Goodwine v. National RailRoad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Earl Goodwine
Defendant: National RailRoad Passenger Corporation and Amtrak
Case Number: 1:2012cv03882
Filed: August 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Viktor V. Pohorelsky
Presiding Judge: Jack B. Weinstein
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER. Before the Court are defendants Motions in Limine [Rec. Doc. 226] and plaintiffs Opposition thereto [Rec. Doc. 244], and plaintiffs Motions in Limine [Rec. Docs. 230 and 231] and defendants Opposition thereto [Rec. Doc. 240]. Defendants motion s (1) to preclude plaintiff from introducing evidence regarding (a) any potential business relationships between any current or former defendant and New Jersey Transit Corp. and Plaintiffs former employers North Shore Long Island Jewish Hospital and Lowes Home Improvement; (b) the circumstances of Sergeant Louis Rinaldis death; or (c) the discovery process in the case and (2) to preclude plaintiff from referring to the alleged video recording during trial are GRANTED. Plaintiffs motions (1) to w ithhold the amount of his damages request from the jury during the liability trial and (2) to exclude evidence of his prior criminal conviction are GRANTED. All other motions by the parties are DENIED. THE PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO READ THE ATTACHED ORDER IN FULL FOR DETAILS. Ordered by Judge Tucker L. Melancon on 3/17/2014. (Sherer-Kohlburn, Sarah)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The deadline for filing objections to the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation was February 24, 2014. [Rec. Doc. 245 at 24; Rec. Doc. 247]. Defendants filed their Objection on February 24, 2014. [Rec. Doc. 249]. The Court notes the absence of any objection from the plaintiff. After an independent review of the entirety of the record to specifically include the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation and defendants objection thereto, the Court adopts the Report and Recommendation as its findings of fact and conclusions of law. THE PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO READ THE ATTACHED ORDER IN FULL FOR DETAILS. Ordered by Judge Tucker L. Melancon on 2/27/2014. (Sherer-Kohlburn, Sarah)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. ORDERED that the Court adopts the December 10, 2013 Report and Recommendations of the Honorable James Orenstein, United States Magistrate Judge [Rec. Doc. 210] and denies plaintiffs requests for dispositive relief, [Rec. Docs. 149, 155, 156, 159, 167, 170, and 190]. Plaintiff's additional requests for the recusal of Judge Orenstein and complaints regarding the involvement of a magistrate judge, unfair treatment, and the procedural history of this c ase are DENIED AS MOOT. Judge Orenstein previously ordered the plaintiff not to file any further motions or otherwise seek relief of any kind without leave from the court. [Rec. Doc. 186]. The plaintiff is once again instructed that he is not to file any further motions or requests for relief except in compliance with a prior order of this Court, including the Courts Jury Trial Procedure Order [Rec. Doc. 153], without first obtaining the Courts permission. Should the plaintiff continue to file r equests for relief the Court will consider imposing sanctions, including an award of costs or possible dismissal of this action for failure to comply with the Courts orders. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). THE PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO READ THE ATTACHED ORDER IN FULL FOR ALL DETAILS. Ordered by Judge Tucker L. Melancon on 1/9/2014. (Sherer-Kohlburn, Sarah)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER denying 218 Motion for Recusal. For the reasons set forth in the attached document, I deny plaintiff Earl Goodwine's motion for my recusal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/6/2014. (Orenstein, James)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re 127 ; 128 ; 129 ; 130 ; 131 ; 132 -- For the reasons set forth in the attached document, I deny the plaintiff's motions. I respectfully direct the defendants' counsel to serve a copy of this document on the plaintiff by certified mail, and to file proof of service no later than August 23, 2013. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/21/2013. (Rambaud, Dennis)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is ORDERED that, noting the lack of objections by plaintiff, the Court adopts the July 25, 2013 Report and Recommendation of the Honorable James Orenstein, United States Magistrate Judge [Rec. Doc. 102] and denies plaintiffs motions for summary judgment and default judgment [Rec. Docs. 91, 65]. Ordered by Judge Tucker L. Melancon on 8/14/2013. (Clegg, Brendan)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Noting the lack of objections, the Court adopts the June 21, 2013 Report and Recommendation of the Honorable James Orenstein, United States Magistrate Judge and denies the motion to dismiss for lack of prosecution. Ordered by Visiting Judge VJ-Tucker L. Melancon on 7/19/2013. (Jones, Lauren)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwine v. National RailRoad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Goodwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National RailRoad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: John Jeremiah Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrak
Represented By: John Jeremiah Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?