Lee v. PO Torres et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Lee
Defendant: G.M. McRae, Laurie Harris, Monique Lebron, Brian Alvarado, Jona Asperger, William Brooks, Dept. of Insurance of the State of New York, Mark Weinstein, PO Torres, The Department of Education of the State of New York, Metropolitan Transportation Authority and Ms. Lockhart
Case Number: 1:2011cv02659
Filed: June 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Presiding Judge: Andrew L. Carter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 101 : The Court's 1/9/13 Order ruled on motions falling into Rule 58(a)'s exceptions; thus, the judgment need not be set out in a separate document. Accordingly, plaintiff's request is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 2/25/2013. (Fernandez, Erica) Modified on 2/26/2013 (Fernandez, Erica).
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: On 5/14/2012, the plaintiff filed a "Motion under Rule 52(a)(2) and Rule 52(b) of the FRCP for findings and conclusions by the Court." The Court construes the plaintiff's submission as a motion brought pursuant t o Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) for reconsideration of the May 11 Order. For the reasons stated herein, the plaintiff's 95 motion for additional findings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 52(b) is denied. To the extent the plaintiff moves for reconsideration of the Court's 5/11/2012 Order dismissing the plaintiff's complaint, the motion is denied. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon, on 1/9/2013. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Dismiss; granting 56 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 69 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 89 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; denying 91 Motion to Amend/Co rrect/Supplement; granting 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The plaintiff's complaint is dismissed in its entirety for failure to state a plausible claim for relief. The plaintiff's motions to add additional parties are denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 5/11/2012. Copies mailed by chambers to pro se parties. (Turner-Dodge, Lee)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. PO Torres et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.M. McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Lebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jona Asperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept. of Insurance of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PO Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of Education of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transportation Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?