Quoquoi v. New York City Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: |
Gadema K. Quoquoi |
Defendant: |
Verizon Communications, US Department of Justice, NYS OGS, New York City Department of Education, New York City Park Department, NYS Department of Social Services, NYS Governor and Mayor Bloomberg |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv04792 |
Filed: |
October 3, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Carol Bagley Amon |
Presiding Judge: |
Joan M. Azrack |
Nature of Suit: |
Freedom of Information Act |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 25, 2012 |
Filing
48
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, defendants' motions are GRANTED as follows. Plaintiff's claims against State defendants are REMANDED to the Supreme Court of the St ate of New York, County of Queens. Plaintiff's claims against Verizon and the City defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment in favor of Verizon and the City defendan ts, and remand the claims against the State defendants to state court. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff, and close the case. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 6/25/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn)
|
April 3, 2012 |
Filing
41
ORDER: In light of the procedural history set forth in the attached written Order, the Court hereby ORDERS that Quoquoi's objections to the R&R (Doc. No. 40) are deemed timely filed. Defendants shall have fourteen days from the date of this Or der to file and serve any response(s) to these objections. Any defendant filing a response shall serve plaintiff and file with the Court proof of such service. The Court further recommends that Quoquoi consider whether he wishes to withdraw his int erlocutory appeal to the Second Circuit in light of this Order. Quoquoi's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis (Doc. No. 39)is DENIED as the appeal is premature. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that the Clerk of Court send by overnight mail to Quoquoi a copy of this Order, and note such mailing and corresponding tracking number on the docket. The Clerk of Court is FURTHER ORDERED to transmit to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit a Supplemental Electronic Index to the Record on Appeal that contains this Order. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 4/3/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?