Cohen et al v. G&M Realty L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cohen, Christian Cortes, Rodrigo Henter De Rezende, Esteban Del Valle, Stephen Ebert, Sandra Fabara, Francisco Fernandez, Carlos Game, Luis Lamboy, Steven Lew, Thomas Lucero, Danielle Mastrion, Akiko Miyakami, Alice Mizrachi, James Rocco, Dustin Spagnola and William Tramontozzi, Jr.
Defendant: 22-50 Jackson Avenue Owners, L.P., 22-52 Jackson Avenue, LLC, ACD Citiview Buildings, LLC, G&M Realty L.P. and Gerald Wolkoff
Counter Claimant: 22-50 Jackson Avenue Owners, L.P., 22-52 Jackson Avenue, LLC, ACD Citiview Buildings, LLC, G&M Realty L.P. and Gerald Wolkoff
Counter Defendant: Jonathan Cohen
Case Number: 1:2013cv05612
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Joan M. Azrack
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying, without prejudice, 200 Motion for Bond. Defendants are directed to promptly disclose to plaintiffs' counsel the financial information with which they offered to furnish the Court. The parties shall further confer in good faith to resolve this dispute. If they are unable to reach a resolution, either side may seek the Court's approval of a particularized proposed form of security; the parties' submissions should be supported by evidentiary (financial) material, which may be filed under seal, with access limited to case participants. See attached for discussion. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/22/2018. (Proujansky, Josh)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: Defendants motions 189 are denied in their entirety. See attached Memorandum and Order for details. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/13/2018. (Innelli, Michael)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: While defendants proposed bond covers only the amount of judgment, the Court is satisfied that defendants, well-financed real estate companies and their wealthy owner, will be fiscally able to pay interest and costs after the appellate process ends. Therefore, the proposed bond is approved, and enforcement of judgment is stayed pending appeal. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/15/2018. (Innelli, Michael)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: Defendants motion 177 seeking a stay is granted in part and denied in part. In the exercise of its discretion, the Court grants defendants a seven-day extension of the current stay until March 14, 2018. This will afford defend ants a total of 21 days from judgment to secure a supersedeas bond or, alternatively, an appropriate letter of credit. Regardless of which, if any, is presented to the Court, it will rule on its adequacy when submitted. Defendants alternative motion to stay pending post- trial motions is denied as premature, as no such motions have been filed. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/6/2018. (Innelli, Michael)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 DECISION: This is the Court's written decision in what has commonly become know as the 5Pointz litigation. The Court finds in favor of the plaintiffs in the amounts determined in this decision. Judgement will be entered shortly. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/12/2018. (Innelli, Michael)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order, the defendants motion for summary judgment 121 is GRANTED as to the plaintiffs claims for conversion, property damage, and IIED, but DENIED as to the plaintiffs VARA claim, and the plaintiffs motion for summary judgment 120 is GRANTED with respect to the defendants counterclaim. Accordingly, the matter shall proceed to trial on the VARA claim issue. In addition, as the plaintiffs counsel was unable to spec ify the number of artwork at issue, counsel is directed to submit a final list to the defendants and the Court on or before May 1, 2017. Depending on the length of the list, the Court reserves judgment as to whether the list is short enough to be handled by a single jury. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/31/2017. (Innelli, Michael)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 79 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. For the reasons explained in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies plaintiffs' motion to amend, as they have not shown good cause for doing so almost one year after the expiration of the court-ordered deadline for amending the pleadings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 3/13/2015.(Williams, Jennifer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen et al v. G&M Realty L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: 22-50 Jackson Avenue Owners, L.P.
Represented By: David G. Ebert
Represented By: Alissa Friedman
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: 22-52 Jackson Avenue, LLC
Represented By: David G. Ebert
Represented By: Alissa Friedman
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ACD Citiview Buildings, LLC
Represented By: David G. Ebert
Represented By: Alissa Friedman
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: G&M Realty L.P.
Represented By: David G. Ebert
Represented By: Alissa Friedman
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Gerald Wolkoff
Represented By: David G. Ebert
Represented By: Alissa Friedman
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 22-50 Jackson Avenue Owners, L.P.
Represented By: David G. Ebert
Represented By: Alissa Friedman
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 22-52 Jackson Avenue, LLC
Represented By: David G. Ebert
Represented By: Alissa Friedman
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACD Citiview Buildings, LLC
Represented By: David G. Ebert
Represented By: Alissa Friedman
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&M Realty L.P.
Represented By: David G. Ebert
Represented By: Alissa Friedman
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Wolkoff
Represented By: David G. Ebert
Represented By: Alissa Friedman
Represented By: Mioko Catherine Tajika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jonathan Cohen
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cohen
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Cortes
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigo Henter De Rezende
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Del Valle
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Ebert
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Fabara
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Fernandez
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Game
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Lamboy
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lew
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lucero
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Mastrion
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akiko Miyakami
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Mizrachi
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rocco
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Spagnola
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Tramontozzi, Jr.
Represented By: Roland Acevedo
Represented By: Jeannine Leigh Widmer Chanes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?