Santiago v. Fischer et al
Plaintiff: Omar Santiago
Defendant: Brian Fischer, Anthony J. Annucci, Lucien J. Leclaire, Jr., Glenn S. Goord and John/Jane Does 1-50
Case Number: 1:2009cv01383
Filed: April 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Levy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. For the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court adopts Judge Tiscione's R&R in its entirety and grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion to amend the Complaint . Plaintiff may amend the Complaint to add Tracy as a defendant. The Court grants Plaintiff thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to amend the Complaint within thirty (30) days, the Court will dismiss the Complaint with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/29/2017. (McKenzie, Lindsay)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings. Plaintiff's claims for Defendants' imposition and enforcement of his unlawful post-release supervision term that pre-dated the Second Circuit's decision in Earley v. Murray, 451 F.3d 71 (2d Cir. 2 006), are dismissed as Defendants are entitled to qualified immunity as to those claims. The Court denies Defendants' motion as to Plaintiff's claims based on Defendants' post-Earley conduct. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/21/2016. (Rolle, Drew)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 5 Motion to Dismiss AND LIFTING STAY OF DISCOVERY - For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) is GRANTED as to the claims against all defendants in their official capacities, but DENIED as to claims against the defendants in their individual capacities. The 12(b)(6) motion is GRANTED as to plaintiff's state law false arrest claim in its ent irety. The 12(b)(6) motion is also GRANTED as to the §1983 claim with respect to Defendants LeClaire and Goord, who are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. The 12(b)(6) motion is DENIED, however, with respect to the §1983 claim again st the remaining defendants. The STAY OF DISCOVERY IS HEREBY LIFTED. The parties shall proceed with discovery under the supervision of the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge. SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/18/2009. (Irizarry, Dora)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago v. Fischer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Santiago
Represented By: Scott Evan Agulnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucien J. Leclaire, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn S. Goord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?