Desly International Corporation et al v. Otkrytoe Aktsionernoe Obshchestvo "Spartak" et al

Plaintiff: Desly International Corporation, Andrey Novikov, Marat Novikov and Olga Novikov
Defendant: Euro Import Bel LLC, Euro Import Distributions Inc., Euro Import Inc. and Otkrytoe Aktsionernoe Obshchestvo "Spartak"
Case Number: 1:2013cv02303
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Brooklyn Office
Referring Judge: Lois Bloom
Presiding Judge: Eric N. Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2017 192 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM, DECISION AND ORDER, For the reasons stated above, Spartak is not entitled to an award of profits from Desly's sale of the accused products. Desly is, however, permanently enjoined from using Spartak's name, marks, or logo in con nection with the sale of any products. Up to and including the entry of summary judgment, Spartak had prevailed on its claims arising, inter alia, under the Lanham Act and the exclusive agreement. Its claims failed thereafter. Within 10 days of the d ate this Memorandum, Decision and Order is docketed, Spartak shall notify the Court whether it intends to seek attorney's fees. No later than 10 days after the filing of any such notice of an intent to seek fees, the parties shall jointly propos e a briefing schedule for that purpose. If no such notice is given, within 10 days of the date such notice was due, the parties shall jointly propose a judgment or separately propose judgments for settlement, in accordance with this Order and the Court's 8/15/16 Memorandum and Order, Dkt. No. 104. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 10/28/17) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
June 13, 2017 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part motions in limine. 117 118 119 120 121 122 126 . Jury selection in this case is scheduled to take place on June 26, 2017. The parties - plaintiffs/counter-claim defendants Desly Interna tional Corporation, Marat Novikov, Olga Novikova, and Andrey Novikov (collectively "Desly"), defendant/counter-claim plaintiff Otkrytoe Aktsionernoe Obshchestvo "Spartak" ("Spartak"), and defendants/counter-claim plainti ffs Euro Import Distributions Inc., Euro Import Bel LLC, and Euro Import Inc. (collectively "Euro") - have filed various evidentiary motions in limine. Having considered the submissions of the parties, and following a pretrial confer ence on April 28, 2017 where certain issues raised in the motions were clarified, the motions in limine are resolved in the manner and for the reasons as set forth in the Court's June 13, 2017 Short Form Memorandum & Order. All remaining in limine motions and any other open matters will be addressed in forthcoming orders. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 6/13/2017. (Simeone, Julie)
August 29, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, pltffs' 60 motion for summary judgment is denied and Spartak's motion is granted as to the issues for which judgment was sought. Counsel for pltffs, Spartak and Euro Import are directed to contact United States Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom expeditiously to arrange for the scheduling of a conference leading to the entry of a final joint pretrial order and the scheduling of trial on the remaining issues of tortious interference with contract, unfair competition and damages. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 8/15/2016) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desly International Corporation et al v. Otkrytoe Aktsionernoe Obshchestvo "Spartak" et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desly International Corporation
Represented By: Wing K. Chiu
Represented By: Darren M. Geliebter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrey Novikov
Represented By: Wing K. Chiu
Represented By: Darren M. Geliebter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marat Novikov
Represented By: Wing K. Chiu
Represented By: Darren M. Geliebter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Novikov
Represented By: Wing K. Chiu
Represented By: Darren M. Geliebter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro Import Bel LLC
Represented By: Alec Sauchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro Import Distributions Inc.
Represented By: Alec Sauchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro Import Inc.
Represented By: Alec Sauchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otkrytoe Aktsionernoe Obshchestvo "Spartak"
Represented By: Hanna M. Mosolygo
Represented By: John F. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?