Moses v. Apple Hospitality REIT, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Moses
Defendant: Apple Hospitality REIT, Inc., Glenn W. Bunting, Kent W. Colton, Anthony Francis Keating, III, Lisa B. Kern, Glade M. Knight, Bruce H. Matson, Bryan Peery, Ronald A. Rosenfeld, Michael S. Waters and Robert M. Wily
Case Number: 1:2014cv03131
Filed: May 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Steven M. Gold
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 70 Motion to Certify Class; granting 71 Motion for Attorney Fees. For the reasons and to the extent described herein, plaintiff's motions are granted. Specifically, the Court orders that: final certification is granted to t he class described herein for purposes of settlement; the Settlement Agreement, including its proposed plan of allocation, is approved; the law firms of Salas Wang LLC, Eccleston Law, LLC, and Law Office of Christopher J. Gray, P.C. are appointed Cla ss Counsel; Class counsel are awarded attorneys' fees equaling 25% of the Settlement fund, or $1,375,000; Class counsel's request for reimbursement of $24,844.66 of litigation expenses is approved; and Susan Moses is appointed class representative and granted a $10,000 service award. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 3/27/2018. (Metzger, Daniel)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Certify Class. The proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement, Preliminarily Certifying Settlement Class, and Appointing Interim Class Counsel, filed as Docket Entry 67, is hereby approved and entered as an Order of the Court. A FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 16, 2018 AT 4:30 PM IN COURTROOM 13D. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/19/2017. (Gold, Steven)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER directing counsel to submit a revised version of the proposed Order Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement by September 18, 2017 that includes suggested dates for each relevant event, after contacting my chambers to determine the Court's availability for a final fairness hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 9/11/2017. (Gold, Steven)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, defendant's motion to dismiss the second amended complaint is denied in part and granted only to the extent that plaintiff's claim of breach of implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing is dismissed. This matter is referred to the magistrate judge for further pretrial proceedings. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 9/30/2016. (Irizarry, Dora)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Defendants' motion to strike is denied. Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted. Plaintiff� 39;s motion for leave to amend is granted in part and denied in part. Counts I-VI are dismissed with prejudice. Count VII is dismissed without prejudice, and leave to amend is granted in accordance with the Court's opinion. Any amended complai nt must be filed NO LATER THAN APRIL 6, 2015. Failure to comply by April 6, 2015 will result in entry of an order of dismissal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to hold closure of this case in abeyance pending the filing of an Amended Complaint in compliance with this Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/9/2015. (Irizarry, Dora)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses v. Apple Hospitality REIT, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Hospitality REIT, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn W. Bunting
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent W. Colton
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Francis Keating, III
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa B. Kern
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glade M. Knight
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce H. Matson
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Peery
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Waters
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Wily
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Michelle M. Christian
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Edwards
Represented By: Richard L. Jarashow
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McMahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Moses
Represented By: James J. Eccleston
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Goodrich
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?