Dall v. Alomar Featured Case

Plaintiff: Ilya Dall
Defendant: Roberto Alomar
Case Number: 1:2009cv00514
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: Joan M. Azrack
Presiding Judge: David G. Trager
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2009 6 Letter dated 4/30/2009 from counsel Robert G. Sullivan to Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack RE: counsel informs MJ Azrack that the plaintiff withdraws the complaint in this matter. (Siegfried, Evan)
May 11, 2009 5 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Ordered by Senior Judge David G. Trager on 5/11/2009. (Siegfried, Evan)
April 1, 2009 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion to Adjourn Conference: At the request of the parties, the conference before Judge Azrack previously scheduled for April 15, 2009 at 11:30 AM is hereby adjourned to May 8, 2009 at 1:00 PM. Counsel are directed to confer and confirm that all participants are aware of the new date and time. Any requests for adjournment must be made via letter motion on ECF at least two days in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/1/2009. (Bhatt, Tina)
April 1, 2009 2 Letter To Judge J. Azrack Re: Ajournment of Conference by Roberto Alomar (Ratner, Daniel) Modified on 4/1/2009 (Bhatt, Tina).
February 10, 2009 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in Room 1210S, 225 Cadman Plaza East, before Magistrate Judge Azrack on 4/15/09, at 11:30 AM. All counsel must be present and are directed to review Judge Azrack's revised Individual Rules, which are available on the District Court's web site, prior to the conference. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Any request for an adjournment must be made in the form of a letter filed on ECF at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference and must indicate which parties consent to the adjournment. If this case becomes eligible for Arbitration, please contact Chambers at (718) 613-2530. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 2/10/2009. (Ketcham, Brian)
February 9, 2009 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roberto Alomar from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Queens County, case number 2276/09. ( Filing fee $ 350) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dall v. Alomar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilya Dall
Represented By: Anthony J. Piacentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Alomar
Represented By: Luke Pittoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?