287 Franklin Avenue Residents' Association et al v. Meisels et al
Plaintiff: 287 Franklin Avenue Residents' Association, Kurt Fletcher, Lisa Lin, Willie Osterweil, Jon Sasmor and Vilija Skubutyte
Defendant: Joe Doe, Josh Doe, Nathan Doe, John and Jane Does # 1 Through # 10, Brian Dudjak, Samuel Emmanus, Louis Garcia, Chaim Goldberger, Peter Henry, Ronald Henry, Henry Management, LLC, John Doe Corporations # 1 Through #10, Joel Kaufman, Kings County Realty Corp., Chaim Meisels, Other John Doe Entities # 1 Through # 10, People Choice Real Estate, LLC, Ronald Henry Land Trust, Abraham Schneebalg and Isaac Teitelbaum
Case Number: 1:2011cv00976
Filed: March 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A. Matsumoto
Presiding Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the annexed memorandum and order, Mr. Sasmor's motion for reconsideration 343 is respectfully DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to vacate all entries of default dated April 12, 13, 15, 19, 21, and 25, 2011; March 12, 2012; and September 26, 2012 (ECF Nos. 20, 22, 24-27, 93, and other undated ECF docket entries) in light of the court's grant of defendants' motions for summary judgment on the sole federal RICO claim and the co urt's decision to decline the exercise of supplemental jurisdiction on plaintiffs' state law claims. The Clerk of Court is further respectfully requested to enter judgment in favor of defendants on the federal claim and close this case. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/30/2016. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. For the reasons set in the enclosed order, Judge Orenstein's Report and Recommendation is incorporated by reference and adopted in its entirety and the objections of the Represented Plaintiffs and Mr. Sasmor are respectfully denied. Accordingly, Mr. Sasmor's motion for summary judgment is denied in its entirety, and the Goldberger, Land Trust, and Garcia Defendants' motions for summary judgment are granted. Having dismissed plaintiffs& #039; federal law claims, the court declines to exercise jurisdiction over plaintiffs' state law claims. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to dismiss defendants Louis Garcia, Chaim Goldberger, Joel Kaufman, Abraham Schneebalg, Isaac Teitelbaum, Henry Management LLC, Kings County Realty Corp, and Ronald Henry Land Trust from this action. Plaintiffs shall advise the court no later than September 30, 2015 as to how they plan to proceed with this action. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/17/2015. (Alagesan, Deepa)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. For the reasons set forth in the attached Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, the Report and Recommendation issued by Magistrate James Orenstein on 8/27/12 is adopted in its entirety. The Clerk of Co urt is respectfully directed to strike the answer of defendants Nathan Smith, Josh Bosch, and People Choice Real Estate, LLC (a.k.a. "Peoples Choice Real Estate, L.L.C." and "People's Choice Realty, Inc.") to the First Amende d Complaint (ECF No. 43) and to enter their default. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order upon each of the PCRE Defendants, as defined herein, and are ordered to file a certificate of service via ECF by September 28, 2012. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/25/2012. (Kelley, Jamuna)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 82 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, filed by Jon Sasmor. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, Sasmor's appeal 82 of Judge Orenstein's January 11, 2012 discovery ru lings is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: (i) by June 7, 2012, all defendants shall identify, in writing under oath, the individual(s) involved in the preparation of defendants' tax returns; (ii) by June 7, 2012, the Trust Defenda nts shall identify, in writing under oath, all other persons involved in the Ronald Henry Land Trust, Henry Management, LLC, and 65 2B Management, Inc., now or in the last three years, the nature of their involvement, and the commencement and termina tion dates of their involvement in those entities; (iii) by June 7, 2012, the Trust Defendants shall identify, in writing under oath, the individual(s) who negotiated and/or drafted the deed granting 287 Franklin Avenue from Ronald Henry to the Ronal d Henry Land Trust, the agreement and declaration of trust, and the assignment of beneficial interest; and (iv) all other rulings made by Judge Orenstein during the status conference on January 11, 2012 are affirmed. Counsel for the Trust Defendants shall serve a copy of the instant Memorandum and Order on Jon Sasmor and file a certificate of service on ECF by May 25, 2012. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/24/2012. (Winterkorn, Margaret)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 79 Motion to Quash; 80 Motion to Quash -- For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum and order, the motions are granted in part and denied in part. SEE ATTACHED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/14/2012. (Rambaud, Dennis)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 85 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement -- For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum and order, plaintiff Jon Sasmor's motion for the entry of default against defendant Peter Henry is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/12/2012. (Rambaud, Dennis)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 287 Franklin Avenue Residents' Association et al v. Meisels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 287 Franklin Avenue Residents' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Osterweil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Sasmor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vilija Skubutyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does # 1 Through # 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Dudjak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Emmanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaim Goldberger
Represented By: David Lyle Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Management, LLC
Represented By: David Lyle Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations # 1 Through #10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County Realty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaim Meisels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other John Doe Entities # 1 Through # 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People Choice Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Henry Land Trust
Represented By: David Lyle Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Schneebalg
Represented By: David Lyle Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Teitelbaum
Represented By: David Lyle Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?