Vario v. Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Vario
Defendant: George Stamboulidis and Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers
Case Number: 1:2011cv05648
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Sterling Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2013 Filing 38 CLERK'S JUDGMENT DATED 2/21/13 that judgment is hereby entered dismissing plaintiff's complaint. ( Ordered by Michele Gapinski, Chief Deputy for Court Operations on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 2/21/2013 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Motion to Dismiss. See attached. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Ordered by Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr on 2/21/2013. (Figeroux, Davina)
September 12, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr: Case called. Parties present. Pre Motion Conference held on 9/12/2012. Oral argument heard. Plaintiff's application for leave to amend the complaint is DENIED. (Court Reporter Mary-Agnes Drury.) (Rodriguez, Ana)
September 10, 2012 Filing 36 Letter from George A. Stamboulidis in Response to Plaintiff Thomas Vario's July 23, 2012 Letter to the Court by George Stamboulidis (Stamboulidis, George)
July 24, 2012 Notice of Hearings: Pre-Motion Conference set for 9/12/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B South before Judge Sterling Johnson Jr. (Rodriguez, Ana)
July 23, 2012 Filing 35 Letter by Thomas Vario (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Colleluori, Anthony)
May 10, 2012 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in Further Support by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Steinberg, James)
April 9, 2012 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thomas Vario. (Colleluori, Anthony)
April 3, 2012 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #16 Affidavit in Support of Motion in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service) (Steinberg, James)
March 9, 2012 Filing 31 REPLY in Support re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by George Stamboulidis. (Stamboulidis, George)
March 9, 2012 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thomas Vario. (Stamboulidis, George)
March 9, 2012 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Anthony J. Colleluori filed by Thomas Vario. (Stamboulidis, George)
March 9, 2012 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, Declarationof George Stamboulidis in Support and Memorandum of Law in Support , filed by George Stamboulidis. (Stamboulidis, George)
March 9, 2012 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by George Stamboulidis. (Stamboulidis, George)
March 9, 2012 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction George Stamboulidis filed by George Stamboulidis. (Stamboulidis, George)
March 9, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by George Stamboulidis. (Stamboulidis, George)
March 9, 2012 Filing 24 REPLY in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Steinberg, James)
March 9, 2012 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Steinberg, James)
March 9, 2012 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Steinberg, James)
March 9, 2012 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Steinberg, James)
March 9, 2012 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Steinberg, James)
March 9, 2012 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. Responses due by 2/17/2012 (Steinberg, James)
January 31, 2012 Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. Defendant shall file the fully-briefed motion on March 9, 2012, per the Court's individual motion practice rules. (Figeroux, Davina)
January 20, 2012 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #17 Memorandum in Support, #16 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Steinberg, James)
January 20, 2012 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Steinberg, James)
January 20, 2012 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Steinberg, James)
January 20, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. Responses due by 2/17/2012 (Steinberg, James)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER ENDORSING the Scheduling Order set forth in Docket No. #14 Defendant shall electronically file the fully-briefed motion on March 9, 2012. Ordered by Senior Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr on 1/17/2012. (Figeroux, Davina)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: For the reasons stated in letter #14 , the initial conference scheduled before Judge Azrack on March 6, 2012, is adjourned sine die pending the briefing schedule for defendant's motion to dismiss. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/17/2012. (White, Sarah)
January 9, 2012 Filing 14 Letter requesting the approval of the parties proposed, Motion to Dismiss, briefing schedule and the adjournment of the March 6, 2012 Initial Conference by George Stamboulidis (Campbell, Patrick)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in Courtroom 6E, 225 Cadman Plaza East, before Magistrate Judge Azrack on March 6, 2012, at 12:00 noon. All counsel must be present and are advised to review Judge Azrack's revised Individual Rules, which are available on the District Court's web site, prior to the conference. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Any request for an adjournment must be made in the form of a letter motion filed on ECF at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference and must indicate which parties consent to the adjournment.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/29/2011. (Terranova, Robert).
December 22, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James Michael Steinberg on behalf of Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers (aty to be noticed) (Steinberg, James)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon, Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/21/2011. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order ORDER: re #7 and #9 . There being no objection from Defendant Local 14 and the plaintiff having not entered an objection, this Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case to United States District Judge Sterling Johnson. So Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/21/2011. (A formal reassignment will follow) (Liberatore, Marie)
December 21, 2011 Filing 12 Letter Requesting Premotion Confrerence 12(b)(1) & (6) motion to dismiss by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers (Steinberg, James)
December 20, 2011 Filing 11 Letter by Thomas Vario (Colleluori, Anthony)
December 20, 2011 Filing 10 Letter respectfully requesting the Court to schedule a pre-motion conference concerning a motion by Local 14s Ethical Practices Attorney (EPA) to dismiss the Complaint by George Stamboulidis (Stamboulidis, George)
December 13, 2011 Filing 9 REPLY in Support re #7 Letter filed by Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers. (Steinberg, James)
December 13, 2011 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Vario. George Stamboulidis served on 11/29/2011, answer due 12/20/2011. (Colleluori, Anthony)
December 9, 2011 Filing 7 Letter respectfully requesting this case be assigned to Judge Sterling Johnson Jr., by George Stamboulidis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service) (Stamboulidis, George)
December 9, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Dorothy Vasel on behalf of George Stamboulidis (aty to be noticed) (Vasel, Denise)
December 9, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Campbell on behalf of George Stamboulidis (aty to be noticed) (Campbell, Patrick)
December 9, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by George A. Stamboulidis on behalf of George Stamboulidis (aty to be noticed) (Stamboulidis, George)
December 9, 2011 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Vario. Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers served on 12/2/2011, answer due 12/23/2011. (Colleluori, Anthony)
December 7, 2011 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren J. Resnick on behalf of George Stamboulidis (aty to be noticed) (Resnick, Lauren)
November 18, 2011 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2011 FILING FEE: $ 350, receipt number 7997 (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 18, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Thomas Vario. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vario v. Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Vario
Represented By: Anthony J. Colleluori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Stamboulidis
Represented By: George A. Stamboulidis
Represented By: Denise Dorothy Vasel
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Campbell
Represented By: Lauren J. Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 14-14B of the International Union of Operating Engineers
Represented By: James Michael Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?