Government Employees Insurance Company v. Saco et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Defendant: Suzanne Kusulas and Diane Saco
Case Number: 1:2012cv05633
Filed: November 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G. Garaufis
Presiding Judge: Marilyn D. Go
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, GEICO's (Dkt. 153) motion to strike demand for a jury trial is DENIED. The Estate's (Dkt. 166) crossmotionto file a jury demand is GRANTED. The Estate shall file a jury demand within thirty (30) days of this Order. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/22/2020. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05633-NGG-ST, 1:15-cv-00634-NGG-ST (Lee, Tiffeny)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, GEICO'S Motion to Limit Damages((148) in case 1:12-cv-05633-NGG-ST;(60) in case 1:15-cv-00634-NGG-ST) is DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/10/2018. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05633-NGG-ST, 1:15-cv-00634-NGG-ST (Lee, Tiffeny)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, Kusulas's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 117, No. 12-CV-5633; Dkt. 28, No. 15-CV-634) is DENIED. GEICO's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 115, No. 12-CV-5633; Dkt. 26, No. 15-C V-634) as to its request for declaratory judgment and Kusulas's cross-claims is GRANTED as to GEICO's obligation to pay prejudgment interest; and is DENIED as to GEICO's satisfaction of its duty of good faith. The parties are direc ted to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Pollak to schedule the filing of a Joint Pretrial Order in accordance with this court's Individual Rules, to be electronically filed no later than June 1, 2016. The parties are further directed to confer and to contact the court's Deputy at 718-613-2545 to set a trial date. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/30/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05633-NGG-CLP, 1:15-cv-00634-NGG-CLP (Lee, Tiffeny)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying (112) Motion to Compel in case 1:12-cv-05633-NGG-CLP. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 3/28/2017. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05633-NGG-CLP, 1:15-cv-00634-NGG-CLP (Go, Marilyn)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Kusulas's 15 Motion to Remand the Bad Faith Action (Dkt. 15 in 15-CV-634) is DENIED, and Kusulas's 12 Motion to Stay or Dismiss the Declaratory Judgment and Breach of Contract Action (Dkt. 93 in 12-CV-5633 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Alan Siegelwax, Paul Feinman, and Helen Indjeyiannis from Case Number 15-CV-634 (NGG) (MDG). Finally, as the Bad Faith Action and Declaratory Judgment a nd Breach of Contract Action involve common questions of law and fact (indeed, Kusulas previously asserted the bad faith claim as a counterclaim against GEICO in the first-filed action), the two actions are hereby consolidated for all further pre-trial proceedings, and if necessary, for trial. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/4/2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-05633-NGG-MDG, 1:15-cv-00634-NGG-MDG (Lee, Tiffeny)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: The parties' cross-motions for judgment on the pleadings are DENIED. GEICO's motion to strike the third-through-eighth affirmative defenses is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; the court STRIKES Kusulas's third, fourth, fifth, and sixth affirmative defenses. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/31/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying Defendants' 8 11 Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/18/2014. (Chapin, Benjamin)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 10/2/2013. (Moo-Young, Jillian)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Company v. Saco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Diane K. Kanca
Represented By: Edward Griffin Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Kusulas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Saco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?