Gluco Perfect, LLC et al v. Perfect Gluco Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gluco Perfect, LLC, Joy Mernone and U.S. Health & Home Care, Inc.
Defendant: Francine Freiman, William J. Gillen, John and Jane Does 1 through 10, Perfect Gluco Products, Inc., Andre Ramnauth and USHH Products, Inc.
Interested Party: Glenn Mernone and Perfect Care, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01678
Filed: March 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A. Matsumoto
Presiding Judge: Ramon E. Reyes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 1/7/2016. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, plaintiffs motion for default judgment is denied. The court also denies plaintiffs motion in the alternative to strike the Answer. Pursuant to Judge Reyes Order dated November 24, 2015, the parties must file pre-motion letters for any dispositive motions within two weeks of the date of this Memorandum and Order. (Gong, LiJia)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 10/3/2014. (Keefe, Reed)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 34 Letter filed by Gluco Perfect, LLC, 35 Letter filed by Perfect Gluco Products, Inc., Francine Freiman, William J. Gillen, USHH Products, Inc. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/26/2014. (Keefe, Reed)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/19/2014. (Keefe, Reed)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gluco Perfect, LLC et al v. Perfect Gluco Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francine Freiman
Represented By: Michael Myer Steinmetz
Represented By: Joshua Adam Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Gillen
Represented By: Michael Myer Steinmetz
Represented By: Joshua Adam Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perfect Gluco Products, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Myer Steinmetz
Represented By: Joshua Adam Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Ramnauth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USHH Products, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Myer Steinmetz
Represented By: Joshua Adam Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gluco Perfect, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Heiser
Represented By: Howard J. Kaplan
Represented By: Michelle Amy Rice
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Mernone
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Heiser
Represented By: Howard J. Kaplan
Represented By: Michelle Amy Rice
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Health & Home Care, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Thomas Heiser
Represented By: Howard J. Kaplan
Represented By: Michelle Amy Rice
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Glenn Mernone
Represented By: Christine A. Chester
Represented By: Mitchell J. Devack
Represented By: Thomas Yanega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Perfect Care, Inc.
Represented By: Christine A. Chester
Represented By: Mitchell J. Devack
Represented By: Thomas Yanega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?