Trisvan v. Annucci et al
Plaintiff: |
John Trisvan |
Defendant: |
Anthony Annucci, A. Gould, Y. King and A. McCleary |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv06016 |
Filed: |
October 14, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Lois Bloom |
Presiding Judge: |
Margo K. Brodie |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 24, 2021 |
Filing
149
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 142 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court grants Defendants' summary judgment motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to Plaintiff at the address of record and close this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/24/2021. (Bacchi, Joseph)
|
May 30, 2019 |
Filing
118
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Accordingly, because the issue was not raised by Defendants, the Court declines to consider whether Annucci and Gaynor are entitled to qualified immunity for Plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation cla im. The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' 112 motion to dismiss. The Court denies the motion as to Plaintiff's First Amendment retaliation claim against Annucci and Gaynor. The Court grants the motion as to all o ther remaining claims and dismisses those claims without leave to amend. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 5/30/2019. (Copy of this Order and the attached copies of all unreported cases cited herein sent to pro se Plaintiff.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
|
November 5, 2018 |
Filing
107
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Plaintiff filed an 88 Order to Show Cause on 6/20/2018, seeking a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction releasing him from parole supervision. Defendants 93 oppose Plaintiff's applicatio ns. For the reasons set forth herein, the Court denies Plaintiff's 88 application for temporary and preliminary injunctive relief. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Memorandum and Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 11/5/2018. (Copy of this Order and the attached copies of all unpublished decisions cited herein sent to pro se Plaintiff.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
|
January 9, 2018 |
Filing
79
ORDER granting 63 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 75 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. For the reasons stated in the attached memorandum and order, the Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss, and grants Plaintiff leave to file a fourth amended complaint within thirty (30) days. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/9/2018. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 1/9/2018. (Chu, Chan Hee)
|
December 16, 2016 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. For the reasons discussed in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court grants Defendants' Motion to Dimiss and grants Plaintiff leave to file a third amended complaint within thirty (30) days of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 12/16/2016. (Hawkins, Salah)
|
April 29, 2015 |
Filing
11
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff's 2 request to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. Plaintiff's 6 Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED by by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 4/29/2015. C/mailed to pro se Plaintiff. (Forwarded for Judgment.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?