Storms et al v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: |
A1 Procurement, LLC, Adrian Miguel Batlle and Derrick Ramon Storms |
Defendant: |
Department of Veterans Affairs |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00811 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Margo K. Brodie |
Presiding Judge: |
Ramon E. Reyes |
Nature of Suit: |
Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause of Action: |
05 U.S.C. § 702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 20, 2017 |
Filing
137
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (126) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting (126) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying (136) Objections to Conversion in case 1:13-cv-00811-MKB-RER. As discussed in the attached Memoran dum and Order, the Court converts Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' non-APA claims into a motion for summary judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. The Court grants Defendants' motion in its entirety. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/20/2017. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00811-MKB-RER, 1:14-cv-02359-MKB-RER (Haji, Sara)
|
November 20, 2015 |
Filing
111
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 106 & 107 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:13-cv-00811-MKB-RER. For the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court declines to reconsider 94 the March 16, 2015 Memorandum and Order. The Court also denies Plaintiffs' motion to certify an interlocutory appeal. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 11/20/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00811-MKB-RER, 1:14-cv-02359-MKB-RER (Rolle, Drew)
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing
94
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint 64 . In accordance with this order, Plaintiffs are permitted to file an Amende d Complaint within thirty days of this order, amending, to the extent possible, their RICO claim and their claims under the Declaratory Judgment Act and the APA regarding the Reconsideration Decision. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/16/2015. (Bewaji, Omolara)
|
July 16, 2014 |
Filing
86
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 53 Motion for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Discovery: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order, Judge Reyes' October 18, 2013 order is affirmed in its entirety. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 7/16/2014. (Bewaji, Omolara)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?