Huebner v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Levi Huebner
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc
Case Number: 1:2014cv06046
Filed: October 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Brian M. Cogan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 11/10/16 that defendant's 97 Motion for Sanctions is granted in part and denied in part. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/10/2016 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER dated 6/3/16 granting defendant's 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; and the Third Amended Complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff's 91 Motion for class certification is denied. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/3/2016 ) *Forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 5/1/15 that plaintiff's 20 motion for recusal and related relief is DENIED. The case shall proceed in the normal course to determine if the new version of the claim that plaintiff has not set forth has any merit. However, I am sanctioning plaintiff's attorney for failing to participate in the Initial Status Conference in good faith as required by Rule 16. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/1/2015 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated 2/11/15. Plaintiff and his attorney are Ordered to Show Cause by 2/18/15 why this action should not be dismissed, with fees costs awarded under 15:1692k(a)(3), and sanctions issued pursuant to Rule 11. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/11/2015 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huebner v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Huebner
Represented By: Elie C. Poltorak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?