Bonano v. Staniszewski et al
Plaintiff: Michael Bonano
Defendant: Francis J. Caruso, Andrea W. Evans, William McCartney, Amanda Meeks, Sr. Parole Officer Ilene Staniszewski and Terrence X. Tracy
As An Entity: NY State Division of Parole
Case Number: 1:2012cv05879
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re 111 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 98 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendants' Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by NY State Division of Parole, Terrence X. Tracy, William McCartney, Ilene Staniszewski, Francis J. Ca --- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, upon due consideration and review, and including those portions of the Report and Recommendation issued by the Hon. Lois Bloom on September 2, 2016, ("R & R") to which the parties did not object, the recommendations contained in the R & R are adopted in their entirety. Accordingly, as there is no genuine issue of material fact, Defendants motion for summary judgment is granted, and this case is di smissed. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of appeal. This case was previously closed by Court Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Electronic Order and the Attached Written Memorandum and Order to pro se plaintiff. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 9/22/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 15 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Plaintiff's motion for recons ideration is denied. Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted only to the extent that Plaintiff's claim for relief based on Defendants' delay in resolving his early termination request is dismissed as time-barred. The remainder of De fendants' motion to dismiss is denied. This matter is referred to the magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings, including any additional discovery that may be necessary and settlement discussions. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Electronic Order and the Attached Memorandum and Order to pro se plaintiff. SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/21/2014. (Irizarry, Dora)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Dismissing certain Claims, and Ordering Issuance of Summons and Service of the Summons and Complaint - Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is grante d. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, while proceeding in forma pauperis, Plaintiff must pay the total $350 fee by monthly installments deducted from his prison trust fund account (or institutional equivalent).For the reasons set forth in the A TTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b). The summons shall issue, and the United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and complaint on the named defendants. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for purposes of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United State s, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Electronic Order and the Attached Written Memorandum and Order to pro se plaintiff. SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/29/2013. (Irizarry, Dora)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonano v. Staniszewski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bonano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis J. Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea W. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McCartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sr. Parole Officer Ilene Staniszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence X. Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
As an entity: NY State Division of Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?