Excellent Home Care Services, LLC v. FGA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Excellent Home Care Services, LLC
Defendant: FGA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv05390
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: I. Leo Glasser
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L. Pollak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, A Report was made to the court dated September 4,2018 in which the Mag. Judge recommended that the plaintiff be precluded from using any documents to establish the defendant's liability or its damages, unless furnished by that date. It also Ordered that the partiescomplete depositions by November 2, 2018. That Report also advised that any objections to it must be filed within 14 days, DE 118, and that a failure to do so constituted a waiver of furt her judicial review. A review of the carefully considered and reasoned report by the very able and experienced Mag. Judge would have moved this court to adopt its recommendation, waiver notwithstanding, and it is. So Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/28/2018. (Layne, Monique)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING 97 Motion for Attorney Fees, DENYING 96 Motion for Leave to Electronically File under Seal & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 103 : Having reviewed both the billing records and the time spent litigating this sanctions motion, the Cour t finds that the number of hours billed by FGA's counsel is not excessive. Thus, in light of the rates and hours discussed above, the Court awards $13,967.90 in fees and costs. Additionally, the Court Orders plaintiff to Show Cause by No vember 10, 2017 why the case should not be dismissed, or an order of preclusion entered, based on plaintiff's continued violations of this Court's Orders and its discovery obligations under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Finally, the Court denies FGA's motion to file its billing records under seal and Orders that FGA re-submit these records and attorney affidavits on the public docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/23/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 2/4/2015. (Russell, Alexandra)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 8/27/2014.(Ewald, Sylvia)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 2/19/2014.(Ewald, Sylvia)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Excellent Home Care Services, LLC v. FGA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Excellent Home Care Services, LLC
Represented By: Barry R. Feerst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FGA, Inc.
Represented By: Sam Della Fera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?