TD Bank, N.A. v. Coppolino et al
Plaintiff: TD Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Gina Marino, Terry S. Triades, Steven Coppolino, Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., New York Engines, Inc., J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Trinity Auto Corp., John Does #1-10, Terry Triades, Frances Triades and Sang Realty LLC
Cross Defendant: Susan Coppolino and Anthony Marino
Case Number: 1:2009cv03721
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: John Gleeson
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2010 Filing 49 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 10/25/10 that the unopposed Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge James Orenstein is adopted; that a default judgment is hereby entered in favor of plaintiff, TD Bank, N.A., awarding plaintiff a total of $345,452.77 against the four individual defendants, Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino and Gina Marino, it is further Ordered that plaintiff is awarded an additional $350.00 in costs jointly and severally against defendants, Anthony Marino and Gino Marino only; and Ordered that the defaulting defendants turn over to the plaintiff or the United States Marshals Service any non-exempt assets so that they may be applied to satisfy the State judgment; and Ordered that all remaining request for relief are denied. ( Ordered by Robert C. Heinemann, Clerk of Court on 10/25/2010 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS : Because no objections have been filed to Judge Orenstein's report and recommendation, #46 , and because I agree with his analysis and conclusions, the Clerk is respectfully directed to enter default judgment in favor of the plaintiff and to award the plaintiff a total of $345,452.77 (including unpaid principal of $266,961.09 on the State Judgment, $9,347.30 in unpaid prejudgment interest through October 22, 2010, and $69,144.38 in attorneys' fees) jointly and severally against the four individual defendants, and to award an additional $350 in costs jointly and severally against defendants Anthony Marino and Gino Marino only. The Clerk is further directed to order the defaulting defendants to turn over to the plaintiff or the United State Marshals Service any non-exempt assets so that they may be applied to satisfy the State Judgment, and to deny all remaining requests for relief. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 10/25/2010. (Horowitz, Hayley)
October 12, 2010 Filing 48 Letter from Jonathan M. Borg regarding filing of Certificate of Serivce by TD Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Report & Recommendation) (Borg, Jonathan)
October 12, 2010 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TD Bank, N.A. re #46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #36 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc. filed by TD Bank, N.A.REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #36 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc. filed by TD Bank, N.A.REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #36 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc. filed by TD Bank, N.A.REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #36 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc. filed by TD Bank, N.A.REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #36 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc. filed by TD Bank, N.A.REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #36 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc. filed by TD Bank, N.A. (Borg, Jonathan)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #36 Amended Motion for Default Judgment -- For the reasons set forth in the attached document, I respectfully recommend that the court grant the plaintiff's motion, enter a default judgment in favor of TD Bank, and award the Bank a total of $345,452.77 (including unpaid principal of $266,961.09 on the State Judgment, $9,347.30 in unpaid prejudgment interest through October 22, 2010; and $69,144.38 in attorneys' fees) jointly and severally against the four individual defendants; award an additional $350 in costs jointly and severally against defendants Anthony Marino and Gina Marino only; order the defaulting defendants to turn over to TD Bank or the United States Marshals Service any non-exempt assets so that they may be applied to satisfy the State Judgment; and deny all remaining requests for relief. I direct the plaintiff to serve a copy of this report and recommendation on the non-appearing defendants by certified mail, and to file proof of such service no later than October 7, 2010. Any objections to this report and recommendation must be filed no later than October 21, 2010. Failure to file objections within this period designating the particular issues to be reviewed waives the right to appeal the court's order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/30/2010. (Scott-Hayward, Christine)
August 25, 2010 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #44 Declaration, Certificate of Service by Jonathan Matthew Borg on behalf of TD Bank, N.A. (Borg, Jonathan)
August 25, 2010 Filing 44 DECLARATION re #36 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc., Order,,,,, by TD Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Legal invoices, #2 Exhibit 2 - Stipulated Order & Judgment) (Borg, Jonathan)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER re #37 Memorandum in Support,, filed by TD Bank, N.A. -- In lieu of live testimony, Mr. Borg shall submit an affidavit by August 25, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/12/2010. (Sussman, Dana)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER re #43 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by TD Bank, N.A. -- The telephone conference scheduled for June 11, 2010 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/9/2010. (Sussman, Dana)
May 26, 2010 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to defendants J&P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Trinity Auto Corp., Sang Realty LLC, Terry S. Triades, and Frances Triades by TD Bank, N.A. (Borg, Jonathan)
May 11, 2010 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Settlement Conference held on 5/11/2010. SCHEDULING: The next telephone conference will be held on June 11, 2010, at 12:30 p.m. THE FOLLOWING RULINGS WERE MADE: The appearing parties (including Mrs. Triades, whose husband represented that he had authority to agree on her behalf) resolved their differences and entered into a settlement agreement. If they submit a stipulation of dismissal as to the claims against the appearing defendants by June 9, 2010, I will cancel the conference scheduled above; otherwise I direct the plaintiff's counsel to initiate the telephone conference call. (Orenstein, James)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #41 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The application is granted on consent. The settlement conference previously scheduled for May 7, 2010 is rescheduled for May 11, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. No later than May 7, 2010, each party must submit by fax only (NOT by ECF) an ex parte statement of settlement position. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/4/2010. (Sussman, Dana)
May 3, 2010 Filing 41 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference due to unavailability of TD Bank representative on May 7, 2010 by TD Bank, N.A.. (Borg, Jonathan)
April 29, 2010 Filing 40 Letter in response to Mr. Borgs letter by Frances Triades, Terry S. Triades (Triades, Terry)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for May 7, 2010, at 2:00 p.m. No later than May 5, 2010, each party must submit by fax only (NOT by ECF) an ex parte statement of settlement position specifying the terms on which the party is willing to settle the case, whether those terms are negotiable, and an explanation of that position. These statements will be treated as confidential, and will not be docketed. Meaningful settlement discussions will occur at this conference; clients or other persons with full settlement authority must be present or immediately available by telephone. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/29/2010. (Sussman, Dana)
April 27, 2010 Filing 39 Letter Responding to TD Bank, N.A. letter by 57th St. Realty Corp., J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Sang Realty LLC, Trinity Auto Corp. (Razis, George)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER re #38 Letter filed by TD Bank, N.A. -- Counsel for each appearing defendant shall respond in writing no later than April 28, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/27/2010. (Sussman, Dana)
April 26, 2010 Filing 38 Letter requesting settlement conference by TD Bank, N.A. (Borg, Jonathan)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #35 Motion for Default Judgment -- I will consider the filings submitted in support of this motion as having been submitted in support of the amended motion for default judgment that has been referred to me. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/1/2010. (Orenstein, James)
March 29, 2010 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #36 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc., #35 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc. filed by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Witness List, #2 Certificate of Service) (Borg, Jonathan)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER -- The plaintiff is directed to submit any written materials in support of its request for damages and attorneys' fees, including any affidavits, exhibits, or memoranda of law that the plaintiff wishes me to consider, no later than March 29, 2010 with copies simultaneously provided to each defendant. If the plaintiff wishes to present witnesses in support of its motion, it must also provide a list of all such witnesses, and I will schedule the proceedings accordingly. This will be the plaintiff's final opportunity to present argument or evidence to me in support of any request for relief; if the evidence in the record by that deadline fails to establish either liability or any component of the plaintiff's request for relief, I will recommend that the court deny the corresponding portion of the motion rather than allow the plaintiff to cure the defect by filing supplemental proof. The plaintiff is further directed to serve a copy of this order on each defendant and to electronically file proof of such service no later than March 15, 2010. Any defendant that wishes to make a submission in response must do so no later than April 5, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/8/2010. (Sussman, Dana)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiff's motion for default judgment against the non-appearing defendants, #36 , is respectfully referred to Judge Orenstein. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 3/5/2010. (Gleeson, John)
February 17, 2010 Filing 36 Amended MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc. by TD Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 2/24/2010 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Amended Certificate of Service) (Borg, Jonathan)
February 17, 2010 Filing 35 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino a/k/a Gina Carollo, 57th St. Realty Corp., and New York Engines, Inc. by TD Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 2/24/2010 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit of Diane Whitten in support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Whitten Aff., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Whitten Aff., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Whitten Aff., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Whitten Aff., #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Whitten Aff., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Whitten Aff., #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Whitten Aff., #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Whitten Aff., #10 Declaration of Jonathan Matthew Borg in support, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Borg Decl., #12 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Borg Decl., #13 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Borg Decl., #14 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Borg, Jonathan)
February 9, 2010 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. Sang Realty LLC served on 1/14/2010, answer due 2/4/2010. (Borg, Jonathan)
February 8, 2010 Filing 33 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, by Frances Triades, Terry S. Triades. (Triades, Terry)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order ORDER re #32 Request for Production of Documents filed by Trinity Auto Corp., J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Sang Realty LLC, #31 Interrogatories Propounded filed by Trinity Auto Corp., J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Sang Realty LLC -- Counsel is reminded that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d), discovery requests and materials produced in pretrial disclosure and discovery shall not be filed with the clerk's office except by order of the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1) ("[D]isclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) or (2) and the following discovery requests and responses must not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders filing: depositions, interrogatories, requests for documents or tangible things or to permit entry onto land, and requests for admission."). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/29/2010. (Sussman, Dana)
January 28, 2010 Filing 32 REQUEST for Production of Documents by J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Sang Realty LLC, Trinity Auto Corp.. (Razis, George)
January 28, 2010 Filing 31 INTERROGATORIES Propounded by J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Sang Realty LLC, Trinity Auto Corp.. (Razis, George)
January 25, 2010 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. Terry S. Triades served on 1/18/2010, answer due 2/8/2010. (Borg, Jonathan)
January 25, 2010 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. Frances Triades served on 1/18/2010, answer due 2/8/2010. (Borg, Jonathan)
January 25, 2010 Filing 28 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint, First CROSSCLAIM against 57th St. Realty Corp., Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino by Trinity Auto Corp., Sang Realty LLC, J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc.. (Razis, George)
January 4, 2010 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 57th St. Realty Corp., Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., John Does #1-10, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino, New York Engines, Inc., Trinity Auto Corp., Terry Triades, Frances Triades, Sang Realty LLC, filed by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3) (Borg, Jonathan)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: December 28, 2009. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: January 28, 2010. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: March 4, 2010. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: May 3, 2010. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via fax two business days in advance): May 11, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: May 24, 2010. Joint pretrial order due by: July 2, 2010. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/28/2009. (Orenstein, James)
December 28, 2009 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/28/2009. SCHEDULING: The final pretrial conference will be held on May 11, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. THE FOLLOWING RULINGS WERE MADE: (1) The non-appearing parties have been served but have not responded to the complaint. The plaintiff will promptly seek default remedies. (2) I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects the appearing parties' actual discovery needs as discussed at today's conference. If the appearing parties agree that an early settlement conference would be useful, they will contact chambers to arrange it. (3) To the extent the plaintiff has been considering amending its complaint to assert additional claims based on information already in its possession, as set forth on the record at today's conference, it will file an amended complaint no later than January 4, 2010, or waive any such claims. The foregoing deadline is without prejudice to the right of any party to seek to amend its pleadings, on or before the deadline set forth in the case management and scheduling order, to add other claims or defenses. (Orenstein, James)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order CORRECTION: re #25 Minute Entry -- The pretrial conference will be held on May 11, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/28/2009. (Sussman, Dana)
December 23, 2009 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Borg, Jonathan)
November 30, 2009 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Trinity Auto Corp.. (Razis, George)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for December 28, 2009, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11D South before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/30/2009. (Guy, Alicia)
November 24, 2009 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson: Case called. Plaintiff represented by Jonathan M. Borg, Esq. Defendants represented by George Razis, Esq. Pre Motion Conference held on 11/24/2009 re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Parties agree that a Motion to Dismiss is premature at this juncture. The case is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Orenstein for an initial conference to begin discovery. (Court Reporter Frederick Guerino.) (Lee, Ilene)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER: A pre-motion conference was held with the parties on November 24, 2009. At the conference, the defendant requested permission to file a motion for summary judgment. As no discovery has been completed, a motion pursuant to Rule 56 would not be appropriate at this time. The request to file a motion for summary judgment is hereby denied. Judge Orenstein is respectfully requested to schedule an initial conference with the parties. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 11/24/2009. (Gleeson, John)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re #20 Letter filed by Trinity Auto Corp., J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc. Parties are to appear for a Pre Motion Conference set for Tuesday, November 24, 2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C South before Judge John Gleeson. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 11/19/2009. (Lee, Ilene)
November 18, 2009 Filing 20 Letter Requesting to file Motion to Dismiss by J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Trinity Auto Corp. (Razis, George)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER re #19 Stipulation, filed by TD Bank, N.A. -- So ordered. The Clerk's Notation of Default entered against the defendants J&P Auto Wrecking, Inc. and Trinity Auto Corp. is vacated, and the defendants J&P Auto Wrecking, Inc. and Trinity Auto Corp. shall answer or otherwise respond to thecomplaint by November 30, 2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/18/2009. (Stein, Noah)
November 17, 2009 Filing 19 STIPULATION re Order, #16 Clerk's Entry of Default, Order, #17 Letter, #1 Complaint, #18 Letter Vacating Clerk's Notation of Default and Extending the Time of defendants J&P Auto Wrecking Inc. and Trinity Auto Corp. to answer or otherwise move by TD Bank, N.A. (Borg, Jonathan)
November 12, 2009 Filing 18 Letter to Hon. James Orenstein, U.S. Magistrate Judge by TD Bank, N.A. (Borg, Jonathan)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER: The request to vacate the entry of default, #17 , is respectfully referred to Judge Orenstein. The request to move to dismiss the complaint is denied without prejudice to renewal after the motion to vacate the entry of default is resolved. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 11/10/2009. (Gleeson, John)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER re #17 Letter filed by Trinity Auto Corp., J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc. -- The plaintiff is ordered to respond in writing by November 12, 2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/10/2009. (Sussman, Dana)
November 9, 2009 Filing 17 Letter requesting to Vacate Entry of Default by J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Trinity Auto Corp. (Razis, George)
November 9, 2009 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 57th St. Realty Corp., Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., Anthony Marino, Gina Marino, New York Engines, Inc., Trinity Auto Corp. Motions terminated: #11 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by TD Bank, N.A.. (Hamilton, Janet)
November 9, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by George Razis on behalf of J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Razis, George)
November 9, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by George Razis on behalf of Trinity Auto Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Razis, George)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order ORDER re #13 Letter filed by Trinity Auto Corp. -- Counsel is reminded that Rule II.B of my individual practice requirements prohibits the filing of correspondence between counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/30/2009. (Sussman, Dana)
October 29, 2009 Filing 13 Letter dated October 29, 2009 by Trinity Auto Corp. (Razis, George)
October 19, 2009 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TD Bank, N.A. re #11 MOTION for Entry of Default, AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by TD Bank, N.A.. (Borg, Jonathan)
October 19, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan M. Borg, #2 Notation of Default) (Borg, Jonathan)
October 12, 2009 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. Trinity Auto Corp. served on 8/31/2009, answer due 9/21/2009. (Borg, Jonathan)
October 12, 2009 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. Susan Coppolino served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Borg, Jonathan)
October 12, 2009 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. Steven Coppolino served on 9/3/2009, answer due 9/23/2009. (Borg, Jonathan)
October 12, 2009 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. New York Engines, Inc. served on 8/31/2009, answer due 9/21/2009. (Borg, Jonathan)
October 12, 2009 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc. served on 8/31/2009, answer due 9/21/2009. (Borg, Jonathan)
October 12, 2009 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. 57th St. Realty Corp. served on 8/31/2009, answer due 9/21/2009. (Borg, Jonathan)
October 12, 2009 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. Gina Marino served on 9/1/2009, answer due 9/21/2009. (Borg, Jonathan)
October 12, 2009 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TD Bank, N.A.. Anthony Marino served on 9/8/2009, answer due 9/28/2009. (Borg, Jonathan)
August 26, 2009 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by TD Bank, N.A.. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 26, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $350 receipt #4653004607) against 57th St. Realty Corp., Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., John Does #1-10, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino, New York Engines, Inc., Trinity Auto Corp. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by TD Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 exhibits 1-5, #3 exhibit 6, #4 exhibit 7.1, #5 exhibit 7.2, #6 exhibit 8) (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 26, 2009 Summons Issued as to 57th St. Realty Corp., Steven Coppolino, Susan Coppolino, J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc., John Does #1-10, Anthony Marino, Gina Marino, New York Engines, Inc., Trinity Auto Corp.. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TD Bank, N.A. v. Coppolino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry S. Triades
Represented By: Terry S. Triades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Coppolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Carollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 57th St. Realty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Engines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J &P Auto Wrecking, Inc.
Represented By: George J. Razis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Auto Corp.
Represented By: George J. Razis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Triades
Represented By: Terry S. Triades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Triades
Represented By: Terry S. Triades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sang Realty LLC
Represented By: George J. Razis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Matthew Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Susan Coppolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Anthony Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?