Geer v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: |
Pakenauth Geer |
Defendant: |
Richard Brown, Catherine Tabinsky and Jack Warsowsky |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv06172 |
Filed: |
October 20, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Carol Bagley Amon |
Presiding Judge: |
Lois Bloom |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 3, 2016 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Geer's amended complaint is therefore dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close the case. The Court ce rtifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Comedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 6/3/2016. (fwd for judgment) (Fernandez, Erica)
|
July 1, 2015 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiffs complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1), and, as to Holder, because it seeks monetary relief from a defendant who has absolute judicial immun ity, id. § 1915A(b)(2). However, as stated above, Geer may file an amended complaint as to certain claims within thirty (30) days of this Order. If he fails to do so, the Court shall enter judgment as to those claims. The Court certifies pursuan t to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438,444-45 (1962). Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 6/30/2015. c/m to pro se Pltf (Fernandez, Erica)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?