Short et al v. Churchill Benefit Corporation
Plaintiff: John Volny and Daniel Short
Defendant: Churchill Benefit Corporation, Framestore, Inc., The Mill Group, Inc., Mark Ticar, Quietman, Inc., Richard McCann, Brand New School, Inc., Suspect, Inc., Digital Kitchen, LLC, Smoke and Mirrors, LLC, PandaPanther, Inc., The Lab, Inc., Logan, Inc. and Churchill Benefit Corporation doing business as Yurcor
Case Number: 1:2014cv04561
Filed: July 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 JUDGMENT. The Court grants Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses and Incentive Award and awards Plaintiff $408,000 in fees for Class Counsel, $39,655.21 in litigation expenses, and an incentive award of $5,000.00 for Plaintiff Short, to be paid according to the terms set forth in the Settlement Agreement. This Action shall be dismissed with prejudice and without costs (except as otherwise provided herein). Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/2/2017. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
May 24, 2017 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Margo K. Brodie: Motion for final settlement approval held on 5/23/17. Pamina Ewing and Gaitri Boodhoo appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs, and Stuart Libicki appeared telephonically on behalf of Plaintiffs. Amanda Van Hoose Garofalo and Brian Murphy appeared on behalf of Defendants. The Court found the settlement fair, reasonable an adequate, certified the class for purposes of settlement, and found both the attorneys' fees and incentive award reasonable. The Court therefore granted #150 Motion for Settlement; granted #151 Motion for Settlement; and granted #158 Motion for Settlement. The Clerk of Court is requested to enter judgment on behalf of Plaintiffs in the amount of $1,074,500, with Defendant Framestore to pay $999,500 and Defendant Yurcor to pay $75,000 of that amount. Plaintiffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $408,000 and expenses in the amount of $39,655.21, and Plaintiff Daniel Short is awarded an incentive award of $5,000. (Court Reporter Victoria Torres-Butler.)(Haji, Sara)
May 15, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lee Van Hoose on behalf of Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, Mark Ticar (aty to be noticed) (Van Hoose, Amanda)
May 10, 2017 Filing 159 Motion to Appear by Telephone by Daniel Short. (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #159 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/10/2017. (Haji, Sara)
May 8, 2017 Filing 158 MOTION for Settlement by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 8, 2017 Filing 157 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #151 MOTION for Settlement , #150 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Cunningham Declaration filed by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 8, 2017 Filing 156 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #151 MOTION for Settlement , #150 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Short Declaration filed by Daniel Short. (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 8, 2017 Filing 155 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #151 MOTION for Settlement , #150 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Ewing Affidavit filed by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 8, 2017 Filing 154 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #151 MOTION for Settlement , #150 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Grebow Affidavit filed by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 8, 2017 Filing 153 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #151 MOTION for Settlement , #150 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 8, 2017 Filing 152 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #151 MOTION for Settlement , #150 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 8, 2017 Filing 151 MOTION for Settlement by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Incentive Award) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 8, 2017 Filing 150 Joint MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of the Parties' Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 5, 2017 Settlement Hearing is scheduled for May 23, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #147 Motion for Preliminary Settlement. The parties joint motion for preliminary approval is granted, with the few reservations expressed in this Memorandum and Order. The following schedule will govern the remainder of this action: On or before February 20, 2017, Defendants counsel will provide the Settlement Claims Administrator and class counsel with the Class Member mailing list, in electronic form, containing each individuals name, last known address and email address. On or before March 6, 2017, the Settlement Claims Administrator will mail the Proposed Class Notice to each Class Member. Class Members will have thirty (30) days from the date the Proposed Class Notice is mailed or emailed to submit written objections to the Settlement Agreement. Class Members will have forty-five (45) days from the date the Proposed Class Notice is mailed to opt out of the Settlement Agreement. No later than fifteen (15) days before the Final Approval Hearing, the parties will file their motion for final approval of the settlement, and class counsel will file their motion for attorneys fees and any additional information regarding Plaintiffs incentive award. On May 23, 2017 the Court will conduct a Final Approval Hearing on the Settlement Agreement. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/10/2017. (Haji, Sara)
December 5, 2016 Filing 148 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Framestore, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
December 5, 2016 Filing 147 Joint MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION BY ALL PARTIES FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF CLASS ACTION, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF GAITRI BOODHOO IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION BY ALL PARTIES FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF CLASS ACTION WITH EXHIBITS A - G, #3 Proposed Judgment PROPOSED ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #148 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The telephone conference previously scheduled for December 6, 2016 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/5/2016. (Miao, Tiffany)
November 17, 2016 Filing 146 STATUS REPORT In Connection with 11/18/16 Conference by Daniel Short (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re #146 Status Report -- The telephone conference previously scheduled for November 18, 2016 is rescheduled for December 6, 2016, at 12:30 p.m. If a motion to approve the proposed settlement is filed and granted before then, I will cancel the conference; otherwise, counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call and conference in chambers when all parties are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 11/17/2016. (Klewin, Erin)
October 11, 2016 Filing 145 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference And Adjust Other Scheduled Dates by Framestore, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #145 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion to adjourn is granted. The telephone conference previously scheduled for October 14, 2016 is rescheduled for November 18, 2016, at 12:30 p.m. If a motion for preliminary approval is filed by November 16, 2016, I will cancel the conference; otherwise, counsel for the plaintiffs shall initiate the call and conference in chambers when all parties are on the line. There will be no further adjournments granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/11/2016. (Klewin, Erin)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #144 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion to adjourn is granted. The telephone conference previously scheduled for September 30, 2016 is rescheduled for October 14, 2016, at 12:30 p.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed by October 12, 2016, I will cancel the conference; otherwise, counsel for the plaintiffs shall initiate the call and conference in chambers when all parties are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/20/2016. (Klewin, Erin)
September 19, 2016 Filing 144 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference And Adjust Other Scheduled Dates by Framestore, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #143 Case Management Statement -- The status conference previously scheduled for August 18, 2016 is cancelled. A telephone conference will be held on September 30, 2016, at 12:30 p.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed by September 28, 2016, I will cancel the conference; otherwise, counsel for the plaintiffs shall initiate the call and conference in chambers when all parties are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/17/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER withdrawing #126 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; withdrawing #130 Motion to Strike; withdrawing #132 Motion to Stay -- See docket entry #143 ("All pending motions by Defendants are hereby withdrawn as part of the settlement."). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/17/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn)
August 16, 2016 Filing 143 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
July 27, 2016 Filing 142 Letter to Judge Margo K. Brodie re: Courtesy Copies of Documents Submitted in Connection with McCann's and Ticar's Motion to Dismiss and Defendants' Motion to Strike Class Allegations by Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, Mark Ticar (Traub, Amy)
July 27, 2016 Filing 141 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #130 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations for Defendants Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, and Mark Ticar filed by Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, Mark Ticar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents to Yucor) (Traub, Amy)
July 27, 2016 Filing 140 REPLY in Support re #130 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations for Defendants Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, and Mark Ticar filed by Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, Mark Ticar. (Traub, Amy)
July 27, 2016 Filing 139 REPLY in Support re #126 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Richard McCann, Mark Ticar. (Traub, Amy)
July 27, 2016 Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re #130 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations for Defendants Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, and Mark Ticar filed by Daniel Short. (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
July 27, 2016 Filing 137 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #126 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
July 20, 2016 Filing 136 Letter Letter to Counsel Re: Service by Daniel Short (Brualdi, Richard)
July 6, 2016 Filing 135 Letter to Judge Orenstein Pursuant to Your Honor's July 1, 2016 Order by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Traub, Amy)
July 6, 2016 Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #132 Letter MOTION to Stay Class Discovery Pending the Court's Decision on Motion to Strike Class Allegations filed by Daniel Short. (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER, Parties are directed to respond to re #132 Letter MOTION to Stay Class Discovery Pending the Court's Decision on Motion to Strike Class Allegations filed by Framestore, Inc. by July 6, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/1/2016. (Piper, Francine)
June 30, 2016 Filing 132 Letter MOTION to Stay Class Discovery Pending the Court's Decision on Motion to Strike Class Allegations by Framestore, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
June 29, 2016 Filing 131 MEMORANDUM in Support re #130 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations for Defendants Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, and Mark Ticar filed by Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, Mark Ticar. (Traub, Amy)
June 29, 2016 Filing 130 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations for Defendants Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, and Mark Ticar by Churchill Benefit Corporation, Richard McCann, Mark Ticar. (Traub, Amy)
June 29, 2016 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM in Support re #126 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Richard McCann, Mark Ticar. (Traub, Amy)
June 29, 2016 Filing 128 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #126 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Declaration of Richard McCann in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Richard McCann, Mark Ticar. (Traub, Amy)
June 29, 2016 Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #126 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Declaration of Mark Ticar in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Richard McCann, Mark Ticar. (Traub, Amy)
June 29, 2016 Filing 126 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Richard McCann, Mark Ticar. (Traub, Amy)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER as to #125 Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss and motion to strike. Defendants shall move on or before June 29, 2016. Plaintiff shall oppose on or before July 20, 2016. Defendants shall reply, if at all, by July 27, 2016. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/23/2016. (Haji, Sara)
June 22, 2016 Filing 125 Proposed Scheduling Order for Motions to Dismiss and Strike by Richard McCann, Mark Ticar (Mersol, Gregory)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #122 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The parties are directed to confer and file a proposed briefing schedule for the anticipated motions. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/13/2016. (Haji, Sara)
June 8, 2016 Filing 124 Second ANSWER to #121 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
June 6, 2016 Filing 123 RESPONSE to Motion re #122 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Daniel Short. (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 31, 2016 Filing 122 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Mersol, Gregory)
May 31, 2016 Filing 121 ANSWER to #114 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Churchill Benefit Corporation by Framestore, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
May 31, 2016 Filing 120 ANSWER to #114 Amended Complaint by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants to serve any discovery requests by: June 15, 2016. Defendants to serve responses to Plaintiff's discovery requests by: July 10, 2016. Plaintiff to serve responses to Defendants' discovery requests, if any, within: 60 days of receipt of Defendants' discovery requests. Depositions to be taken between: August 15, 2016 and September 30, 2016. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): August 18, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. Any party may file a request for a pre-motion conference regarding class certification by: December 5, 2016. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): January 3, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. Joint pretrial order due by: February 14, 2017. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/19/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #118 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Daniel Short -- The proposed scheduling order, docket entry #118 , is So Ordered. I will enter a separate amended scheduling order reflecting the new deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/19/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn)
May 17, 2016 Filing 118 Proposed Scheduling Order by Daniel Short (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
May 16, 2016 Filing 117 Summons Issued as Second Amended Complaint as to Richard McCann, Mark Ticar. (Attachments: #1 Richard Summons) (Piper, Francine)
May 13, 2016 Filing 116 Proposed Summons. Re #114 Amended Complaint by Daniel Short (Brualdi, Richard)
May 13, 2016 Filing 115 Proposed Summons. Re #114 Amended Complaint by Daniel Short (Brualdi, Richard)
May 13, 2016 Filing 114 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Churchill Benefit Corporation, Framestore, Inc., Richard McCann, Mark Ticar, filed by Daniel Short. (Brualdi, Richard)
May 11, 2016 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Christina Watson on behalf of Daniel Short (aty to be noticed) (Watson, Lauren)
May 10, 2016 Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Status Conference held on 5/10/2016. I heard the arguments on counsel on the motion to amend the complaint, and no party sought an opportunity to submit further briefing. For the reasons set forth on the record, I granted the motion. The plaintiff will promptly file the Amended Complaint, and the parties will submit a proposed schedule for all remaining pretrial matters by May 17, 2016. Upon reviewing the latter submission, I will schedule further proceedings as appropriate. (Orenstein, James)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #106 Motion for Pre Motion Conference -- see docket entry #112 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/10/2016. (Orenstein, James)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #110 Letter filed by PandaPanther, Inc. -- Attorney Alan Ira Model terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/2/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn)
April 29, 2016 Filing 111 Letter requesting to be removed from ECF notifications by PandaPanther, Inc. (Spataro, Amber)
April 29, 2016 Filing 110 Letter requesting to be removed from ECF notifications by PandaPanther, Inc. (Model, Alan)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #109 Motion to appear by telephone -- Any attorney seeking to present oral argument on the motion shall appear in person; any other counsel of record may appear by telephone. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/29/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn)
April 28, 2016 Filing 109 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Letter Motion to Appear by Telephone at May 10, 2016 Pre-Motion Conference. by Daniel Short. (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re #106 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to address the filing of a motion to amend Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Daniel Short -- A conference will be held on May 10, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/26/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn)
April 21, 2016 Filing 108 Letter in Response to Plaintiff's Letter Motion Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference to Address the Filing of an Amended Complaint by Framestore, Inc. (Murphy, Brian)
April 21, 2016 Filing 107 Letter in Response to Plaintiff's Letter Motion Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference to Address the Filing of an Amended Complaint by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-EMail) (Mersol, Gregory)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #106 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to address the filing of a motion to amend Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Daniel Short -- Defendants are respectfully directed to respond to plaintiff's letter motion, docket entry #106 , no later than April 21, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/14/2016. (Smerd, Jocelyn)
April 12, 2016 Filing 106 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to address the filing of a motion to amend Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint by Daniel Short. (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying #69 #73 #82 Motions for Summary Judgment. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court denies the parties' motions for summary judgment. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/8/2016. (Rolle, Drew)
March 7, 2016 Filing 104 STATUS REPORT by Daniel Short (Brualdi, Richard)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order STATUS REPORT ORDER. On or before March 11, 2016, the parties shall update the Court in writing as to the status the their settlement discussions and whether any party intends to seek a further stay of proceedings. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 3/7/2016. (Rolle, Drew)
February 5, 2016 Filing 103 Letter MOTION to Stay Decision on Summary Judgment Through February 10 Pending Settlement Discussions by Framestore, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #97 Motion for Discovery; granting in part and denying in part #101 Motion to Stay; granting #103 Motion to Stay. Because Plaintiff is in possession of the relevant information requested, the Court denies Plaintiff's motion for discovery in aid of mediation. The Court grants the parties' motions to stay the motion for summary judgment until February 10, 2016. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 2/5/2016. (Rolle, Drew)
February 4, 2016 Filing 102 Letter in Response to the Letter Motion Filed by Plaintiff's Counsel on February 3, 2016 by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Mersol, Gregory)
February 3, 2016 Filing 101 Letter MOTION to Stay re #97 Letter MOTION for Discovery in aid of Mediation, #99 Letter Requesting Continued Stay and Discovery by Daniel Short. (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
January 28, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Margo K. Brodie: Oral argument on the parties' motions for summary judgment and motion to stay pending mediation. Stuart Libicki and Gaitri Boodhoo appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Brian D. Murphy and Jonathan Stoler appeared on behalf of Framestore. Jeffrey Vlasek appeared on behalf of Churchill Benefit Corporation d/b/a Yurcor. The Court heard oral argument on the pending motions for summary judgment and reserved decision. For reasons stated on the record, the Court will stay the pending motion for summary judgment until completion of Framestore and Plaintiff's mediation on January 29, 2016. Court Reporter Marie Foley.) (Rolle, Drew)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #100 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall appear in person at the January 28, 2016 hearing. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/20/2016. (Rolle, Drew)
January 18, 2016 Filing 100 Motion to Appear by Telephone by Daniel Short. (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
January 14, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on #98 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Between Plaintiff Short and Framestore, Inc. Pending Mediation: The parties should also be prepared to address any issues raised in their pending Summary Judgment papers. Oral argument is set for January 26, 2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
January 14, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on #98 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Between Plaintiff Short and Framestore, Inc. Pending Mediation : The date and time has been CHANGED to January 28, 2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
December 21, 2015 Filing 99 Letter to Judge Brodie from Gregory V. Mersol in Response to the Letter Motion and the Motion to Stay the Proceedings (Docket Nos. 97 & 98). by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Mersol, Gregory)
December 17, 2015 Filing 98 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Between Plaintiff Short and Framestore, Inc. Pending Mediation by Framestore, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
December 17, 2015 Filing 97 Letter MOTION for Discovery in aid of Mediation by Framestore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Murphy, Brian)
September 3, 2015 Filing 96 Letter respectfully requesting to be removed from ECF notifications by PandaPanther, Inc. (Spataro, Amber)
September 1, 2015 Filing 95 Letter Regarding Courtesy Copies of the Declaration of Alanna Williams in Support of Yurcor's Motion for Summary Judgment by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 94 Letter Regarding Courtesy Copies of all Papers filed in Connection with Defendant Churchill Benefit Corporation d/b/a Yurcor's Motion for Summary Judgment by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 93 Letter Regarding Courtesy Copies of all Papers filed in Connection with Plaintiff Daniel Short's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Daniel Short (Brualdi, Richard)
August 31, 2015 Filing 92 REPLY in Opposition re #90 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Libicki Declaration with Exhibit 48) (Brualdi, Richard)
August 31, 2015 Filing 91 Letter Regarding Service of Defendant Churchill's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit / Affirmation of Amy J. Traub, Esq. in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Defendant Churchill Benefit Corporation's Response to Plaintiff's Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Facts) (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 89 Letter Regarding Service of Reply Papers in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 88 REPLY in Support re #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit / Affirmation of Amy J. Traub in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Alanna Williams's Deposition, #3 Exhibit B - Copy of Exhibit 70, #4 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Plaintiff's Deposition) (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #84 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #86 Rule 56.1 Statement, #85 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #83 Memorandum in Support filed by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Response to Defendant Churchill Benefit Corp d/b/a Yurcor's Rule 56.1 Statement, #2 Libicki Declaration with Exhibits 36-39, #3 Short Declaration) (Brualdi, Richard)
August 31, 2015 Filing 86 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Declaration of Alanna Williams in Support Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment /Affirmation of Amy J. Traub, Esq. filed by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Alanna Williams's Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Plaintiff Daniel Short's Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Mary Jenson's Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Alanna Williams, #5 Exhibit E - Copy of the Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Stipulation of Dismissal) (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Support re #82 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Traub, Amy)
August 31, 2015 Filing 81 Letter re: Courtesy Copies of All Papers Associated with Framestore's Motion for Summary Judgment by Framestore, Inc. (Murphy, Brian)
August 31, 2015 Filing 80 REPLY in Opposition re #77 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Libicki Declaration with Exhibit 48) (Brualdi, Richard)
August 31, 2015 Filing 79 REPLY in Support re #69 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Framestore, Inc.. (Stoler, Jonathan)
August 31, 2015 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #69 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment Submitted on Reply filed by Framestore, Inc.. (Stoler, Jonathan)
August 31, 2015 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Framestore, Inc.. (Stoler, Jonathan)
August 31, 2015 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Framestore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Stoler, Jonathan)
August 31, 2015 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #69 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Rule 56.1 Statement Response to Defendant Framestore, Inc.'s Local Rule 56.1 Statement, #2 Declaration Libicki Declaration with Exhibits 40-47, #3 Declaration Short Declaration) (Brualdi, Richard)
August 31, 2015 Filing 74 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re #73 MOTION for Summary Judgment Counterstatement of Facts filed by Framestore, Inc.. (Stoler, Jonathan)
August 31, 2015 Filing 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Daniel Short. Responses due by 8/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Rule 56.1 Statement, #3 Declaration Libicki Declaration with Exhibits 1-35, #4 Declaration Short Declaration with Exhibits 1-12) (Brualdi, Richard)
August 31, 2015 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Support re #69 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Framestore, Inc.. (Stoler, Jonathan)
August 31, 2015 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #69 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Framestore, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit) (Stoler, Jonathan)
August 31, 2015 Filing 70 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re #69 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Framestore, Inc.. (Stoler, Jonathan)
August 31, 2015 Filing 69 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment by Framestore, Inc.. (Stoler, Jonathan)
August 31, 2015 Filing 68 Letter re: Service of Reply Papers in Support of Summary Judgment by Framestore, Inc. (Murphy, Brian)
August 10, 2015 Filing 67 Letter re: Service of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Framestore, Inc. (Murphy, Brian)
August 10, 2015 Filing 66 Letter Regarding Service of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff Daniel Short's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Traub, Amy)
August 10, 2015 Filing 65 Letter Regarding Service of Plaintiff Short's Oppositions to the Motions for Summary Judgment by Defendants Churchill Benefit Corp. d/b/a Yurcor and Framestore, Inc. by Daniel Short (Brualdi, Richard)
June 26, 2015 Filing 64 Letter Regarding Service of Defendant Churchill's Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Traub, Amy)
June 26, 2015 Filing 63 Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel re: Framestore's Service of Motion for Summary Judgment by Framestore, Inc. (Murphy, Brian)
June 26, 2015 Filing 62 Letter Regarding Service of Plaintiff Short's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Papers by Daniel Short (Brualdi, Richard)
May 14, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Margo K. Brodie: Pre-Motion Conference held on May 14, 2015 re #53 #54 #55 Letters and Letter motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Stuart Libicki and Gaitri Boodhoo appeared on behalf of plaintiff. Arthur Grebow appeared via telephone also on behalf of plaintiff. Brian Murphy appeared on behalf of defendant Framestore. Amy Traub appeared on behalf of defendant Churchill Benefit Corporation. For the reasons stated on the record, plaintiff's claims for violations of New York Labor Law Sections 193 and 195 against Churchill Benefit Corporation are dismissed. The Court established the following motion schedule: defendants' motion for summary judgment and plaintiff's cross motion for partial summary judgment shall be served on or before June 26, 2015; the parties shall serve their responses on or before August 10, 2015, and the parties shall serve their replies, if any, on or before August 31, 2015. The parties are to comply with the Court's motion practice. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Rolle, Drew)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Dismissing Parties. Party Churchill Benefit Corporation, d/b/a Yurcor, terminated. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/30/2015. (Riquelme, Claudia)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Motion to permit Arthur Grebow, plaintiff's co-lead counsel, to Appear by telephone to the pre-motion conference scheduled for May 14, 2015. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/30/2015. (Riquelme, Claudia)
April 30, 2015 Filing 59 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff Volny's Claims Against Churchill Benefit Corporation by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Mersol, Gregory)
April 29, 2015 Filing 58 Letter Motion to Appear by Telephone at May 14, 2015 Pre-Motion Conference by Daniel Short. (Brualdi, Richard)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order Dismissing Parties. Party PandaPanther, Inc. terminated. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/22/2015. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
April 15, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Premotion Conference sis scheduled for May 14, 2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6F North before Judge Margo K. Brodie. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #55 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Pre Motion Conference is scheduled for May 14, 2015 at 10:00 am. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/15/2015. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
April 10, 2015 Filing 56 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to PandaPanther by PandaPanther, Inc. (Spataro, Amber)
March 27, 2015 Filing 55 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to address the filing of a motion for a partial summary judgment by Daniel Short. (Brualdi, Richard)
March 27, 2015 Filing 54 Letter Requesting Permission to File Motion for Summary Judgment Against Claims of Plaintiff Short by Framestore, Inc. (Murphy, Brian)
March 27, 2015 Filing 53 Letter Requesting Permission to File For Summary Judgment by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice & Acknowledgement of Wage Rate Forms, #2 Exhibit Paystubs) (Mersol, Gregory)
March 4, 2015 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Telephone Conference held on 3/4/2015. The parties anticipate that plaintiff Volny's claims will soon be settled, obviating the need for his deposition, and that in all other respects the first phase of bifurcated discovery is complete and the parties are ready to litigate motions for summary judgment on plaintiff Short's individual claims. Once all such motions have been resolved, I will schedule further proceedings as appropriate. (Orenstein, James)
March 2, 2015 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT Joint by Daniel Short, John Volny (Brualdi, Richard)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: The motion is granted. Parties to complete depositions related to Named Plaintiffs by: February 27, 2015. Pre-Motion Conference requests to be filed by: March 27, 2015. The status conference previously scheduled for February 11, 2015 is converted to a telephone conference and rescheduled for March 4, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call and conference in chambers when all parties are on the line. A joint status report is due by March 2, 2015, two business days in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/3/2015. (Wentworth-Ping, Alex)
February 2, 2015 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Related to Named Plaintiffs by Framestore, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference will be held on February 11, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. The parties are respectfully directed to submit a joint status report by February 9, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/23/2015. (Wentworth-Ping, Alex)
January 13, 2015 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack, (Marziliano, August) Modified on 1/14/2015 (Marziliano, August).
November 24, 2014 Filing 49 ANSWER to #48 Amended Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim Defendant Churchill Benefit Corporation d/b/a Yurcor's Answer and Defenses to Defendant Framestore, Inc.'s Crossclaims by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
October 31, 2014 Filing 48 AMENDED ANSWER to First Amended Class Action Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against Churchill Benefit Corporation by Framestore, Inc.. (Stoler, Jonathan)
October 27, 2014 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack:Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/27/2014. See attached minute entry and the Court's scheduling order dated October 27, 2014 for deadlines concerning non-class discovery and applications for summary judgment, if any. (Petilla, Charlotte)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER: The deadlines governing non-class discovery and summary judgment applications, if any, are set forth in the attached scheduling order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/27/2014. (Petilla, Charlotte)
October 27, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Lee Hogan on behalf of PandaPanther, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hogan, Christine)
October 20, 2014 Filing 44 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by PandaPanther, Inc.. (Spataro, Amber)
October 20, 2014 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PandaPanther, Inc. (Spataro, Amber)
October 10, 2014 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Framestore, Inc. (Stoler, Jonathan)
October 10, 2014 Filing 41 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint With Affirmative Defenses by Framestore, Inc.. (Stoler, Jonathan)
October 10, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Daniel Murphy on behalf of Framestore, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Murphy, Brian)
October 10, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Howard Stoler on behalf of Framestore, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Stoler, Jonathan)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. With the plaintiffs' consent, the date by which defendant Panda Panther, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended up to and includes October 20, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/6/2014. (Petilla, Charlotte)
October 3, 2014 Filing 38 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 Amended Complaint by PandaPanther, Inc.. (Moss, Sarah)
October 3, 2014 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elyse Moss on behalf of PandaPanther, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Moss, Sarah)
September 29, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Libicki on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Libicki, Stuart)
September 29, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamina Ewing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Ewing, Pamina)
September 29, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by William T. Payne on behalf of Daniel Short, John Volny (aty to be noticed) (Payne, William)
September 26, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber M. Spataro on behalf of PandaPanther, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Spataro, Amber)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion for admission to practice pro hac vice in this matter is granted. The admitted attorney Gregory V. Mersol is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate for defendant Churchill Benefit Corporation d/b/a Yurcor. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/26/2014. (Petilla, Charlotte)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion for admission to practice pro hac vice in this matter is granted. The admitted attorney, Amber M. Spataro, is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate for defendant Panda Panther, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/26/2014. (Petilla, Charlotte)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File. With the plaintiff's consent, the date by which defendant Framestore, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended up to and includes October 10, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/26/2014. (Petilla, Charlotte)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned matter is granted. The admitted attorney, Jeffrey R. Vlasek, is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate for defendant Churchill Benefit Corporation d/b/a Yurcor. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/26/2014. (Petilla, Charlotte)
September 25, 2014 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7224179. by PandaPanther, Inc.. (Model, Alan)
September 25, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Ira Model on behalf of PandaPanther, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Model, Alan)
September 25, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur J. Grebow on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Grebow, Arthur)
September 25, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7222487. by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Mersol, Gregory)
September 25, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7222450. by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Vlasek, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2014 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Volny, Daniel Short. Framestore, Inc. served on 9/5/2014, answer due 9/26/2014. (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
September 23, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Gaitri Boodhoo on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Boodhoo, Gaitri)
September 23, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Motion or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Framestore, Inc.. (Murphy, Brian)
September 23, 2014 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Volny, Daniel Short. PandaPanther, Inc. served on 9/15/2014, answer due 10/6/2014. (Brualdi, Richard)
September 22, 2014 Filing 23 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
September 11, 2014 Filing 22 Amended Summons Issued as to PandaPanther, Inc.. (Brucella, Michelle)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's letter #21 , dated September 8, 2014, requesting that the initial conference scheduled for October 1, 2014, at 12:00 PM be adjourned is hereby GRANTED. The initial conference is rescheduled to take place on October 27, 2014 at 2:00 PM. Counsel are directed to confer and ensure that all parties are aware of the new date and time. Any requests for adjournment must be made via letter filed on ECF at least two days in advance of the scheduled conference and must indicate which parties consent to the adjournment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/10/2014. Teverovskaya, Diana)
September 8, 2014 Filing 21 Letter Requesting Adjournment of Initial Conference Until October 27, 2014 by Daniel Short, John Volny (Brualdi, Richard)
September 5, 2014 Filing 20 Proposed Summons. Re #19 Amended Complaint by Daniel Short, John Volny (Brualdi, Richard)
September 5, 2014 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Churchill Benefit Corporation, Framestore, Inc., PandaPanther, Inc., filed by John Volny, Daniel Short. (Brualdi, Richard)
September 5, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daniel Short, John Volny as to Defendant The Mill Group, Inc. (Brualdi, Richard)
August 27, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Arthur J. Grebow Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7162569. by Daniel Short, John Volny. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Brualdi, Richard)
August 27, 2014 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stuart Libicki Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7162558. by Daniel Short, John Volny. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Brualdi, Richard)
August 27, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Pamina Ewing Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7162542. by Daniel Short, John Volny. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Brualdi, Richard)
August 27, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7162441. by Daniel Short, John Volny. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Brualdi, Richard)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/27/2014. (Christianson, Kienan)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/27/2014. (Christianson, Kienan)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/27/2014. (Christianson, Kienan)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/27/2014. (Christianson, Kienan)
August 25, 2014 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Churchill Benefit Corporation (Traub, Amy)
August 25, 2014 Filing 12 Defendant Churchill Benefit Corporation d/b/a Yurcor's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Churchill Benefit Corporation. (Traub, Amy)
August 21, 2014 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Short. The Mill Group, Inc. served on 8/4/2014, answer due 8/25/2014. (Brualdi, Richard)
August 21, 2014 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Volny, Daniel Short. PandaPanther, Inc. served on 8/4/2014, answer due 8/25/2014. (Brualdi, Richard)
August 21, 2014 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Volny, Daniel Short. Logan, Inc. served on 8/4/2014, answer due 8/25/2014. (Brualdi, Richard)
August 21, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Volny, Daniel Short. Framestore, Inc. served on 8/4/2014, answer due 8/25/2014. (Brualdi, Richard)
August 21, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Volny, Daniel Short. Digital Kitchen, LLC served on 8/8/2014, answer due 8/29/2014. (Brualdi, Richard)
August 21, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Volny, Daniel Short. Churchill Benefit Corporation served on 8/4/2014, answer due 8/25/2014. (Brualdi, Richard)
August 21, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Volny, Daniel Short. Brand New School, Inc. served on 8/4/2014, answer due 8/25/2014. (Brualdi, Richard)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Order Dismissing Parties. Party Logan, Inc., PandaPanther, Inc., Quietman, Inc., Smoke and Mirrors, LLC, Suspect, Inc., Brand New School, Inc. and Digital Kitchen, LLC terminated. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/18/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order The Lab, Inc. terminated. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/18/2014. (Francis-McLeish, Ogoro)
August 15, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Daniel Short, John Volny Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to CERTAIN DEFENDANTS without prejudice (Brualdi, Richard)
July 31, 2014 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 31, 2014 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. The following corrections were made: corrected Caption, separated alias from defendants name. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in Courtroom 6E, 225 Cadman Plaza East, before Magistrate Judge Azrack on October 1, 2014, at 12:00 pm. All counsel must be present and are advised to review Judge Azrack's revised Individual Rules, which are available on the District Court's web site, prior to the conference. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to confirm with defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Any request for an adjournment must be made in the form of a letter motion filed on ECF at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference and must indicate which parties consent to the adjournment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/31/2014. (Christianson, Kienan)
July 30, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Mill Group summons, #2 Digital Kitchen summons, #3 Framestore summons, #4 Panda Panther summons, #5 Brand New summons, #6 Logan summons, #7 Quiteman summons, #8 The Lab summons, #9 Suspect summons, #10 Smoke and Mirrors summons) (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 30, 2014 Case assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 30, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7103117 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by John Volny, Daniel Short. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to Churchill Benefit Corporation dba Yurcor, #3 Proposed Summons to The Mill Group, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons to Digital Kitchen, LLC, #5 Proposed Summons to Framestore, Inc., #6 Proposed Summons to Panda Panther, Inc., #7 Proposed Summons to Brand New School, Inc., #8 Proposed Summons to Logan, Inc., #9 Proposed Summons to Quietman, Inc., #10 Proposed Summons to The Lab, Inc., #11 Proposed Summons to Suspect, Inc., #12 Proposed Summons to Smoke and Mirrors, LLC) (Brualdi, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short et al v. Churchill Benefit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Volny
Represented By: William T. Payne
Represented By: Arthur J. Grebow
Represented By: Gaitri Boodhoo
Represented By: Richard B. Brualdi
Represented By: Pamina Ewing
Represented By: Stuart Libicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Short
Represented By: William T. Payne
Represented By: Arthur J. Grebow
Represented By: Gaitri Boodhoo
Represented By: Richard B. Brualdi
Represented By: Pamina Ewing
Represented By: Lauren Christina Watson
Represented By: Stuart Libicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churchill Benefit Corporation
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Jeffrey Vlasek
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Framestore, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Howard Stoler
Represented By: Brian Daniel Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mill Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ticar
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quietman, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McCann
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand New School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suspect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Kitchen, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smoke and Mirrors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PandaPanther, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Elyse Moss
Represented By: Christine Lee Hogan
Represented By: Alan Ira Model
Represented By: Amber M. Spataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Churchill Benefit Corporation doing business as Yurcor
Represented By: Amy Joy Traub
Represented By: Jeffrey Vlasek
Represented By: Gregory Valentin Mersol
Represented By: Amanda L. Van Hoose Garofalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?