SELECTION OF MEDIATOR (Binson, David)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Binson on behalf of all defendants (aty to be noticed) (Binson, David)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Mark S Mulholland rep by Mark S. Mulholland selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on Tuesday, February 3, 2009 from 10:30am to 4:00pm in the offices of the Mediator in Uniondale, NY.Report of Mediation due by 2/17/2009. (Lepp, Gerald)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Set/Reset of Hearing: Plaintiff's counsel will initiate the Telephone Conference set for 1/16/2009 TIME HAS BEEN CHANGED TO 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. (Vertus, Miriam)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS sent to Counsel. Letter of Instructions can be found on the ADR website "www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr", under Mediation, Mediation Documentation to Download (or follow the link: www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/Mediation__Documents/loi.pdf ). By 12/26/08, Counsel are to select a Mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and electronically file (ECF) and confirm in writing to the ADR Administrator, Gerald P. Lepp, the name of the mediator, and the date, time, and place of the first mediation session. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see "www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr". The Confidentiality Stipulation which can also be found on the ADR website is to be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediators, and sent by FAX (718) 613-2368 to the ADR Administrator. In accordance with Administrative Order 2004-08 (as of August 2, 2004) electronic filing became mandatory in the Eastern District of New York for all cases (pro se cases are excluded). (Luo, Xue)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Selection of Mediator due by 12/26/2008. The parties are urged to continue discovery; which will not be postponed due to mediation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/8/2008. (Vertus, Miriam)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STATUS REPORT - JOINT by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc. (Mandel, Val)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Boris Kogan on behalf of all defendants (aty to be noticed) (Kogan, Boris)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER:All discovery to be completed by May 18, 2009. In person Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2009 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., In person Status Conference set for 3/19/2009 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom A North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., plaintiff's counsel will initiate the Telephone Conference set for 1/16/2009 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/20/2008. (Vertus, Miriam) (Vertus, Miriam).
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/20/2008. Eric Wertheim,Esq. for plaintiff, Boris Kogan,Esq and David Binson, Esq. for defendants. Discussions held. Scheduling order entered. Parties urged to consider mediation. A Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2008 on mediation and the e-Bay issue. All counsels are directed to register for an ECF password and file a Notice of Appearance before the next scheduled conference.(ESR/Tape #2:37:50 -:3:24:41.) (Vertus, Miriam)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order ORDER re 54 Letter filed by Inga Mikhlyn. Request GRANTED. The TIME for the 11/20/2008 Initial Conference MOVED to 2:15 PM. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 11/18/2008. (Rivera, Marta)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Letter requesting adjournment by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc. (Mandel, Val)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re 49 Letter Request for Conference: The request for a conference is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking contempt if appropriate. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 11/7/2008. (Abdallah, Fida)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/20/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. See attached order for pre-conference requirements. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/12/2008. (Vertus, Miriam)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Letter by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Letter dated 10/27/08 from Daniel Akselrod to Judge Sifton's chambers, re Eric Wertheim, Esq. (Abdallah, Fida)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Letter Request for Conference by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc. (Mandel, Val)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Preliminary Injunction BOND in the amount of $ $5,000.00 posted by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc. (Mandel, Val)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER endorsed on 46 Letter request for extension to post a bond by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.: So Ordered. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 10/15/2008 at 3:10 p.m.. (Abdallah, Fida)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter request for extension to post a bond by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc. (Mandel, Val)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order that, pending the trial of this matter, defendants are enjoined from a) alleging that plaintiffs sales of designs from the ABC Sites are unlawful, and b) claiming exclusive ownership of and right to use the ABC and Anna Bove family of trademarks. Plaintiffs are directed to post a bond in the amount of $5,000. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 10/14/2008. (Sifton, Charles)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction and denying the motion of counterclaimants Ana Bove, Anna Bove Company and Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. for a preliminary injunction. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 10/14/2008. (Sifton, Charles)
October 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Counterclaim Defendants' ANSWER to 21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, 22 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, Counterclaim Defendants' ANSWER to 21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, 22 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. (Mandel, Val)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Letter Deadline to File Additional Papers by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Letter by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. re 39 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 38 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 37 Memorandum in Support (Berger, Jonathan)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 23 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Berger, Jonathan)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 23 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Berger, Jonathan)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re 23 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Berger, Jonathan)
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Letter by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc. (Mandel, Val)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 9/29/2008. (Abdallah, Fida)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Letter by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. (Berger, Jonathan)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 28 Reply in Support by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Berger, Jonathan)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton: Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2008. Case called. Pltffs' motion for a preliminary injunction argued. Dfts' motion for a preliminary injunction argued. Any additional papers are to be filed by 10/3/08. Decision reserved. (Court Reporter Marsha Diamond) (Abdallah, Fida)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc. re 28 Reply in Support, 30 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,, 29 Affidavit in Support of Motion, (Mandel, Val)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 23 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Vadim Mikhlyn, AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 23 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Vadim Mikhlyn filed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K) (Mandel, Val)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 23 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Inga Mikhlyn filed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J) (Mandel, Val)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY in Support re 23 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. (Mandel, Val)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. re 22 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Berger, Jonathan)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 23 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit) (Berger, Jonathan)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re 23 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (Berger, Jonathan)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER endorsed on letter dated 9/18/08, from Peter Berger to Judge Sifton, re scheduled appearance for 9/25/08: The motion will be heard at 4:30 p.m. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 9/18/2008. (Abdallah, Fida)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Berger, Jonathan)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint, First COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Berger, Jonathan)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint, First COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Notice of Motion, # 5 Memorandum in Support, # 6 Affidavit in Support, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Proposed Order, # 15 Affidavit of Service) (Berger, Jonathan)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. Anna Bove Company, LLC served on 8/20/2008, answer due 9/9/2008. (Mandel, Val)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. Anna Bove Collections, Inc. served on 8/20/2008, answer due 9/9/2008. (Mandel, Val)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. served on 8/20/2008, answer due 9/9/2008. (Mandel, Val)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vadim Mikhlyn. Ana Bove served on 8/20/2008, answer due 9/9/2008. (Mandel, Val)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter by Ana Bove (Berger, Jonathan)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Order for proceedings held before Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2008. Case called. Counsel for all parties present. Pltff's motion for a temporary restraining order is argued. Motion denied. (Court Reporter Marie Foley) (Abdallah, Fida)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Opposition Memorandum of Law, # 2 Affidavit in Opposition BoveAff, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits A to F - Bove Aff, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits G to K as part of Bove Aff, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits L to N as part of Bove Aff, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits O to P as part of Bove Aff, # 7 Affidavit Dolg Aff and Exhibits) (Berger, Jonathan)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mandel, Val)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. (Mandel, Val)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: The foregoing schedule is SO ORDERED without prejudice to Pltffs' application for a TRO pursuant to Rule 65(b) of the F.R. of Civ.P. on or before September 10, 2008 at 4PM when any such application will be heard. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 9/5/2008. (Abdallah, Fida)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Complaint/Preliminary Injunction filed by all plaintiffs. (Mandel, Val)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Complaint/Preliminary Injunction by Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Berger, Jonathan)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Todd Berger on behalf of all defendants (aty to be noticed) (Berger, Jonathan)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc. re 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Mandel, Val)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION re 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Vadim Mikhlyn by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M) (Mandel, Val)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION re 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Inga Mikhlyn by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Mandel, Val)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction) (Mandel, Val)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn. Polina Dolginov served on 8/26/2008, answer due 9/15/2008. (Mandel, Val)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ana Bove, Polina Dolginov, Anna Bove Company, LLC, Anna Bove Collections, Inc., Anna Bove Embroidery Supplies, Inc. $ 350, filed by Vadim Mikhlyn, Inga Mikhlyn, ABC All Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikhlyn et al v. Bove et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?