P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, ABC Appliance, Inc. and Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.
Defendant: NEC LCD Technologies LTD, NEC Corporation of America, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Samsung Electronics America Inc., Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., NEC Electronics America Inc, AU Optronics Corporation America, CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD., LG Display America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, NEC Corporation, LG Display Co., LTD., Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD, Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, Hitachi Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.) Inc., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Hitachi Displays, LTD, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems Inc. and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Special Master: Martin Quinn
Case Number: 1:2014cv05827
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re: Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Case Closed. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/12/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 9, 2015 Filing 387 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hannstar Display Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (440) Motion to Continue in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. In light of the parties' representation that the matter has settled, the parties are directed to file a stipulation of discontinuance by November 20, 2015, or failing that a status report by the same date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/26/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 23, 2015 Filing 386 Joint MOTION to Continue STIPULATION HOLDING DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. (439) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/5/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 2, 2015 Filing 385 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Order Dismissing Parties re #367 Stipulation of Dismissal: Defendants CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD and CHI MEI Optoelectronics Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/21/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 17, 2015 Filing 383 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (Iovieno, Philip)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (438) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation Pretrial Schedule in Exhibit A of (438) in 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/4/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
September 3, 2015 Filing 382 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. Stipulation (437) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/3/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
July 30, 2015 Filing 381 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
July 4, 2015 Filing 380 Letter Joint Letter re Trial Scheduling by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Order Dismissing Parties: The Court, having considered the stipulation of plaintiffs and certain defendants in these actions, and good cause appearing, orders as follows: 1) The actions filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corp.; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Neco Alliance LLC; and Schultze Agency Services, LLC on behalf of Tweeter Opco, LLC and Tweeter Newco, LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. 2) Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. It is so Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/1/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 30, 2015 Filing 378 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Order Dismissing Parties: Party Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, terminated. The actions filed by P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Neco Alliance LLC; and Schultze Agency Services, LLC on behalf of Tweeter Opco, LLC and Tweeter Newco, LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(2) as against the following Defendant only: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/25/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. Stipulation in (433) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (433 in 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB) is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/25/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
June 24, 2015 Filing 376 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
June 15, 2015 Filing 375 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (431) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation in (431) of 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/15/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (430) Motion to Continue in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation in (430) in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Based on representations that the stipulating parties have entered into a confidential settlement agreement, stipulating parties are directed to file a stipulation of discontinuance by June 30, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/15/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
June 11, 2015 Filing 374 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order Joint Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Smith, Kyle)
June 10, 2015 Filing 373 MOTION to Continue Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
May 28, 2015 Filing 372 Proposed Scheduling Order JOINT LETTER REGARDING TRIAL AND PROPOSED PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Hannstar Display Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Order Dismissing Parties: Re #370 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal as to LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD. Party LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD. terminated. The Court, having considered the stipulation of plaintiffs and certain defendants in these actions, and good cause appearing, orders as follows: 1. The actions filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corp.; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Neco Alliance LLC; and Schultze Agency Services, LLC on behalf of Tweeter Opco, LLC and Tweeter Newco, LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: LG Display Co., Ltd., and LG Display America, Inc. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. It is so Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/13/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB. (Ortiz, Grisel)
May 13, 2015 Filing 370 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. Docket Entry (425) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/29/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
April 28, 2015 Filing 369 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PAGE LIMITS FOR BIFURCATION BRIEFING by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (424) Motion to Continue in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation holding deadlines in abeyance in (424) in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/24/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
April 21, 2015 Filing 368 MOTION to Continue Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. 423 Briefing Schedule is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
April 10, 2015 Filing 367 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation re (421 in 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB) Pretrial Conference - Final, NOTICE OF AGREED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #366 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas W. Zamiska TERMINATED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/10/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
April 9, 2015 Filing 366 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation. (Zamiska, Nicholas)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER re 415 in 09-cv-04845 and 417 in 09-cv-04845 Letter, filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc. These applications are respectfully REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown for disposition. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/2/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Posillico, Lauren)
March 30, 2015 Filing 365 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence J. Zweifach on behalf of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (aty to be noticed) (Zweifach, Lawrence)
March 26, 2015 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart H. Singer on behalf of Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Singer, Stuart)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (419) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB by ABC Appliance, Inc., Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Mr. Singer is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/25/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
March 24, 2015 Filing 363 Letter to Honorable Joan M. Azrack and Honorable Gary R. Brown by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (Sanders, Joel)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar the 3/27/15 conference is rescheduled for 3/30/15 at 2:00 p.m.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/24/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (McMorrow, Karen)
March 6, 2015 Filing 362 Letter to Honorable Joan M. Azrack by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person pretrial conference has been scheduled for March 27, 2015 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 840 of the Central Islip courthouse to discuss joint pre-trial order and other matters. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/2/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
February 27, 2015 Filing 361 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Pretrial Order by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D, #5 Exhibit Attachment E, #6 Exhibit Attachment F, #7 Exhibit Attachment G, #8 Exhibit Attachment H, #9 Exhibit Attachment I, #10 Exhibit Attachment J, #11 Exhibit Attachment K, #12 Exhibit Attachment L, #13 Exhibit Attachment M, #14 Exhibit Attachment N) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
February 13, 2015 Filing 360 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Hartman on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Hartman, Brett)
January 15, 2015 Case reassigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to the case. (Florio, Lisa)
January 12, 2015 Filing 359 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Fram on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Fram, Nicholas)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #358 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Fram is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/12/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
January 9, 2015 Filing 358 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas Fram Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7444042. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas Fram ISO, #2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Fram, Nicholas)
January 6, 2015 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophie Sung on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) (Sung, Sophie)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #356 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Civ. R. 1.3(c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/6/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
January 5, 2015 Filing 356 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas D. Fram Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7432793. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas Fram ISO, #2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Fram, Nicholas)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part Docket Entry 409 of 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB. The joint proposed order is granted to the extent that the due date for the joint proposed pretrial order is EXTENDED to February 27, 2015. Parties are directed to file detailed deposition designations by April 30, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/30/2014. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #355 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Ms. Sung is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/29/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 23, 2014 Filing 355 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7418484. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung In Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit To Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice) (Sung, Sophie)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #354 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Civ. R. 1.3(c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/19/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 18, 2014 Filing 354 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7408166. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung ISO Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung ISO Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order Admission to Practice) (Sung, Sophie)
December 3, 2014 Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean David Unger on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) (Unger, Sean)
December 3, 2014 Filing 352 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Prout on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Prout, Andrew)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #346 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Prout is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/3/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #351 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Unger is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/3/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 2, 2014 Filing 351 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7370594. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sean D. Unger in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Unger, Sean)
November 19, 2014 Filing 350 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown:Status Conference held on 11/19/2014. Pretrial order due 1/30/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB(Posillico, Lauren)
November 19, 2014 Filing 349 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg D. Andres on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Andres, Greg)
November 17, 2014 Filing 348 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Conference Statement) by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Kim, Soo)
November 14, 2014 Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Hockett, Christopher)
November 13, 2014 Filing 346 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Andrew G. Prout) Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7333330. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Prout, Andrew)
November 10, 2014 Filing 345 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee F. Berger on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) (Berger, Lee)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #343 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #344 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants LG Display Co., Ltd. and LG Display America, Inc. Mr. Berger is directed to register for ECF and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/10/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
November 7, 2014 Filing 344 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lee F. Berger Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7322837. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lee F. Berger, #2 Certificate of Good Standing- DC, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - CA, #4 Proposed Order) (Berger, Lee)
November 7, 2014 Filing 343 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lee F. Berger Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7322822. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lee F. Berger, #2 Certificate of Good Standing- DC, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - CA, #4 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Berger, Lee)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Order Dismissing Parties Party Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. and Toshiba America Information Systems Inc. terminated as to document #341.. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 11/6/2014. (Lundy, Lisa)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #342 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., and CMO Japan Co., Ltd. Mr. Hockett is directed to register for ECF and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/6/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
November 5, 2014 Filing 342 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher B. Hockett. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7316558. by CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Hockett, Christopher)
November 5, 2014 Filing 341 STIPULATION of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
November 4, 2014 Filing 340 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Mark Curran on behalf of Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Curran, Christopher)
October 29, 2014 Filing 339 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically (receipt number 0207-7293976) by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. (Sanders, Joel)
October 29, 2014 Filing 338 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel S. Sanders on behalf of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (notification declined or already on case) (Sanders, Joel)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #337 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. Mr. Sanders is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/28/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 27, 2014 Filing 337 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joel S. Sanders Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7293979. by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Sanders, Joel)
October 27, 2014 Filing 336 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila Adams on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Adams, Sheila)
October 27, 2014 Filing 335 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas W. Zamiska on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Zamiska, Nicholas)
October 27, 2014 Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Pollak on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Pollak, William)
October 23, 2014 Filing 333 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Brass on behalf of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (notification declined or already on case) (Brass, Rachel)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (391) Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB. The status conference for the all Associated Cases scheduled for October 27, 2014 is hereby ADJOURNED to November 19, 2014 at 11:00am. Parties are directed to appear as scheduled at Courtroom 840 in the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/23/2014. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 22, 2014 Filing 332 MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for October 27, 2014 by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (House, Holly)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #331 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. Ms. Brass is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/22/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 21, 2014 Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachel S. Brass Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7280721. by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Brass, Rachel)
October 21, 2014 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Lawrence Blumenstein on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (notification declined or already on case) (Blumenstein, Carl)
October 21, 2014 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Alan Nedeau on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (notification declined or already on case) (Nedeau, Christopher)
October 21, 2014 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Farschad Farzan on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (aty to be noticed) (Farzan, Farschad)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference has been scheduled for October 27, 2014 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 840 in the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/20/2014. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference has been scheduled for October 27, 2014 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 840 in the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/17/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 16, 2014 Filing 327 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Farschad Farzan, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7268952. by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of pro hac vice application by Farschad Farzan, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Kim, Soo)
October 16, 2014 Filing 326 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carl L. Blumenstein, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7268865. by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of pro hac vice admission of Carl L. Blumenstein, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Kim, Soo)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #326 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. Mr. Blumenstein is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/16/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #324 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. Mr. Nedeau is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/16/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #327 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. Mr. Farzan is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/16/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 15, 2014 Filing 325 Letter from William Isaacson re Request for Status Conference by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
October 15, 2014 Filing 324 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher A. Nedeau, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7265200. by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Christopher A. Nedeau, Esq., #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Kim, Soo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2014: #4 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - California Bar, #5 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Michigan Bar) (Mahon, Cinthia).
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf, Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr no longer assigned to the case as per Order issued by Judge Hurley on 5/6/2014 (Marziliano, August)
October 9, 2014 Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Covey on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (aty to be noticed) (Covey, David)
October 9, 2014 Filing 322 NOTICE of Appearance by Soo Yeon Kim on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (aty to be noticed) (Kim, Soo)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 10/7/2014. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER: GRANTING the Motion to Consolidate Cases (filed in 09cv4845 as doc. 382). Pursuant to the stipulation filed, upon the remand from the MDL Panel, P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. v. AU Optronics Corporation, et al., No. 11-cv-02903 (on remand 1:14cv5827), Schultze Agency Services, LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation, et al., No. 11-cv-03168 (on remand 2:14-cv-5875), NECO Alliance LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation, et al., No. 12-cv-00059 (on remand 1:14-cv-5831) should be consolidated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42 with Electrograph Systems, Inc., et al. v. Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, et al., Case No. 2:09-cv-04845 before Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on all parties appearing in the P.C. Richard & Son, Schultze Agency, and NECO Alliance LLC actions. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 5/6/2014. (Kaley, Regina) (Originally filed on 5/6/14 on 2:09cv4845-DRH-GRB) (Mahon, Cinthia)
October 6, 2014 Cases associated: Create association to 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB. Case Consolidated. (Mahon, Cinthia)
October 6, 2014 Filing 321 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:11-cv-04119. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 6, 2014 This action is electronically remanded to USDC for the Eastern District of New York. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 6, 2014 The case of Richard & Son Long Island Corporation et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al, has been transferred from California-Northern to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 1:14-cv-05827-ARR-RER. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you mustregister for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov for guidance. (Marziliano, August)
October 3, 2014 Filing 320 Conditional REMAND ORDER to the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL Panel on 10/3/14. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURT (11cv3865, 11cv4119 AND 12cv1426) 9220 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 18, 2014 Filing 318 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Suggestion of Remand [Master Docket No. 9220] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF MARTA'S LACK OF STANDING UNDER ILLINOIS BRICK #292 , 9060 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS #293 , 9061 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DAVID P. STOWELL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 #294 , 9070 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DIRECT PURCHASER CLAIMS FOR WHICH THE PANEL WAS FIRST SOLD TO A THIRD PARTY MANUFACTURER #289 , 9056 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 313 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #312 Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9202] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), #8 Exhibit 6 (Part 1), #9 Exhibit 6 (Part 2), #10 Exhibit 7)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 312 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. re #294 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9201] (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/28/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 311 Declaration of John H. Chung in Support of #310 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9199] filed byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-23 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit 24-27 to Declaration of John H. Chung)(Related document(s) #310 ) (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 310 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #293 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9198] (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 309 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by HannStar Display Corporation re #292 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF MARTAS LACK OF STANDING UNDER ILLINOIS BRICK (MDL DOCKET NO. 9197) (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JASON M. BUSSEY, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 308 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #307 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. No. 9196] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #307 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 307 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #289 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9195] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 21, 2014 Filing 306 EXHIBITS re #303 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case,,, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [303-9] filed byMarta Cooperative of America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #303 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/21/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 17, 2014 Filing 305 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation re #294 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case. [Master Docket No. 9168] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johnny W. Carter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/17/2014) Modified on 7/18/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 304 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation re #290 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Third Party Manufacturers [Master Docket No. 9162] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 303 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc. re #292 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, MARTA's Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff MARTA's Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick [Master Docket No. 9160] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melissa Felder Zappala, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 302 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #301 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9159] filed byABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-45, #3 Exhibit 46-65, #4 Exhibit 66-82, #5 Exhibit 83-95)(Related document(s) #301 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 301 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation re #293 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9158] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting in part and denying in part (9141) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 299 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #297 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation and Defendants' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation [MDL Docket No. 9145] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 7/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING #260 , 8924 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2014) Modified on 7/2/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 297 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation (MDL Dkt. No. 9141) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/30/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 296 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #295 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. #9135] by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/26/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #291 , (9059 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 5, 2014 Filing 294 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, filed as MDL Dkt. No. 9070) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong with supporting Exs. A-I)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/5/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 293 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As To Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [MDL No. 1827, Docket Nos. 9061 and 9062] (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #4 Exhibit 6-10 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #5 Exhibit 11-15 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #6 Exhibit 16-20 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #7 Exhibit 21-25 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #8 Exhibit 26-32 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #9 Exhibit 33-39 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #10 Exhibit 40-44 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #11 Exhibit 45-48 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #12 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 292 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by HannStar Display Corporation DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF MARTAS LACK OF STANDING UNDER ILLINOIS BRICK (MDL DKT. NO. 9060) (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JASON M. BUSSEY, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Proposed Order)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 291 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9059, 9059-1, 9059-2] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 290 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #289 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9058] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 289 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Redacted-Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 288 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Response re Motion for Summary Judgment UNREDACTED Response (MDL Dkt. No. 9048) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart H. Singer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal #264 , 8923 in 7-1827. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #263 , (8920 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc. ("Nexgen"), CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #258 , (8917 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., HannStar Display Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 284 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 5/27/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston denying #278 , (8984) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Counsel shall take care to include the correct case numbers in it's filings, there were several incorrect numbers in the caption.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #281 , (9010) Stipulation re: use of expert compensation at trial in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (295) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (262) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (281) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 9, 2014 Filing 281 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Use of Expert Compensation at Trial [MDL No. 9010] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 280 Remark : (A) Defendants Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Dkt. No. 8916), filed March 18, 2014 in Case No. 3:11-cv-0624, will be withdrawn only with regard to the Stipulated Plaintiffs listed above. The motion remains pending with respect to Interbond Corporation of Americas claim under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-03763, Office Depots claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-02225, TechDatas claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-05765 and TracFone Wireless Inc.s claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:10-cv-03205; (B) Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds (Dkt. No. 8915), filed March 18, 2014, will be withdrawn only with regard to state law claims brought by the Stipulating Plaintiffs listed above and with respect to plaintiff Alfred Siegel, Trustee (Case No. 3:10-cv-05625). The motion remains pending with respect to Interbond Corporation of Americas claim under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-03763, Office Depots claims under Florida law in Case No. 3:11-cv-02225, TechDatas claims under Florida and California law in Case No. 3:11-cv-05765 and TracFones Florida law claim in Case No. 3:10-cv-03205; and (C) Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (Dkt. No. 8924) filed March 18, 2014, will be withdrawn only with regard to the state law claims brought by the Stipulating Plaintiffs listed above and with respect to plaintiff Alfred Siegel, Trustee (Case No. 3:10-cv-05625). The motion remains pending with respect to the Sherman Act claims alleged by all plaintiffs (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Dismissing with Prejudice Certain Plaintiffs' State Law Claims; Stipulating Plaintiffs are not dismissing, and will continue to prosecute, their claims against Defendants under the Sherman Act, withdrawing motions. (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 278 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation to File Under Seal portions of their opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition Brief, #4 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exh A, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exh C)[MDL No.8984].(Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 277 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal Dismissing with Prejudice Certain Plaintiffs' State Law Claims (MDL Dkt. No. 8983) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8976) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI as to various cases, see order for details. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 24, 2014 Filing 275 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 8976) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 23, 2014 Filing 274 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/23/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 4/23/2014). The Court granted the Administrative Motion to Appoint Liaison Counsel #8957. Carl Blumenstein will continue in his role as defense liaison. SB Liquidation Trust indicated that it is in the process of settling their case (10-5458). By May 7, 2014, counsel will submit a proposed pretrial and trial schedule for Acer America (13-3349), Home Depot (13-6001), and Proview (13-3802), and a trial schedule for the Circuit City Case (10-5625). Every other case not specifically scheduled for a trial date will eventually will be remanded back to the originating districts. (Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER RE: APRIL 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8957 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 23, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing MOTIONS SET PURSUANT TO ORDER 8872 : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 16, 2014 Filing 272 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) (Filed as Dkt. No. 8962 in MDL 1827) filed by AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/16/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 9, 2014 Filing 271 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America Stipulation and Proposed Order Allowing Production of Sealed Pleadings in Related Case MDL Dkt 8950 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Illinois Stipulation)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/9/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER: DAUBERT Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/7/14. (8947 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 7, 2014 Filing 269 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule (MDL Dkt. No. 8947) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/7/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 2, 2014 Filing 268 CLERKS NOTICE FOR ALL REMAINING CASES: A further case management Conference has been set for 4/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston The Court has determined that the following cases are remain open: 3:09-cv-04997-SI, 3:10-cv-03205-SI, 3:10-cv-04346-SI, 3:10-cv-05458-SI, 3:10-cv-05625-SI, 3:11-cv-00829-SI, 3:11-cv-02225-SI, 3:11-cv-02495-SI, 3:11-cv-03763-SI, 3:11-cv-03856-SI, 3:11-cv-04119-SI, 3:11-cv-05765-SI, 3:11-cv-05781-SI, 3:11-cv-06241-SI, 3:12-cv-00335-SI, 3:12-cv-01426-SI, 3:12-cv-01596-SI, 3:12-cv-02214-SI, 3:12-cv-02495-SI, 3:12-cv-03802-SI, 3:12-cv-05371-SI, 3:12-cv-05460-SI, 3:13-cv-03349-SI, 3:13-cv-06001-SI. Counsel shall inform the clerk immediately if a case has been omitted for this notice. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed on or before April 17, 2014. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 267 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.s Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (MDL No. 8923) filed byABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 266 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Plaintiffs' State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds (MDL No. 8917) filed byABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 265 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Defendants Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds (MDL No 8920). filed byABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 264 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Redacted Motion Summary Judgment Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #4 Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #5 Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #6 Redacted Exhibits 47-48, #7 Unredacted Motion Summary Judgment Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #8 Unredacted Exhs 1-18, #9 Unredacted Exhs 27-35, #10 Unredacted Exhs 36, #11 Unredacted Exhs 37-38, #12 Unredacted Exh 39, #13 Unredacted 40-42, #14 Unredacted 47-48)[MDL NO. 8923].(Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 263 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. 8920] (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, #24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 262 Declaration of Weifan Wang in Support of #259 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Certification of Authenticity [MDL Dkt. 8919] filed byCMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) #259 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 261 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #259 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds [MDL Dkt. 8918] filed byCMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63)(Related document(s) #259 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 260 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/1/2014. Replies due by 4/8/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Brownstein ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 19-26, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 43-46, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 47-48)[MDL No. 8924](Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 259 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [MDL Dkt. 8916] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 258 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, HannStar Display Corporation. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. GILLEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8917), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (Request to Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (Request to Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (Request to Seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (Request to Seal), #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)[MDL NO. 8917] (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 257 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, HannStar Display Corporation DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8915) (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEN TE-HSIANG, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF PO CHIU)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #255 , (8879) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 18, 2014 Filing 255 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues [MDL No. 8879] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Motion Hearings set for TRACK 2 CASES. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/28/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 28, 2014 Filing 253 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Summary Judgment Schedule [MDL Master Dkt. 8870] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 1/28/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER, (8849 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING TRACK 2 DEADLINES filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/14 is continued to 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/14/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 13, 2014 Filing 251 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Track 2 Deadlines; MDL Dkt. No. 8849 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/13/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8838) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 19, 2013 Filing 249 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 8838 (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8831) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the Parties, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that: 1. The deadline for the Parties to meet and confer regarding the Proposed List of Summary Judgment Motions and Schedule for same is extended from December 11, 2013 to January 9, 2014. 2. The deadline for the Parties to file with the Court a Joint List of Proposed Summary Judgment Motions and Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment Filings is extendedfrom December 12, 2013 to January 13, 2014. 3. This stipulation does not affect any other Track 2 deadlines as set forth in the Courts September 6, 2013 Order re Track 2 Deadlines. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 11, 2013 Filing 247 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America 8831 Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Revised Deadlines In Track 2 Re: Summary Judgment Motion Lists (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 8804 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by the undersigned counsel on behalf of the Stipulating Parties that all case schedules and deadlines in the above-captioned actions shall be held in abeyance as to the Stipulating Defendants only, and shall be revised as specified above in the event that the above-captioned cases are not dismissed as to the Stipulating Defendants. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 27, 2013 Filing 245 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 8804 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8789) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Hitachi defendants filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 243 NOTICE by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Description of Issues/Subjects of Summary Judgment Motions (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 242 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation with Proposed Order of Dismissal; MDL Dkt. No. 8789 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 13, 2013 Filing 241 NOTICE by HannStar Display Corporation Notice of Withdrawal (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Derr Schmidt on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Schmidt, Melissa) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8655) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED between counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants in the Track 2 cases, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that Defendants opposition expert reports shall be served by October 31, 2013, and the underlying code and data for those reports shall be served by November 6, 2013. No other dates from the Courts Track 2 Scheduling Order shall be altered by this stipulation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8646) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI 1. The actions filed by Plaintiffs Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.; Office Depot, Inc.; Interbond Corporation of America; Schultze Agency Services, LLC; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.; The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust; CompuCom Systems, Inc.; and NECO Alliance LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America, Inc.; Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.; NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, and NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.; and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 233 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 8646] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 232 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #231 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) filed byABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #231 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 231 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); DKT No. 8636 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 20, 2013 Filing 230 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation re #227 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Opposition to Motion to Compel Sharp 30(b)(6) Deposition (MDL Dkt. 8615) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay Lutz, #2 Exhibit A - F)(Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER re: Certain Expert Depositions in Track 2. re #225 , 8498 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) re #224 , 8497 . Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 30, 2013 Filing 227 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply With Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); MDL Dkt. No. 8553 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 29, 2013 Filing 226 NOTICE by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/29/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2013 Filing 225 STIPULATION with Proposed Order re Certain Expert Depositions in Track 2, MDL DKT NO 8498 by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013) Modified on 8/26/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2013 Filing 224 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Setting Revised Track 2 Deadlinesby LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. [MDL DKT NO. 8497] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013) Modified on 8/26/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 13, 2013 Filing 223 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/13/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #221 , (8350) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records" (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/30/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 24, 2013 Filing 221 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records"; MDL Dkt. No. 8350 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #216 , (8169) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel filed by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. AS AMENDED (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL IN TRACK 2 CASES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL re #214 , 8159 in 7-1827 Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/25/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #214 , (8159) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 21, 2013 Filing 216 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation [MDL Dkt. 8169] Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/21/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 6/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 214 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8159 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #209 . (8076) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER 8060 Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #181 . (7973) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER re #202 . (8060) Stipulation and proposed order re Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/10/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 12, 2013 Filing 209 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (FILED AS DKT #8076 IN MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/12/2013) Modified on 6/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Hansen (Hansen, Bradley) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Harper Knox (Knox, Samantha) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra West Neukom (West Neukom, Sandra) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 7, 2013 Filing 204 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel [MDL No. 8065] (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/10/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #193 . (8035) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 6, 2013 Filing 202 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8060 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #185 . (7987) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI: Stipulation with proposed order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (AMENDED DOCUMENT of 7984 by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #186 . (8001) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #191 . (7999) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #190 . (8000) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #189 . (7989) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #188 . (7988) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #184 . (7985) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation with Proposed Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 31, 2013 Filing 194 NOTICE by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 5/31/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 31, 2013 Filing 193 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8035 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/31/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 30, 2013 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 5/30/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 191 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7999 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 190 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8000 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 189 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7989 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 188 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7988 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #182 . (7983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed in MDL Master Case by Best Buy Co., Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, Jaco Electronics, Inc., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Rockwell Automation Inc., Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC, Sony Electronics, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Viewsonic Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 186 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8001 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 185 Notice of Motion/Stipulation - AMENDED DOCUMENT by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Amendment to #183 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7987. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 184 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7985 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 183 ***PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #185***Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7984 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 182 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7983 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 23, 2013 Filing 181 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Electronics Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel (Davis, Allison)[MDL No. 7973]. (Filed on 5/23/2013) Modified on 5/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #179 . (7919) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 16, 2013 Filing 179 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7919 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/16/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #177 . (7866) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: EXTENDING CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO MITSUI & CO. (USA), INC. AND MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. DEPOSITIONS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 8, 2013 Filing 177 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Close of Fact Discovery with Respect to Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. and Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. Depositions [MDL No.7866]. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2013) Modified on 5/9/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #175 . (7770) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 23, 2013 Filing 175 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7770 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 174 AMENDED MINUTES FROM 3/15/13 HEARING: ADDING THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE (NO OTHER CHANGES) T-Mobile and Defendants shall submit a stipulation to the 75 day extension, with revised dates. If T-Mobile seeks to reinstate certain indirect purchaser claims pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's AT&T Mobility LLC v. AU Optronics Corp. decision, it must submit a motion. The Court grants T-Mobile leave to submit such motion.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7652) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI REVISED TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER re #171 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 172 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Track I(b) trial has been continued to 7/22/13 and the pretrial is continued to 7/9/13 (7-1827, 10-4572, 10-4945, 10-5452, and 12-4114)By 3/29/13, counsel shall submit a proposed pretrial scheduling order with repect to the Track I(b) cases.As to Track I(b), there will be no ATM FEE evidentiary hearing. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 14, 2013 Filing 171 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richardson & son Long Island Corporation. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL No. 7652]. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 12, 2013 Filing 170 Joint Case Management Conference Statement by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation [MDL Dkt. No. 7640] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/12/2013) Modified on 3/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/13 is continued 3/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/1/13., Motions terminated: (102 in 3:11-cv-06241-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 1, 2013 Filing 168 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (SEE TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER 7139 ) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER The August 20, 2013 and September 10, 2013 deadlines for the parties to provide additional and supplemental description[s] of each issue/subject of summary judgment motions are hereby vacated and replaced with the following: August 20, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to serve proposed list of summary judgment motions (copies to be provided to the court). August 21-September 9, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to meet and confer over proposed list of summary judgment motions and schedule for same. September 10, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to file with the Court joint list of proposed summary judgment motions and proposed schedule for summary judgment filings. October 30, 2013: Last day to file supplemental list of proposed summary judgment motions based upon new information or issues raised in the reply expert reports.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 21, 2012 Filing 166 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Letter from Messrs. Murray and Foran Re Summary Judgment on Track 2 Cases and Proposed Order (MDL 7213) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 TRACK 2 SCHEDULING ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 13, 2012 Filing 164 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). The ATS Claims, Dell and Nokia cases ARE CONTINUED TO 11/30/12 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (9-1115, 10-1064, 09--5609)Counsel in the Track 2 cases shall select a mediator and inform the court of the name of the person selected. The Court will file an order approving the stipulated revised schedule for Track 2 cases.The Court will issue a separate order addressing Daubert motions in the cases set for trial in January 2013, streamlining summary judgment practice in the Track 2 cases, as well as the issue of consolidating the Best Buy cases. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 5, 2012 Filing 163 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Harrison J. Frahn, IV NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 11/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 162 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 161 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 5, 2012 Filing 160 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 5, 2012 Filing 159 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 25, 2012 Filing 158 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC. AND LG DISPLAY CO., LTD'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE THEIR DEFENSES RE DUPLICATIVE RECOVERY #137 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 6719 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (155) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI Regarding Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.'s Responses To The First Amended Complaint (PC Richard) filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited, Mitsui & Co. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 14, 2012 Filing 155 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.'s Responses To The First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 9/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 5, 2012 Filing 154 CLERKS NOTICE : THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS ARE TAKEN OFF THE September 7, 2012 calendar. The motions are deemed submitted without argument. 7-1827, Dkt. No. 6227 , 11-2225, Dkt. No. 149, 11-2495, Dkt. No. 137, 11-2591, Dkt. No. 139, 11-3763, Dkt. No. 124, 11-4119, Dkt. No. 137, This is a docket text entry only and there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (152 in 3:11-cv-04119-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (32) Amended Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., (6587 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (4075) Amended Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer the First Amended Complaint (PC Richard) filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited, Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on August 31, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 30, 2012 Filing 152 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #32 Amended Complaint,,,, Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/30/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 30, 2012 Filing 151 REPLY (re #137 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims ) filed byABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 150 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET #145 byNEC Corporation of America. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 149 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET #144 byNEC Corporation. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 148 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET #143 byNEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 147 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 146 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 145 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #150 . *** Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Corporation of America. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012) Modified on 8/24/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 144 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #149 . *** Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Corporation. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012) Modified on 8/24/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 143 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #148 . *** Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012) Modified on 8/24/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (6438) Stipulation Re: Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint (P.C. Richard in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 16, 2012 Filing 141 RESPONSE (re #137 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims ) LG Display America, Inc.'s and LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Opposition to Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Their Defenses Concerning Duplicative Recovery filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(House, Holly) (Filed on 8/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Susan Illston extending time for defendant Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (USA), Inc. to respond to the first amended complaint #139 . (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 10, 2012 Filing 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 9, 2012 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation PROOFS OF SERVICE ON FOREIGN DEFEDANTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 137 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/2/2012. Replies due by 8/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Rubinstein, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 136 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER signed on 7/6/12 by Judge Illston granting ( 5861 ) Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (89) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05458-SI; granting (109) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (112) Motion in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (135) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (127) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (71) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting (111) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (92) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (27) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04116-SI; granting (122) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting (42) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting (56) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting (45) Motion in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting (15) Motion in case 3:12-cv-00335-SI; granting (14) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI; granting (13) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01599-SI; granting (11) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02214-SI; granting (8) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02495-SI (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 9, 2012 Filing 134 Minute Entry: Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order held on 7/6/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 7/9/2012). The Court will issue the scheduling order. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Cutoff Hearing set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 133 CLERKS NOTICE: ALL PARTIES ARE ADVISED THAT THE MOTION RE: TWO TRACK SCHEDULING WILL BE HELD STARTING AT 9:30 A.M. INSTEAD OF 9:00 A.M. TOMORROW, FRIDAY, JULY 6, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 132 Request for Judicial Notice re #131 Reply to Opposition/Response, NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re Track Two Plaintiffs' Scheduling Motion filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B Part 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B Part 2 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C-D to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #131 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 27, 2012 Filing 131 REPLY (re #122 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) filed byABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Mooney)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 26, 2012 Filing 130 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 6/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas , Jason S. Angell, and Jerry Chen on behalf of HannStar Display Corp. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG CO. OF AMERICA signed on 6/21/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5962 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #113 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #126 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting ( #58 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting ( #18 ) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2012: #1 Order with Judicial Signature) (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/26/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER signed on 6/19/12 by Judge Illston granting #124 Stipulation to extend LG's Counterclaim by T-Mobile. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 126 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC. filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 19, 2012 Filing 125 RESPONSE (re #122 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases with Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order re: Pretrial and Trial Schedule)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 6/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 19, 2012 Filing 124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 18, 2012 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Cody Martin (Martin, Brandon) (Filed on 6/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 122 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/19/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5710 ) Stipulation to extend deadline to respond to complaint deadline to 8/10/12 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (120) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 16, 2012 Filing 120 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 5/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER signed on 5/14/12 by Judge Susan Illston STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. granting ( 5578 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #67 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting ( #106 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #83 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting ( #117 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #28 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #35 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 11, 2012 Filing 118 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection to Special Master Quinn's Order Regarding Subpoenas to John Metzler and applEcon LLC by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/11/2012) Modified on 5/14/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 2, 2012 Filing 117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS 5548 (see order for details). Signed by Judge Illston on 4/30/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed on 4/30/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting Stipulation re Schedule to Answer or Respond to LG Display's Counterclaims filed by T-Mobile USA Inc(5542) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (242) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (321) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-05840-SI; granting (166) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (117) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-03517-SI; granting (79) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04346-SI; granting (102) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (138) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI; granting (165) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00711-SI; granting (126) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (115) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02495-SI; granting (124) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (103) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI. See order for specific details (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 27, 2012 Filing 114 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 26, 2012 Filing 113 Special Masters Order RE LG Display's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas to Applecon LLC and John Metzler (Hrg. 4-6-12). (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 4/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston signed on 4/11/12 granting Stipulation to extend deadline to answer counterclaims ( 5434 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #123 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting ( #100 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #111 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 10, 2012 Filing 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Answer or Respond to Defendants LG Display Co. LTD and LG Display America, Inc.s Counterclaims for Declarative Relief filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 5, 2012 Filing 110 RESPONSE to re #96 Notice (Other), Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion Regarding Trial Structure and Duplicative Recovery by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 3, 2012 Filing 109 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #102 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Further Support of Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler filed byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #102 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 4/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 3, 2012 Filing 108 REPLY (re #102 MOTION to Compel ) Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler filed byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 4/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 4/2/12granting ( 5347 ) Stipulation to dismiss Samsung in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #105 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 2, 2012 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MELISSA FELDER (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 30, 2012 Filing 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/30/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 28, 2012 Filing 104 REDACTION to #103 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #102 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D, #2 Exhibit E - F, #3 Exhibit G - H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J - K, #6 Exhibit L, #7 Exhibit M, #8 Exhibit N - Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 28, 2012 Filing 103 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #100 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Exhibit A to Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #101 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 28, 2012 Filing 102 REDACTION to #101 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 28, 2012 Filing 101 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #100 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( #99 in 3:11-cv-04119-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #146 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #90 in 3:10-cv-05625-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co. Ltd., ( #111 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( 5304 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #68 in 3:11-cv-03856-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #124 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #88 in 3:11-cv-03763-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd... Signed by Judge Illston on 3/27/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 23, 2012 Filing 99 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 21, 2012 Filing 98 Answer to Amended Complaint #32 Amended Complaint,,,, Defendant LG Display America, Inc.'s Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM for Declarative Relief against ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation byLG Display America, Inc.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 21, 2012 Filing 97 Answer to Amended Complaint #32 Amended Complaint,,,, Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM for Declarative Relief against ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 13, 2012 Filing 96 NOTICE by AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Notice of Pending Motion and Of Issue and Claim Preclusion (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 5, 2012 Filing 95 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by AU Optronics Corporation America. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 3/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 94 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint Defendant LG Display America, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint byLG Display America, Inc.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 93 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 92 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint (FIRST) byAU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 91 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc. and ABC Appliance, Inc. byHitachi Displays, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 90 NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.,'s ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richards & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. (correction for #81) byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 89 NEC Electronics America, Inc.'s ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richards & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. (Correction for #80) byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 88 NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.'s ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richards & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. (correction for #79) byNEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 87 NEC Corporation of America's ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richards & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. (correction for #78) byNEC Corporation of America. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 86 NEC Corporation's ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richards & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. (correction for #77) byNEC Corporation. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 85 Answer to Amended Complaint #32 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.'s Answer to P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc. and ABC Appliance, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 84 Answer to Amended Complaint #32 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Answer to P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc. and ABC Appliance, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 83 Answer to Amended Complaint #32 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc. and ABC Appliance, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 82 Answer to Amended Complaint #32 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba Corporation's Answer to P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc. and ABC Appliance, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 81 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #90 . *** NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.'s ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richards & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/1/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 80 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #89 . *** NEC Electronics America, Inc.'s ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richards & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/1/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 79 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #88 . *** NEC Display Solutions of America's ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richards & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. byNEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/1/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 78 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #87 . *** NEC Corporation of America's ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richards & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. byNEC Corporation of America. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/1/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 77 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #86 . *** NEC Corporation's ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint of P.C. Richards & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. byNEC Corporation. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/1/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 76 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #32 byHannstar Display Corporation. (Emerson, Ramona) (Filed on 2/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 75 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint ANSWER AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES OF CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS CORPORATION (N/K/A CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION), CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC., AND CMO JAPAN CO., LTD. TO P.C. RICHARD & SON LONG ISLAND CORPORATION'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byCMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 74 Answer to Amended Complaint #32 Amended Complaint,,,, of PC Richard, et al. bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 2/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 73 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #32 of P.C. Richard bySharp Electronics Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 2/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 72 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #32 of P.C. Richard bySharp Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 2/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 71 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint byTatung Company of America, Inc.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 70 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint byChunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 29, 2012 Filing 69 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint byEpson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 2/21/12granting (4842) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting(67) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012) Modified on 2/23/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 21, 2012 Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Illston granting (4722) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (83) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (59) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (65) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (ORDER SIGNED ON 2/1/12 BY JUDGE ILLSTON, THIS IS A TEXT DOCKET ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 31, 2012 Filing 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 1/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 19, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL MICHAEL R. LIZANO (Perez-Lizano, Michael) (Filed on 1/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS (P.C.RICHARD) re #44 , #46 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/18/2012) Modified on 1/19/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 18, 2012 Filing 62 RESPONSE/Opposition to re #61 Request for Judicial Notice, DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 1/18/2012) Modified on 1/19/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 17, 2012 Filing 61 Request for Judicial Notice re #44 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #44 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (#4510) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 9, 2012 Filing 59 REPLY (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) filed byCMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 1/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 9, 2012 Filing 58 REPLY (re #46 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ) filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 9, 2012 Filing 57 Ex Parte Application NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 1/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 30, 2011 Filing 56 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #55 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO #46 NEC DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/30/2011) Modified on 1/3/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #52 . (#4419) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011) Modified on 12/28/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 22, 2011 Filing 54 RESPONSE (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byP.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1-5)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 22, 2011 Filing 53 RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO NEC DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byP.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 22, 2011 Filing 52 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/22/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 16, 2011 Filing 51 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/11, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 7, 2011 Filing 50 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 28, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #45 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 48 Request for Judicial Notice re #46 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Margaret Derr (Derr, Melissa) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/23/2011. Replies due by 1/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 45 Ex Parte Application NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 5, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 12/23/2011. Replies due by 1/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 12/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting extention of time to respond to complaint re #41 .(#4202) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 30, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Murdock-Park , Paul P. Eyre, Ernest E. Vargo, Tracy L. Cole and Michael E. Mumford (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 11/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 29, 2011 Filing 41 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. AND MITSUI & CO. (U.S.A.), INC. TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 4, 2011 Filing 40 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #38 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - PLAINTIFFS P.C. RICHARD & SON LONG ISLAND CORPORATION, MARTA COOPERATIVE OF AMERICA, INC., AND ABC APPLIANCE, INC. FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/4/2011) Modified on 11/7/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 4, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel) (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 11/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #31 . (4074) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 2, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Arka Dev Chatterjee (Chatterjee, Arka) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 2, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 2, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Richard Perez-Lizano (Perez-Lizano, Michael) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 2, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 2, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 11/2/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 1, 2011 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT P.C. RICHARD & SON LONG ISLAND CORPORATION, MARTA COOPERATIVE OF AMERICA, INC., AND ABC APPLIANCE, INC. FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD. Filed byP.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 1, 2011 Filing 31 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/1/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Motions terminated: #23 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss)Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss) filed by Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation. re #28 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011) Modified on 10/26/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. / Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Lazerwitz, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 20, 2011 Filing 28 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER WITHDRAWING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS, NECS MOTION TO DISMISS, SANYOS MOTION TO DISMISS, AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 10, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. re #26 Clerks Notice,,,,, (Notice of Withdrawal of Duplicative Filing) (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 7, 2011 Filing 26 CLERKS NOTICE : YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT upon review of the docket sheets, that a motion might have been filed twice by mistake. If the motions are duplicate, counsel is directed to file a notice of withdrawal of one of them by Tuesday, October 11, 2011.10/06/2011 1. 22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss) filed by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 10/20/2011. Replies due by 10/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 10/6/2011) 10/06/20112. 23 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss) filed by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 10/20/2011. Replies due by 10/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 10/6/2011) Please report to Courtroom #10, 19th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave., San Francisco, CA 94102.Dated: October 7, 2011RICHARD W. WIEKING, Clerk Tracy ForakisDeputy Clerk (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.] (Entered: 10/07/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 25 Joinder re #22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss)Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss) by Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Allison) (Filed on 10/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 6, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 10/20/2011. Replies due by 10/27/2011. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 6, 2011 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss) filed by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 10/20/2011. Replies due by 10/27/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 10/6/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 6, 2011 Filing 22 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #23 . *** Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss) filed by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 10/20/2011. Replies due by 10/27/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 10/6/2011) Modified on 10/7/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER (11-4119) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 5, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal OF DEFENDANTS EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORPORATION AND EPSON ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. by ABC Appliance, Inc. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/5/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 4, 2011 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. to Respond to the Complaint and [Proposed] Order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 30, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. McCann (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 9/30/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of dismissal (C-11-4119 #16 ) (#3717) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011) Modified on 9/30/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 28, 2011 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 9/28/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING P.C. RICHARDS PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL re #13 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 20, 2011 Filing 14 The Court is not available on Friday, October 21, 2011.CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (3610 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3), (3609 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3), (15 in 3:11-cv-03763-SI) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3), (13 in 3:11-cv-04119-SI) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3). Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 16, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFFS TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/30/2011. Replies due by 10/7/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne M. Nardacci, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Isaacson, William) (Filed on 9/16/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Re: EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, WAIVER OF SERVICE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 15, 2011 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the Court is no longer accepting new motions to be noticed for Friday, November 4, 2011. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 24, 2011 Filing 10 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, WAIVER OF SERVICE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 8/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: extension to time to respond to complaint in 11-3856 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial ORDER #1 and Agenda for July 10, 2007 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/7. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2011: #1 standing orders and cmc order) (ysS, COURT STAFF).[Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2011 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:11-cv-02903. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 1, 2011 Filing 6 Certified copy of JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-17) (Attachments: #1 Request for Case transfer from the Northern District of California) (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 1, 2011 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 8, 2011 Filing 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-17). This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern Distirct of California. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7-day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 16, 2011 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, LTD, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 16, 2011 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 16, 2011 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 16, 2011 Filing 1 DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by ABC Appliance, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 16, 2011 FILING FEE: $ 350, receipt number 4653030411 (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 16, 2011 Summons Issued as to AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, LTD, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC LCD Technologies LTD
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: William D. Pollak
Represented By: Michael Richard Perez-Lizano
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Sheila Adams
Represented By: Nicholas W. Zamiska
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Brandon Cody Martin
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Arka Dev Chatterjee
Represented By: Greg D. Andres
Represented By: Brett J. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan CO., LTD
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: William D. Pollak
Represented By: Michael Richard Perez-Lizano
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Sheila Adams
Represented By: Nicholas W. Zamiska
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Brandon Cody Martin
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Arka Dev Chatterjee
Represented By: Greg D. Andres
Represented By: Brett J. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: John D. Cline
Represented By: Christopher Alan Nedeau
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: David M. Covey
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: William D. Pollak
Represented By: Michael Richard Perez-Lizano
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Sheila Adams
Represented By: Nicholas W. Zamiska
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Brandon Cody Martin
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Arka Dev Chatterjee
Represented By: Greg D. Andres
Represented By: Brett J. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Sophie Sung
Represented By: Lee F. Berger
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Holly A. House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Represented By: Lindsay A. Lutz
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., LTD.
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Sophie Sung
Represented By: Lee F. Berger
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Holly A. House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Ramona M. Emerson
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Hugh Frederick Bangasser
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell, Esq.
Represented By: John D. Cline
Represented By: Christopher Alan Nedeau
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: David M. Covey
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD
Represented By: Lawrence J. Zweifach
Represented By: Joel S. Sanders
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: David C. Brownstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.) Inc.
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, LTD
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Martin Quinn
Represented By: Martin Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Melissa B Felder
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer
Represented By: Kyle Smith
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Represented By: Anne M. Nardacci
Represented By: Christopher V. Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Appliance, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Kyle Smith
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Represented By: Anne M. Nardacci
Represented By: Christopher V. Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Melissa B Felder
Represented By: Kyle Smith
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Represented By: Anne M. Nardacci
Represented By: Christopher V. Fenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?