Harris v. County of Nassau et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Harris
Defendant: County of Nassau, Michelle Haddad, Kathleen Rice, Detective Rispoli and P.O. Velte
Case Number: 1:2013cv04728
Filed: August 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G. Garaufis
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Levy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: The court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to file a Second Amended Complaint and GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Defendants' 30 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's due process claim may proceed. All other claims by Plaintiff are DISMISSED. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/23/2016. (c/m to pro se) (Lee, Tiffeny)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM & ORDER re 10 Motion to Stay. For the foregoing reasons and in the interest of judicial economy, County Defendants' Motion to Stay these proceedings is GRANTED, pending resolution of Plaintiff's criminal proceedings. Pla intiff's challenge to the legality of his confinement is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All deadlines, including County Defendants' time to answer, will be held in abeyance, until the resolution of the criminal case. Within 30 days of the resolution of the criminal case, County Defendants shall inform the court by letter of the status of that case. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/8/2014. (c/m to pro se) (Lee, Tiffeny)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief, including a preliminary injunction and continued federal oversight of his state crim inal case, is DENIED. Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Defendants Rice and Haddad are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By October 18, 2013, Plaintiff must file an Amended Complaint that names the individuals personally responsible for the alleged denial of his constitutional rights. See document for full detail. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/13/2013. (c/m to pro se) (Lee, Tiffeny)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. County of Nassau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Nassau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Rispoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Velte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?