Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Landi et al
Plaintiff: |
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. |
Defendant: |
B.W.T. Tailor Shop Corp. and Benjamin Landi |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv05822 |
Filed: |
October 24, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Roslynn R. Mauskopf |
Presiding Judge: |
James Orenstein |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1345 Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 13, 2018 |
Filing
38
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Rule 72, the Court has reviewed the R&R for clear error and, finding none, concurs with the R&R in its entirety. See Covey v. Simonton, 481 F. Supp. 2d 224, 226 (E.D.N.Y. 2007). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment pursuant to this Order and close the case. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 3/13/2018. (Taronji, Robert)
|
September 22, 2015 |
Filing
31
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons stated in the attached Order,the Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Orenstein, overrules the limited objections of plaintiff Wells Fargo, and orders the foll owing: The Court awards judgment on default in favor of Wells Fargo and against defendant Benjamin Landi on its cause of action for mortgage foreclosure. That judgment shall permit the foreclosure and sale of the Property, and judgment against Land i in the amount of $1,413,663.01 (including unpaid principal of $953,310.30; interest in the amount of $411,457.87; late charges in the amount of $3,504.78; a prepayment fee of $38,132.41; attorneys fees in the amount of  6;5,553.75; and $1,703.90 in litigation costs.) The Court denies any award for UCC fees, interest on advances, inspection fees and witness expenses.The Court denies in its entirety Wells Fargos motion for default judgment against defendant B.W.T. Tailor Shop Corp. and dismisses the claim against this defendant.The Clerk of Court shall enter Judgment accordingly, and close the case. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 9/22/2015. (Mauskopf, Roslynn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?