Rodriguez v. Administration for Childrens Services et al
Plaintiff: |
Jennifer Rodriguez |
Defendant: |
Administration for Childrens Services, City of New York, Librada Moran, St. Vincent's Services, Incorporated and Starrett City, Inc., |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv04661 |
Filed: |
October 12, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
John Gleeson |
Presiding Judge: |
Steven M. Gold |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 31, 2018 |
Filing
486
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The parties have filed no objections to Magistrate Judge Gold's July 26, 2018 Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's motion for settlement approval. The Court has reviewed the record and the Repor t and Recommendation for clear error and, finding none, hereby adopts Magistrate Judge Gold's Report and Recommendation 485 in its entirety as the opinion of this Court. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion 478 for settlement approval is GRANTED. SO Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 8/30/2018. (Williams, Erica)
|
September 11, 2014 |
Filing
392
ORDER on summary judgment motions in cases 1:10-cv-04661-JG-SMG and 1:11-cv-01583-JG-SMG. See the attached order. PA's motion is denied; Rodriguez's motion is denied; the City Defendants' and St. Vincent's Defendants' motions are granted in part and denied in part; and the Court defers ruling on Alford's and JA's motions. A status conference will be held on Monday, September 22, 2014, at 11:00am to discuss next steps in the case. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 9/11/2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-04661-JG-SMG, 1:11-cv-01583-JG-SMG (Aronoff, Peter)
|
February 29, 2012 |
Filing
191
ORDER denying 189 Motion for Reconsideration, for the reasons stated in the attached Order. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/29/2012. (O'Connor, Erin)
|
February 16, 2012 |
Filing
188
ORDER re 186 Letter filed by P.A., Jr: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. See attached Order. In the future, applications seeking relief from the court should be filed as motions but may remain in letter format. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 2/16/2012. (O'Connor, Erin)
|
June 6, 2011 |
Filing
70
ORDER : See attached order appointing Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP as pro bono counsel to P.A., Jr. Pro bono counsel are directed to file a single pleading on behalf of P.A., Jr. in case number 10-CV-4661, captioned "Second Amended Complaint." Upon filing of the Second Amended Complaint, the claims raised in P.A., Jr.'s name by adult plaintiffs in 10-CV-4661 and 11-CV-1583 will be dismissed for lack of standing. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 6/6/2011. (Horowitz, Hayley)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?