United States of America v. Catholic Health System of Long Island Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
State of New York and United States of America |
Defendant: |
Catholic Health System of Long Island Inc., Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Center, Good Samaritan Nursing Home, St. Catherine of Siena Medical Center and St. Catherine of Siena Nursing Home |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv04425 |
Filed: |
March 31, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Margo K. Brodie |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert M. Levy |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Other |
Cause of Action: |
31 U.S.C. § 3729 False Claims Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 20, 2023 |
Filing
110
ORDER re 109 Mandate of USCA. The Court grants 61 Defendants' motion to dismiss and for partial summary judgment and dismisses Relator's misappropriation claims based on section 1320a-7b(a)(4) with prejudice. The parties are directed to provide a status report regarding the retaliation claims on or before January 19, 2024. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/20/2023. (JYJ)
|
February 22, 2021 |
Filing
96
ORDER. For the reasons in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court grants Defendants' motion for certification of interlocutory appeal and issues a certificate of appealability. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/22/2021. (Valentin, Winnethka)
|
July 13, 2020 |
Filing
90
ORDER. For the foregoing reasons in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss and denies the motion for partial summary judgment without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/13/2020. (Valentin, Winnethka)
|
August 10, 2018 |
Filing
75
ORDER denying 61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 61 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons discussed in the attached memorandum and order, the Court denies defendants' motion to dismiss and for partial summary judgment as to the misappropriation claims. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/10/2018. (Chu, Chan Hee)
|
March 31, 2017 |
Filing
40
MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. For the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum & Or der, the Court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; grants Defendants' motion dismiss for failure to state a claim as to the False Filing and Retention Claims with prejudice; and grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment on the Misappropriation Claims without prejudice. The Court grants Relator leave to amend the Misappropriation Claims, and Relator shall file an amended complaint, if any, within thirty (30) days of this Memorandum & Order. If Relat or elects not to file an amended complaint or if the amended complaint is not filed within thirty (30) days of this Memorandum & Order, the Court will dismiss the Misappropriation Claims with prejudice. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/31/2017. (Hawkins, Salah)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?