Innovation Ventures, LLC et al v. Ultimate One Distributing Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Innovation Ventures, LLC and Living Essential, LLC
Defendant: 7 Eleven, Inc., 7-Eleven Store #11152, 7-Eleven Store #11168F-2422, 7-Eleven Store #11181, 7-Eleven Store #23407, 7-Eleven Store #25449C-2422, 7-Eleven Store #32760, Sulaiman S. Aamir, Baja Exporting, LLC, Baseline Distribution, INC, Ahmed Bhimani, Brothers Trading Co., Inc. d/b/a Victory Wholesale Grocers, CVS Caremark Corp., Capital Sales Company, Ltd, Core-Mark International, Inc., Delta Distribution Services Corp., Elegant Trading, Inc, Empire Trade Wholesaler Corp., Excel Wholesale Distributors, Inc., David Flood, Food Distributers International, Inc, Heights Deli and Company, Walid Jamil, John Does 1-10, Kaival Deli & Catering, Saquib Khan, David K Lee, Midwest Wholesale Distributers, Moa Trading, Inc, Abdul Satar Najimi, Gulam Najimi, Wally Najimi, Nevins Gourmet, New Island Deli, Prestige Mobil, Price Master Corp., Quality King Distributions, INC, Richmond Wholesale Company, Inc., Joseph Sevany, Joseph Shayota, Justin Shayota, Scott Tilbrook, Top Choice Trading USA, Inc, Farid Tursonzadah, Ultimate One Distributing Corp., Universal Wholesale, Inc. and Valero Retail Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv05354
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Roanne L. Mann
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A. Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (842) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Quality King Distributors; granting in part and denying in part (855) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Food Distributors International and Sco tt Tilbrook. For the reasons stated in the enclosed Memorandum and Order, Quality King's motion for partial summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The FDI Defendants' cross-motion for partial summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Quality King is awarded $799,266.80 on its breach of contract claim against Food Distributors International. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/31/2016. (McNulty, John)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER. After reviewing plaintiffs' and defendant Mr. Shayota's submissions ( 724 , 726 , 727 ) in response to the court's June 5, 2014 order to show cause, and for the reasons set forth in the attached order, the court orders the fo llowing: (1) Mr. Shayota is ordered to deposit into an interest-bearing account in the Clerk's Registry of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York $300 per month, due on the 1st of August 2014 and each month th ereafter, until he has deposited $40,000. He shall note his name, the case name, and docket number on each check or money order. (2) Mr. Shayota is ordered to provide to plaintiffs proof of monthly family income and receipts and/or bank statemen ts for every expenditure over $100 on a monthly basis, due the 1st of August 2014 and each month thereafter. (3) The court's November 30, 2012 preliminary injunction is amended to allow for the payment of reasonable living expenses in the amount of $1400 per month by Mr. Shayota, provided Mr. Shayota complies with (1) and (2) above. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 7/25/2014. (Alagesan, Deepa)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 711 ORDER granting 608 Motion to Dismiss; granting 609 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated in the enclosed Memorandum and Order, the Living Essentials Parties motions to dismiss are granted in their entirety, and the Midwest Parties countercl aims against Living Essentials and third-party claims against McCormack are dismissed with prejudice. The Midwest Parties request for leave to amend their pleading an additional time is denied. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to dismiss McCormack from this action. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/28/2014. (Tsai, Denise)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER granting 654 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting 673 Motion for Joinder: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the court orders the consolidation of the cases, Innovation Ventures, et al. v. Ultimate One Distributing Corp., et al. (Docket No. 12-cv-5354), and Innovation Ventures, et al., v. Pittsburg Wholesale Grocers Inc., et al. (Docket No. 13-cv-6397), pursuant to Rule 42(a). Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/3/2014. (Tsai, Denise)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: Contempt Order of May 7, 2013: For the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum and Order, the court hereby reinstates and modifies its May 7, 2013, contempt ruling as follows: (1) The Jamil Defendants are ordered to depo sit into an interest-bearing account in the Clerk's Registry of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York $400,000 by August 16, 2013. In the event that the Jamil Defendants fail to deposit this amount into the Clerk's Registry by this date, a per diem fine of $300 shall be imposed against the Jamil Defendants jointly and severally until the full $400,000 has been received and verified by the Clerk's Office. Instructions for depositing funds into the Clerk's Registry by wire transfer are attached to this order. (2) The court's December 11, 2012, preliminary injunction is amended to allow for the payment of reasonable living expenses in the amount of $2,760 per month by Walid Jamil, and $4,150 per month by Raid Jamil. (3) Plaintiffs' request for the court to appoint a receiver to take charge of Charters finances is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/1/2013. (Beauchamp, Peter)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovation Ventures, LLC et al v. Ultimate One Distributing Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7 Eleven, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven Store #11152
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven Store #11168F-2422
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven Store #11181
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven Store #23407
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven Store #25449C-2422
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-Eleven Store #32760
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sulaiman S. Aamir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baja Exporting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baseline Distribution, INC
Represented By: Ariel Samuel Peikes
Represented By: Richard S. Schurin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Bhimani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers Trading Co., Inc. d/b/a Victory Wholesale Grocers
Represented By: Joseph P. Goldberg
Represented By: Jacquelyn Renee Trussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Caremark Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Sales Company, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core-Mark International, Inc.
Represented By: Randi Wolkenbreit Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Distribution Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elegant Trading, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Trade Wholesaler Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Wholesale Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Flood
Represented By: Ariel Samuel Peikes
Represented By: Richard S. Schurin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Distributers International, Inc
Represented By: Stanley R. Goodman
Represented By: Martin I. Saperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heights Deli and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walid Jamil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaival Deli & Catering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saquib Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David K Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Wholesale Distributers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moa Trading, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Satar Najimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulam Najimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wally Najimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevins Gourmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Island Deli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Mobil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Master Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality King Distributions, INC
Represented By: Andre K. Cizmarik
Represented By: Zachary Winthrop Silverman
Represented By: Anthony J. Viola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond Wholesale Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Sevany
Represented By: Gregory Charles Johnson
Represented By: Bruce M. Sabados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Shayota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Shayota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Tilbrook
Represented By: Stanley R. Goodman
Represented By: Martin I. Saperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Choice Trading USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farid Tursonzadah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate One Distributing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Wholesale, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Charles Johnson
Represented By: Bruce M. Sabados
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Retail Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Hara K. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovation Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Waller Cohen
Represented By: Jonah Moses Knobler
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Represented By: Jane Metcalf
Represented By: Alexander Michaels
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Jeremy Alexander Weinberg
Represented By: Christos George Yatrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Living Essential, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Waller Cohen
Represented By: Jonah Moses Knobler
Represented By: Thomas Philip Kurland
Represented By: Jane Metcalf
Represented By: Alexander Michaels
Represented By: Geoffrey Potter
Represented By: Jeremy Alexander Weinberg
Represented By: Christos George Yatrakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?