Neco Alliance LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Neco Alliance LLC
Defendant: NEC LCD Technologies LTD, NEC Corporation of America, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., NEC Electronics America Inc, AU Optronics Corporation America, LG Display Co., LTD., LG Display America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, NEC Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Hitachi Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.) Inc., Tatung Company of America, Inc., Hitachi Displays, LTD, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc and Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv05831
Filed: October 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re: Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Case Closed. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 11/12/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 9, 2015 Filing 287 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hannstar Display Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (440) Motion to Continue in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. In light of the parties' representation that the matter has settled, the parties are directed to file a stipulation of discontinuance by November 20, 2015, or failing that a status report by the same date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/26/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 23, 2015 Filing 286 Joint MOTION to Continue STIPULATION HOLDING DEADLINES IN ABEYANCE by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. (439) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/5/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 2, 2015 Filing 285 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Order Dismissing Parties re 367 Stipulation of Dismissal: Defendants CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD and CHI MEI Optoelectronics Corporation are dismissed with prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/21/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
September 17, 2015 Filing 283 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Neco Alliance LLC (Iovieno, Philip)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (438) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation Pretrial Schedule in Exhibit A of (438) in 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/4/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
September 3, 2015 Filing 282 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. Stipulation (437) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/3/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
July 30, 2015 Filing 281 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
July 4, 2015 Filing 280 Letter Joint Letter re Trial Scheduling by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Order Dismissing Parties: The Court, having considered the stipulation of plaintiffs and certain defendants in these actions, and good cause appearing, orders as follows: 1) The actions filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corp.; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Neco Alliance LLC; and Schultze Agency Services, LLC on behalf of Tweeter Opco, LLC and Tweeter Newco, LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. 2) Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. It is so Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/1/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 30, 2015 Filing 278 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Order Dismissing Parties: Party Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD, terminated. The actions filed by P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Neco Alliance LLC; and Schultze Agency Services, LLC on behalf of Tweeter Opco, LLC and Tweeter Newco, LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(2) as against the following Defendant only: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/25/2015. (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. Stipulation in (433) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (433 in 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB) is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/25/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
June 24, 2015 Filing 276 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE DEADLINES by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (430) Motion to Continue in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation in (430) in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Based on representations that the stipulating parties have entered into a confidential settlement agreement, stipulating parties are directed to file a stipulation of discontinuance by June 30, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/15/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (431) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation in (431) of 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/15/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
June 15, 2015 Filing 275 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
June 11, 2015 Filing 274 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Order Joint Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' Motion to Bifurcate by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Smith, Kyle)
June 10, 2015 Filing 273 MOTION to Continue Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
May 28, 2015 Filing 272 Proposed Scheduling Order JOINT LETTER REGARDING TRIAL AND PROPOSED PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Hannstar Display Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Order Dismissing Parties: Re #270 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal as to LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD. Party LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., LTD. terminated. The Court, having considered the stipulation of plaintiffs and certain defendants in these actions, and good cause appearing, orders as follows: 1. The actions filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corp.; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Neco Alliance LLC; and Schultze Agency Services, LLC on behalf of Tweeter Opco, LLC and Tweeter Newco, LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: LG Display Co., Ltd., and LG Display America, Inc. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. It is so Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/13/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB. (Ortiz, Grisel)
May 13, 2015 Filing 270 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. Docket Entry (425) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/29/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
April 28, 2015 Filing 269 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PAGE LIMITS FOR BIFURCATION BRIEFING by Hannstar Display Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (424) Motion to Continue in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB. Stipulation holding deadlines in abeyance in (424) in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/24/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
April 21, 2015 Filing 268 MOTION to Continue Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER. 423 Briefing Schedule is hereby SO ORDERED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/14/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
April 10, 2015 Filing 267 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation re (421 in 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB) Pretrial Conference - Final, NOTICE OF AGREED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Bussey, Jason)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #266 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas W. Zamiska TERMINATED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/10/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
April 9, 2015 Filing 266 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation. (Zamiska, Nicholas)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER re 415 in 09-cv-04845 and 417 in 09-cv-04845 Letter, filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc. These applications are respectfully REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown for disposition. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/2/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Posillico, Lauren)
March 30, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence J. Zweifach on behalf of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (aty to be noticed) (Zweifach, Lawrence)
March 26, 2015 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart H. Singer on behalf of Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Singer, Stuart)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (419) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB by ABC Appliance, Inc., Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Mr. Singer is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/25/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
March 24, 2015 Filing 263 Letter to Honorable Joan M. Azrack and Honorable Gary R. Brown by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (Sanders, Joel)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar the 3/27/15 conference is rescheduled for 3/30/15 at 2:00 p.m.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/24/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (McMorrow, Karen)
March 6, 2015 Filing 262 Letter to Honorable Joan M. Azrack by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person pretrial conference has been scheduled for March 27, 2015 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 840 of the Central Islip courthouse to discuss joint pre-trial order and other matters. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/2/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
February 27, 2015 Filing 261 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Pretrial Order by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D, #5 Exhibit Attachment E, #6 Exhibit Attachment F, #7 Exhibit Attachment G, #8 Exhibit Attachment H, #9 Exhibit Attachment I, #10 Exhibit Attachment J, #11 Exhibit Attachment K, #12 Exhibit Attachment L, #13 Exhibit Attachment M, #14 Exhibit Attachment N) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-JMA-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-JMA-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-JMA-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
January 15, 2015 Case reassigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to the case. (Florio, Lisa)
January 12, 2015 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Fram on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Fram, Nicholas)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #258 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Fram is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/12/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
January 9, 2015 Filing 259 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation re #257 Notice of Appearance by Brett J. Hartman (Hartman, Brett)
January 9, 2015 Filing 258 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas Fram Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7444042. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas Fram ISO, #2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Fram, Nicholas)
January 8, 2015 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Hartman on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Hartman, Brett)
January 6, 2015 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophie Sung on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) (Sung, Sophie)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #255 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Civ. R. 1.3(c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/6/2015. (Yim, Kevin)
January 5, 2015 Filing 255 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nicholas D. Fram Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7432793. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicholas Fram ISO, #2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Fram, Nicholas)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part Docket Entry 409 of 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB. The joint proposed order is granted to the extent that the due date for the joint proposed pretrial order is EXTENDED to February 27, 2015. Parties are directed to file detailed deposition designations by April 30, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/30/2014. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #254 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Ms. Sung is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/29/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 23, 2014 Filing 254 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7418502. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung In Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit To Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice) (Sung, Sophie)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #253 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with Local Civ. R. 1.3(c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/19/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 18, 2014 Filing 253 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7408210. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung ISO Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Affidavit of Sophie J. Sung ISO Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) (Sung, Sophie)
December 3, 2014 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean David Unger on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) (Unger, Sean)
December 3, 2014 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G. Prout on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Prout, Andrew)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #250 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Unger is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/3/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #245 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Prout is directed to register for ECF, and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/3/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
December 2, 2014 Filing 250 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7370583. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sean D. Unger in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Unger, Sean)
November 19, 2014 Filing 249 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown:Status Conference held on 11/19/2014. Pretrial order due 1/30/2015. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB(Posillico, Lauren)
November 19, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg D. Andres on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Andres, Greg)
November 17, 2014 Filing 247 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Conference Statement) by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Kim, Soo)
November 14, 2014 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (notification declined or already on case) (Hockett, Christopher)
November 13, 2014 Filing 245 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Andrew G. Prout) Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7333330. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Prout, Andrew)
November 10, 2014 Filing 244 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee F. Berger on behalf of LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. (notification declined or already on case) (Berger, Lee)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #242 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #243 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD. Mr. Berger is directed to register for ECF and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/10/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
November 7, 2014 Filing 243 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lee F. Berger Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7322835. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lee F. Berger, #2 Certificate of Good Standing- DC, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - CA, #4 Proposed Order) (Berger, Lee)
November 7, 2014 Filing 242 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lee F. Berger Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7322822. by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lee F. Berger, #2 Certificate of Good Standing- DC, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - CA, #4 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Berger, Lee)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Order Dismissing Parties Party Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. and Toshiba America Information Systems Inc. terminated as to document #341.. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 11/6/2014. (Lundy, Lisa)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #241 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., and CMO Japan Co., Ltd. Mr. Hockett is directed to register for ECF and electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/6/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
November 5, 2014 Filing 241 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher B. Hockett. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7316525. by CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Hockett, Christopher)
November 5, 2014 Filing 240 STIPULATION of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
November 4, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Mark Curran on behalf of Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Curran, Christopher)
October 29, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel S. Sanders on behalf of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (notification declined or already on case) (Sanders, Joel)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 337 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. Mr. Sanders is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/28/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 27, 2014 Filing 237 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joel S. Sanders Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7293981. by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Sanders, Joel)
October 27, 2014 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Pollak on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Pollak, William)
October 23, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Brass on behalf of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD (notification declined or already on case) (Brass, Rachel)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting (391) Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB. The status conference for the all Associated Cases scheduled for October 27, 2014 is hereby ADJOURNED to November 19, 2014 at 11:00am. Parties are directed to appear as scheduled at Courtroom 840 in the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/23/2014. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 22, 2014 Filing 234 MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for October 27, 2014 by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD.. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (House, Holly)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #233 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. Ms. Brass is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/22/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 21, 2014 Filing 233 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachel S. Brass Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7280722. by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing) (Brass, Rachel)
October 21, 2014 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Lawrence Blumenstein on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (notification declined or already on case) (Blumenstein, Carl)
October 21, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Alan Nedeau on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (notification declined or already on case) (Nedeau, Christopher)
October 21, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Farschad Farzan on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (aty to be noticed) (Farzan, Farschad)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference has been scheduled for October 27, 2014 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 840 in the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/20/2014. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Yim, Kevin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila Adams on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Adams, Sheila)
October 17, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas W. Zamiska on behalf of CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc., CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Zamiska, Nicholas)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #227 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. Mr. Farzan is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/16/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #226 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. Mr. Blumenstein is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/16/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #224 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, defendants AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America. Mr. Nedeau is directed to register for ECF and to electronically file a notice of appearance. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/16/2014. (Yim, Kevin)
October 16, 2014 Filing 227 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Farchad Farzan, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7268963. by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of pro hac vice application by Farschad Farzan, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Kim, Soo)
October 16, 2014 Filing 226 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carl L. Blumenstein, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7268841. by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of pro hac vice admission of Carl L. Blumenstein, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Kim, Soo)
October 15, 2014 Filing 225 Letter from William Isaacson re Request for Status Conference by Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies Corp., Neco Alliance LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05827-DRH-GRB, 1:14-cv-05831-DRH-GRB, 2:14-cv-05875-DRH-GRB (Iovieno, Philip)
October 15, 2014 Filing 224 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher A. Nedeau, Esq. Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-7265274. by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of pro hac vice admission by Christopher A. Nedeau, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service) (Kim, Soo)
October 10, 2014 Case Reassigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf, Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky no longer assigned to the case. (Marziliano, August)
October 9, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Covey on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (aty to be noticed) (Covey, David)
October 9, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Soo Yeon Kim on behalf of AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America (aty to be noticed) (Kim, Soo)
October 6, 2014 Cases associated: Create association to 2:09-cv-04845-DRH-GRB. Case Consolidated. (Mahon, Cinthia)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER: GRANTING the Motion to Consolidate Cases (filed in 09cv4845 as doc. 382). Pursuant to the stipulation filed, upon the remand from the MDL Panel, P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, et al. v. AU Optronics Corporation, et al., No. 11-cv-02903 (on remand 1:14cv5827), Schultze Agency Services, LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation, et al., No. 11-cv-03168 (on remand 2:14-cv-5875), NECO Alliance LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation, et al., No. 12-cv-00059 (on remand 1:14-cv-5831) should be consolidated pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42 with Electrograph Systems, Inc., et al. v. Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, et al., Case No. 2:09-cv-04845 before Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on all parties appearing in the P.C. Richard & Son, Schultze Agency, and NECO Alliance LLC actions. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 5/6/2014. (Kaley, Regina) (Originally filed on 5/6/14 on 2:09cv4845-DRH-GRB) (Mahon, Cinthia)
October 6, 2014 The case of Neco Alliance LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation et al, has been transferred from California-Northern to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 1:14-cv-05831-RRM-VVP. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov for guidance. (Marziliano, August)
October 6, 2014 Filing 221 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:12-cv-01426. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 6, 2014 This action is electronically remanded to USDC for the Eastern District of New York. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 3, 2014 Filing 220 Conditional REMAND ORDER to the USDC for the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL Panel on 10/3/14. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURT (11cv3865, 11cv4119 AND 12cv1426) 9220 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 18, 2014 Filing 218 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Suggestion of Remand [Master Docket No. 9220] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DAVID P. STOWELL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 #193 , 9070 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DIRECT PURCHASER CLAIMS FOR WHICH THE PANEL WAS FIRST SOLD TO A THIRD PARTY MANUFACTURER #189 , 9056 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 215 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #214 Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9202] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), #8 Exhibit 6 (Part 1), #9 Exhibit 6 (Part 2), #10 Exhibit 7)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 214 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc re #193 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9201] (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/28/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 213 Declaration of John H. Chung in Support of #212 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9199] filed byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-23 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit 24-27 to Declaration of John H. Chung)(Related document(s) #212 ) (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 212 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #192 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9198] (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 211 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #210 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. No. 9196] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #210 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 25, 2014 Filing 210 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #189 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9195] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 17, 2014 Filing 209 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC re #193 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case. [Master Docket No. 9168] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johnny W. Carter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/17/2014) Modified on 7/18/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 208 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC re #189 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Third Party Manufacturers [Master Docket No. 9162] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 207 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #206 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9159] filed byNeco Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-45, #3 Exhibit 46-65, #4 Exhibit 66-82, #5 Exhibit 83-95)(Related document(s) #206 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 14, 2014 Filing 206 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC re #192 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9158] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting in part and denying in part (9141) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON UNDISCLOSED CONSPIRATORS OR AFFILIATES #163 , 8921 signed by Judge Illston on 7/3/14 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014) Modified on 7/7/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 203 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #201 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation and Defendants' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation [MDL Docket No. 9145] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 7/1/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING #165 , 8924 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2014) Modified on 7/2/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 201 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation (MDL Dkt. No. 9141) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/30/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 200 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #198 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of #163 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Undisclosed Co-Conspirators and Affiliates [MDL Dkt. No. 9138] by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibits BB and EE to Declaration of Lee F. Berger)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 199 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #197 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. #9135] by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/26/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #196 , (9093 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #191 , (9059 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 196 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9093] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 195 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #194 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Redacted-Public Version [MDL Dkt. No. 9092] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (DUPLICATE OF MAIN DOCUMENTS - Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB, #2 Exhibit CC, #3 Exhibit DD, #4 Exhibit EE, #5 Exhibit FF)(Related document(s) #194 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/11/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 10, 2014 Filing 194 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #163 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Redacted-Public Version Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Undisclosed Co-Conspirators and Affiliates [MDL Dkt. No. 9091] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/10/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 5, 2014 Filing 193 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc (Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, filed as MDL Dkt. No. 9070) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong with supporting Exs. A-I)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/5/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 192 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As To Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [MDL No. 1827, Docket Nos. 9061 and 9062] (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #4 Errata 6-10 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #5 Exhibit 11-15 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #6 Exhibit 16-20 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #7 Exhibit 21-25 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #8 Exhibit 26-32 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #9 Exhibit 33-39 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #10 Exhibit 40-44 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #11 Exhibit 45-49 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #12 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 191 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9059, 9059-1, 9059-2] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 190 ***ERRONEOUS EVENT WAS USED - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 187***Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #189 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Public Version of Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9058] CORRECTION OF DOCKET #187 wrong e-filing event used (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhbiit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 189 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Redacted-Public Versiion of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] CORRECTION OF DOCKET #186 wrong e-filing event used (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 188 ***ERRONEOUS EVENT WAS USED - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 191*** Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9059]. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 187 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #186 MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted-Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] [MDL Dkt. No. 9058] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) #186 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 186 ***ERRONEOUS EVENT WAS USED - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 189*** Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted-Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer. [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 185 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Response re Motion for Summary Judgment UNREDACTED Response (MDL Dkt. No. 9048) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart H. Singer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal #166 , 8923 in 7-1827. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 183 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 5/27/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston denying #177 , (8984) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Counsel shall take care to include the correct case numbers in it's filings, there were several incorrect numbers in the caption.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #180 , (9010) Stipulation re: use of expert compensation at trial in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (295) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (262) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (281) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) Modified on 5/13/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 9, 2014 Filing 180 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Use of Expert Compensation at Trial [MDL No. 9010](Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 179 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #178 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, filed byNeco Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O-1, #16 Exhibit O-2, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z-1, #28 Exhibit Z-2, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG, #36 Exhibit HH, #37 Exhibit II, #38 Exhibit JJ, #39 Exhibit KK, #40 Exhibit LL, #41 Exhibit MM, #42 Exhibit NN, #43 Exhibit OO, #44 Exhibit PP, #45 Exhibit QQ, #46 Exhibit RR, #47 Exhibit SS, #48 Exhibit TT, #49 Exhibit UU, #50 Exhibit VV)(Related document(s) #178 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 178 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Based on Undisclosed Conspirators or Affiliates [Master Docket No. 8991] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 29, 2014 Filing 177 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC to File Under Seal portions of their opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition Brief, #4 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exh A, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exh C)[MDL No. 8984].(Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8976) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI as to various cases, see order for details. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 24, 2014 Filing 175 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 8976) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/24/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 23, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing MOTIONS SET PURSUANT TO ORDER 8872 : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 23, 2014 Filing 174 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/23/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 4/23/2014). The Court granted the Administrative Motion to Appoint Liaison Counsel #8957. Carl Blumenstein will continue in his role as defense liaison. SB Liquidation Trust indicated that it is in the process of settling their case (10-5458). By May 7, 2014, counsel will submit a proposed pretrial and trial schedule for Acer America (13-3349), Home Depot (13-6001), and Proview (13-3802), and a trial schedule for the Circuit City Case (10-5625). Every other case not specifically scheduled for a trial date will eventually will be remanded back to the originating districts. (Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER RE: APRIL 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8957 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 16, 2014 Filing 172 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) (Filed as Dkt. No. 8962 in MDL 1827) filed by AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/16/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 9, 2014 Filing 171 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America Stipulation and Proposed Order Allowing Production of Sealed Pleadings in Related Case MDL Dkt 8950 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Illinois Stipulation)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/9/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER: DAUBERT Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/7/14. (8947 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 7, 2014 Filing 169 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule (MDL Dkt. No. 8947) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/7/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 2, 2014 Filing 168 CLERKS NOTICE FOR ALL REMAINING CASES: A further case management Conference has been set for 4/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston The Court has determined that the following cases are remain open: 3:09-cv-04997-SI, 3:10-cv-03205-SI, 3:10-cv-04346-SI, 3:10-cv-05458-SI, 3:10-cv-05625-SI, 3:11-cv-00829-SI, 3:11-cv-02225-SI, 3:11-cv-02495-SI, 3:11-cv-03763-SI, 3:11-cv-03856-SI, 3:11-cv-04119-SI, 3:11-cv-05765-SI, 3:11-cv-05781-SI, 3:11-cv-06241-SI, 3:12-cv-00335-SI, 3:12-cv-01426-SI, 3:12-cv-01596-SI, 3:12-cv-02214-SI, 3:12-cv-02495-SI, 3:12-cv-03802-SI, 3:12-cv-05371-SI, 3:12-cv-05460-SI, 3:13-cv-03349-SI, 3:13-cv-06001-SI. Counsel shall inform the clerk immediately if a case has been omitted for this notice. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed on or before April 17, 2014. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 25, 2014 Filing 167 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.s Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing (MDL No. 8923) filed byNeco Alliance LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/25/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 166 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chun Administrative Motion to File Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Redacted Motion Summary Judgment Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #4 Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #5 Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #6 Redacted Exhibits 47-48, #7 Unredacted Motion Summary Judgment Re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Antitrust Standing, #8 Unredacted Exhs 1-18, #9 Unredacted Exhs 27-35, #10 Unredacted Exhs 36, #11 Unredacted Exhs 37-38, #12 Unredacted Exh 39, #13 Unredacted 40-42, #14 Unredacted 47-48)[MDL No. 8923](Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 165 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted). Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 4/1/2014. Replies due by 4/8/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Brownstein ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 1-18, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 19-26, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 27-42, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 43-46, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 47-48)[MDL No.8924](Brownstein, David) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 164 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #163 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. 8922] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #163 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 18, 2014 Filing 163 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Claims Based on Undisclosed Conspirators or Affiliates [MDL Dkt. 8921] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #161 , (8879) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 18, 2014 Filing 161 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues [MDL No. 8879] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Motion Hearings set for TRACK 2 CASES. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/28/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 28, 2014 Filing 159 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Summary Judgment Schedule [MDL Master Dkt. 8870] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 1/28/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER, (8849 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING TRACK 2 DEADLINES filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/14 is continued to 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/14/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 13, 2014 Filing 157 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Track 2 Deadlines; MDL Dkt. No. 8849 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/13/2014) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8838) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 19, 2013 Filing 155 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 8838 (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8831) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the Parties, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that: 1. The deadline for the Parties to meet and confer regarding the Proposed List of Summary Judgment Motions and Schedule for same is extended from December 11, 2013 to January 9, 2014. 2. The deadline for the Parties to file with the Court a Joint List of Proposed Summary Judgment Motions and Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment Filings is extendedfrom December 12, 2013 to January 13, 2014. 3. This stipulation does not affect any other Track 2 deadlines as set forth in the Courts September 6, 2013 Order re Track 2 Deadlines. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
December 11, 2013 Filing 153 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America 8831 Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Revised Deadlines in Track 2 Re: Summary Judgment Motion Lists (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 8804 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by the undersigned counsel on behalf of the Stipulating Parties that all case schedules and deadlines in the above-captioned actions shall be held in abeyance as to the Stipulating Defendants only, and shall be revised as specified above in the event that the above-captioned cases are not dismissed as to the Stipulating Defendants. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 27, 2013 Filing 151 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 8804 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8789) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Hitachi defendants filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 149 NOTICE by Neco Alliance LLC Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Description of Issues/Subjects of Summary Judgment Motions (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 22, 2013 Filing 148 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation with Proposed Order of Dismissal; MDL Dkt. No. 8789 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 13, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE by HannStar Display Corporation Notice of Withdrawal (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Derr Schmidt on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Schmidt, Melissa) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 28, 2013 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 10/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8655) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED between counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants in the Track 2 cases, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that Defendants opposition expert reports shall be served by October 31, 2013, and the underlying code and data for those reports shall be served by November 6, 2013. No other dates from the Courts Track 2 Scheduling Order shall be altered by this stipulation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8646) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI 1. The actions filed by Plaintiffs Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.; Office Depot, Inc.; Interbond Corporation of America; Schultze Agency Services, LLC; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.; The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust; CompuCom Systems, Inc.; and NECO Alliance LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America, Inc.; Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.; NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, and NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.; and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 139 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 8646] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 138 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #137 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) filed byNeco Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #137 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 1, 2013 Filing 137 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); DKT No. 8636 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 20, 2013 Filing 136 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation re #133 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Opposition to Motion to Compel Sharp 30(b)(6) Deposition (MDL Dkt. 8615) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay Lutz, #2 Exhibit A - F)(Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER re: Certain Expert Depositions in Track 2. re #131 , 8498 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) re #130 , 8497 . Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 30, 2013 Filing 133 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply With Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); MDL Dkt. No. 8553 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 29, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE by Neco Alliance LLC Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/29/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2013 Filing 131 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN EXPERT DEPOSITIONS IN TRACK 2 [MDL DKT NO. 8498] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2013 Filing 130 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL DKT NO. 8497] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 13, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/13/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #127 , (8350) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records" (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/30/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 24, 2013 Filing 127 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records"; MDL Dkt. No. 8350 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #122 , (8169) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel filed by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. AS AMENDED (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL IN TRACK 2 CASES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL re #120 , 8159 in 7-1827 Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/25/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #120 , (8159) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 21, 2013 Filing 122 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation [MDL Dkt. 8169] Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/21/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 6/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 20, 2013 Filing 120 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8159 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #115 , (8076) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER 8060 Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #95 , (7973) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re #108 . (8060) Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/10/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 12, 2013 Filing 115 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (FILED AS DKT #8076 IN MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/12/2013) Modified on 6/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Hansen (Hansen, Bradley) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Harper Knox (Knox, Samantha) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra West Neukom (West Neukom, Sandra) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 11, 2013 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 6/11/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 7, 2013 Filing 110 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel [MDL No. 8065] (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/10/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #98 . (8035) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 6, 2013 Filing 108 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8060 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #94 . (7987) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI: Stipulation with proposed order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (AMENDED DOCUMENT of 7984 by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #91 . (8001) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #96 . (7999) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #95 . (8000) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #94 . (7989) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #93 . (7988) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #88 . (7985) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation with Proposed Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #90 . (7994) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL filed by Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 31, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE by CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 5/31/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 31, 2013 Filing 98 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8035 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/31/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 30, 2013 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 5/30/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 96 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7999 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 95 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8000 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 94 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7989 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 93 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7988 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #86 . (7983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed in MDL Master Case by Best Buy Co., Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, Jaco Electronics, Inc., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Rockwell Automation Inc., Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC, Sony Electronics, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Viewsonic Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 28, 2013 Filing 91 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8001 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 90 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL. [MDL NO.7994] (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 89 Notice of Motion/Stipulation - AMENDED DOCUMENT by Neco Alliance LLC. Amendment to #87 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7987. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 88 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7985 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 87 ***PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #89***Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7984 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 86 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7983 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 23, 2013 Filing 85 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel (Davis, Allison) [MDL NO. 7973]. (Filed on 5/23/2013) Modified on 5/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #83 . (7939) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Further Depositions filed by Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013) Modified on 5/23/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 17, 2013 Filing 83 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imagining Devices Corporation STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Further Depositions, MDL Docket No. 7939 (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #81 . (7919) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 16, 2013 Filing 81 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7919 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/16/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #79 . (7866) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: EXTENDING CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO MITSUI & CO. (USA), INC. AND MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. DEPOSITIONS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 8, 2013 Filing 79 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Close of Fact Discovery with Respect to Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. and Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. Depositions [MDL NO.7866]. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2013) Modified on 5/9/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #77 . (7770) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 23, 2013 Filing 77 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7770 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/23/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 27, 2013 Filing 76 AMENDED MINUTES FROM 3/15/13 HEARING: ADDING THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE (NO OTHER CHANGES) T-Mobile and Defendants shall submit a stipulation to the 75 day extension, with revised dates. If T-Mobile seeks to reinstate certain indirect purchaser claims pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's AT&T Mobility LLC v. AU Optronics Corp. decision, it must submit a motion. The Court grants T-Mobile leave to submit such motion.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7652) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI REVISED TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER re #73 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 74 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Track I(b) trial has been continued to 7/22/13 and the pretrial is continued to 7/9/13 (7-1827, 10-4572, 10-4945, 10-5452, and 12-4114)By 3/29/13, counsel shall submit a proposed pretrial scheduling order with repect to the Track I(b) cases.As to Track I(b), there will be no ATM FEE evidentiary hearing. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 14, 2013 Filing 73 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL No. 7652] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 12, 2013 Filing 72 Joint Case Management Conference Statement by Neco Alliance LLC [MDL Dkt. No. 7640] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/12/2013) Modified on 3/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/13 is continued 3/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/1/13., Motions terminated: (102 in 3:11-cv-06241-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 1, 2013 Filing 70 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7616) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain of NECO Alliance, LLC's Claims re #68 .(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013) Modified on 2/21/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 19, 2013 Filing 68 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation Stipulation and [Proposed} Order for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain of NECO Alliance, LLC's Claims, [Docket No. 7616] (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 2/19/2013) Modified on 2/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (SEE TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER 7139 ) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 10, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 1/10/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 10, 2013 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/10/2013) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER The August 20, 2013 and September 10, 2013 deadlines for the parties to provide additional and supplemental description[s] of each issue/subject of summary judgment motions are hereby vacated and replaced with the following: August 20, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to serve proposed list of summary judgment motions (copies to be provided to the court). August 21-September 9, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to meet and confer over proposed list of summary judgment motions and schedule for same. September 10, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to file with the Court joint list of proposed summary judgment motions and proposed schedule for summary judgment filings. October 30, 2013: Last day to file supplemental list of proposed summary judgment motions based upon new information or issues raised in the reply expert reports.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 21, 2012 Filing 64 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Neco Alliance LLC Letter from Messrs. Murray and Foran Re Summary Judgment on Track 2 Cases and Proposed Order (MDL 7213) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TRACK 2 SCHEDULING ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
November 13, 2012 Filing 62 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). The ATS Claims, Dell and Nokia cases ARE CONTINUED TO 11/30/12 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (9-1115, 10-1064, 09--5609)Counsel in the Track 2 cases shall select a mediator and inform the court of the name of the person selected. The Court will file an order approving the stipulated revised schedule for Track 2 cases.The Court will issue a separate order addressing Daubert motions in the cases set for trial in January 2013, streamlining summary judgment practice in the Track 2 cases, as well as the issue of consolidating the Best Buy cases. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
October 19, 2012 Filing 60 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
September 25, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 29, 2012 Filing 58 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (filed as docket no. 6579 in MDL 1827) byAU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 8/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting extension of time for AUO Defendants to answer complaint 6508 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/23/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 56 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer of Hitachi, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd. (n/k/a Japan Display East, Inc.), and Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc. to NECO Alliance LLC's First Amended Complaint byHitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi LTD. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 6508 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (32) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI EXTENDING TIME FOR AUO DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER COMPLAINT filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Neco Alliance LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012) Modified on 8/23/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 23, 2012 Filing 54 HannStar Display Corp.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint NECO Alliance LLC's First Amended Complaint byHannstar Display Corporation. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 53 Toshiba Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint #3) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 52 Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.'s ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint Docket #3) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 51 Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint Docket #3) byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 50 Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint byToshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 49 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 48 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Corporation of America. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 47 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer of Defendants Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America, Inc. to NECO ALLIANCE, LLC's First Amended Complaint byEpson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 46 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 45 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 44 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Corporation. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 43 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byChunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 42 Sharp Electronics Corporation ANSWER to Amended Complaint of NECO Alliance LLC bySharp Electronics Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 41 Sharp Corporation ANSWER to Amended Complaint Amended Complaint of NECO Alliance LLC bySharp Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 40 ANSWER to Amended Complaint ANSWER AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES OF CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS CORPORATION (N/K/A CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION), CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC., AND CMO JAPAN CO., LTD. TO NECO ALLIANCE LLCS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byCMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 39 ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Murdock-Park , Paul P. Eyre, Ernest E. Vargo, Tracy L. Cole, and Michael E. Mumford (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 36 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 35 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 34 LG Display Co., Ltd. ANSWER to Amended Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 22, 2012 Filing 33 Defendant LG Display America Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint byLG Display America, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 8/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR AUO DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (MDL 1827 DKT. #6508) filed by AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, AU Optronics Corporation America, Neco Alliance LLC. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 8/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed on 8/3/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting (6321) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (30) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI. Regarding Extension of Time to Answer Complaint and Pleading Ruling filed by Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 31, 2012 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time to Answer Complaint and Pleading Ruling filed by Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 7/31/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed on 7/11/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting (6215) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (28) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI, REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF SERVICE (NEC) filed by Neco (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF SERVICE (NEC) filed by Neco Alliance LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 27 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Cutoff Hearing set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed on 7/6/12 by Judge Illston granting ( 5861 ) Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (89) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05458-SI; granting (109) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (112) Motion in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (135) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (127) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (71) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting (111) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (92) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (27) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04116-SI; granting (122) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting (42) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting (56) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting (45) Motion in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting (15) Motion in case 3:12-cv-00335-SI; granting (14) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI; granting (13) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01599-SI; granting (11) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02214-SI; granting (8) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02495-SI (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 9, 2012 Filing 25 Minute Entry: Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order held on 7/6/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 7/9/2012). The Court will issue the scheduling order. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE: ALL PARTIES ARE ADVISED THAT THE MOTION RE: TWO TRACK SCHEDULING WILL BE HELD STARTING AT 9:30 A.M. INSTEAD OF 9:00 A.M. TOMORROW, FRIDAY, JULY 6, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 23 Request for Judicial Notice re #22 Reply to Opposition/Response NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re Track Two Plaintiffs' Scheduling Motion filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B Part 1 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B Part 2 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C-D to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 27, 2012 Filing 22 REPLY (re #14 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) filed byNeco Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Mooney)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/27/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 26, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 6/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas , Jason S. Angell, and Jerry Chen on behalf of HannStar Display Corp. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG CO. OF AMERICA signed on 6/21/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5962 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #113 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #126 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting ( #58 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting ( #18 ) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2012: #1 Order with Judicial Signature) (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/26/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC. filed by Neco Alliance LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 19, 2012 Filing 17 RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) Defendants' Jint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases with Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order re: Pretrial and Trial Schedule)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 6/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed on 6/11/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5885 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #15 ) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI for Extension of Time for Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. to Respond to Plaintiff NECO Alliance LLC's Complaint (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 8, 2012 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 6/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 6, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting filed by Neco Alliance LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/19/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF NECO ALLIANCE'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL 5762 #12 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 22, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE by Neco Alliance LLC NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF NECO ALLIANCE LLC FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher V. Fenlon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/22/2012) Modified on 5/23/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed on 5/14/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5655 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #10 ) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI. Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order filed by Epson Electronics America, Inc (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
May 10, 2012 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Waiver of Service, and [Proposed] Order filed by Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 5/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
April 2, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MELISSA FELDER (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/07. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 22, 2012 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:12-cv-00059. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 16, 2012 Case extracted and electronically transferred to the Northern District of California. MDL No. 1827 IN RE: TFT-LCD (FLAT PANEL) ANTITRUST LITIGATION. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Mahon, Cinthia) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 16, 2012 Filing 6 Certified Copy of JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-21) received from the USDC, NDCA. The action on the attached schedule is transferred under 28 U.S.C., Section 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of April 17, 2007, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Hon. Susan Yvonee Illston. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, stay lifted March 12, 2012. (Attachments: #(1) Cover Letter) IN RE: TFT-LCD (FLAT PANEL) ANTITRUST LITIGATION MDL No. 1827 (Mahon, Cinthia) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 12, 2012 Filing 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CT0-21). Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of April 17,2007, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Susan Yvonne Illston. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
March 1, 2012 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Plaintiff is directed to print the summons and type in the individual defendant's name and address on each summons. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER TO ISSUE SUMMONS: The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Summons in connection with the filing of the First Amended Complaint #3 . Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 2/27/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 27, 2012 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, CMO Japan CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc, Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, LTD., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, LTD., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD, filed by Neco Alliance LLC. (Iovieno, Philip) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 23, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf: Conference held on 2/23/2012. Counsel for plaintiff present. The Court addressed Plaintiff's use of confidential information, obtained through the representation of certain clients in another a case, and governed by a protective order in that case, to initiate this new proceeding on behalf of a different client. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's request to seal those portions of the instant Complaint containing information subject to the protective order. The Court ORDERS that the original complaint [Doc. No. 1] remain sealed, and that by February 27, 2012, Plaintiff file an Amended Compliant so captioned omitting all information subject to the protective order. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that the docket and all other documents filed in connection with this case be unsealed. (Court Reporter Anthony Mancuso.) (Valentin, Winnethka) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 6, 2012 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Philip J. Iovieno in support of pltf. Neco Alliance LLC's application to file complaint under seal. (Greene, Donna) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's request to file all or part of the instant Complaint under seal. By February 6, 2012, Plaintiff shall file an affidavit either requesting that the Complaint in its entirety be unsealed, or setting forth supplemental facts as well as the legal basis for why portions of the Complaint should be sealed, including, but not limited to, detailing whether the information sought to be sealed was obtained through and is subject to the protective order cited in Plaintiff's Declaration dated January 5, 2012 [1-2], and if so, whether it can properly be used to initiate this proceeding. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 2/3/2012. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 5, 2012 FILING FEE: $ 350, receipt number 4653038293 (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 5, 2012 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]
January 5, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Neco Alliance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 proposed order) (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/6/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neco Alliance LLC v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC LCD Technologies LTD
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: William D. Pollak
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Sheila Adams
Represented By: Nicholas W. Zamiska
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Greg D. Andres
Represented By: Brett J. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan CO., LTD
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: William D. Pollak
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Sheila Adams
Represented By: Nicholas W. Zamiska
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Greg D. Andres
Represented By: Brett J. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics America Inc
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: Christopher Alan Nedeau
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: David M. Covey
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., LTD.
Represented By: Sophie Sung
Represented By: Lee F. Berger
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Represented By: Sophie Sung
Represented By: Lee F. Berger
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Represented By: Lindsay A. Lutz
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: Hugh Frederick Bangasser
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Represented By: Soo Yeon Kim
Represented By: Christopher Alan Nedeau
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: David M. Covey
Represented By: Farschad Farzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD
Represented By: Lawrence J. Zweifach
Represented By: Joel S. Sanders
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: David C. Brownstein
Represented By: Austin Van Schwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHI MEI Optoelectronics USA Inc.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Harrison J Frahn, IV
Represented By: William D. Pollak
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Neal A. Potischman
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Emmet P Ong
Represented By: Sheila Adams
Represented By: Nicholas W. Zamiska
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Greg D. Andres
Represented By: Brett J. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.) Inc.
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, LTD
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems Inc.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John Hail Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neco Alliance LLC
Represented By: Philip J. Iovieno
Represented By: Melissa B Felder
Represented By: Kyle Smith
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?