Sasmor v. Powell et al

Defendant: Carol Alt, Fern Fisher, Chaim Goldberger, Henry Management, LLC, Steven Powell, Abraham Schneebalg and Isaac Teitelbaum
Plaintiff: Jon Sasmor
Case Number: 1:2011cv04645
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A. Matsumoto
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Upon careful review of Judge Orenstein's thorough and well-reasoned R & R, the record in this case, and the relevant case law, the court finds no clear error in Judge Orenstein's recommendation tha t plaintiff's claims be dismissed for lack of standing and that defendant Powell is entitled to qualified immunity. Upon a de novo review, the court agrees completely with and adopts in its entirety Judge Orenstein's analysis as wel l. Accordingly, for the reasons set forth in the Order, plaintiff's complaint is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice to the federal claims therein, and the court finds that leave to amend would be futile. Ruotolo v. City of New York, 514 F.3d 184, 191 (2d Cir. 2008) ("Leave to amend, though liberally granted, may properly be denied for: 'undue delay, bad faith or dilatory motive on the part of the movant, repeated failure to cure deficiencies by amendments previousl y allowed, undue prejudice to the opposing party by virtue of allowance of the amendment, futility of amendment, etc.'"); Mercado v. Quantum Servicing Corp., No. 15-CV-1500, 2015 WL 1969028, at *5 (E.D.N.Y. Apr. 29, 2015). The court declines to exercise jurisdiction over plaintiff's remaining state-law claims. Furthermore, for the reasons discussed in prior decisions and above, plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction is denied. The court further certifies p ursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Memorandum and Order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for purposes of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 43 8, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on the pro se plaintiff and note service on this docket within three days of entering this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of Court is further respectfully requested to enter judgment in favor of defendants, to serve the pro se plaintiff with a copy of the judgment and the appeals packet, and to close this case. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/17/2015. (Tsay, Stephanie)
March 31, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Report and Recommendation issued by Magistrate Judge Orenstein on 2/21/13 61 is adopted in its entirety as the opinion of the court. Th erefore, defendants' motions to dismiss plaintiff's complaint and/or motions for judgment on the pleadings are granted, plaintiff's complaint is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice to the federal claims therein, and the court wil l not exercise jurisdiction over plaintiffs remaining state-law claims. Also for the reasons set forth in the Memorandum and Order, plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction is denied. The court further certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. & #167; 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Memorandum and Order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for purposes of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order on the pro se plaintiff and note service on this docket within three days of entering this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of Court is further respectfully requested to enter judgment in favor of defendants, to serve the pro se plaintiff with a copy of the judgment and the appeals packet, and to close this case. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/31/2013. (Kelley, Jamuna)
September 26, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order is denied. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/26/2011. (Chang, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sasmor v. Powell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Alt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fern Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaim Goldberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Schneebalg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Teitelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Sasmor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?