Freeman et al v. HSBC Holdings PLC et al
Plaintiff: Paul D. Harris, Tricia English, Matthew Menke, Jeffrey D. Price, Patricia Arsiaga for the Estate of Jeremy Arsiaga, K.W., a minor, Johnny Washburn, Jason Sackett, I.F., Danielle Sweet, Zachary Hake, Jacqueline A. Smith, Stephanie McCully, Cedric Hunt, Sr., Michael David, G.B., W.H., Kathy Stillwell for the Estate of Daniel Crabtree, David Lucas, Michelle Klemensberg, Janet Jones, Mariah Simoneaux, Michelle Benavidez, Donna Engeman for the Estate of John W. Engeman, Anastasia Fuller for the Estate of Alexander H. Fuller, Fred Frigo, T.S., Timothy W. Elledge, Matthew Lilley, David Hartley, Dawn Haines, M.T., a minor, Cara Roberts, Donna Lewis, Temika Swinton, Nanette Saenz, William Farrar, Sr., Keri Cotton, N.T., a minor, Cortez Glawson, Jeffrey Anderson, Noala Fritz for the Estate of Lyle Fritz, Cynthia Thornsberry, Denise Blohm, S.J.S., a minor, Michael Lucas, Brenda Habsieger, Judy Huenink, Melissa Dressler, Sangsoon Kim, A.K., a minor, John D. Lamie, Devon Fletcher Hickman, Andrew Lucas, B.D., a minor, Carrol Alderete, Richard Tomson, Ava Tomson, Katherine McRill-Fellini, John Gibson, Bradley Starcevich, Adam G. Stout, Noala Fritz for the Estate of Jacob Fritz, Scott Hood, Jerry L. Myers, Silver Farr, H. Joseph Bandhold, Christopher Levi, Patricia Smith, Tabitha McCoy, Charles Vincent, Kelli D. Hake, E.M., Noala Fritz, Brittany Marionique Joshua, Jill Hake, Sylvia Macias, Marlynn Gonzales, James Canine, Todd Daily, J.L., a minor, Richard Fraser, Thomas Smith, Nicholas Baumhoer, Erika Neuman, Calvin Canine, John McCully, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, Wesley Williamson, C.W., Paula Menke, Sean Elliott, G.L., a minor, Vivian Pickett, Megan People, Sabrina Cumbe, Lawrence Kruger, J.J.M., Jr., Jacob Michael Habsieger, Matthew Arsiaga, Shawn Bartlett, Ilene Dixon, M.C., a minor, C.L., Jennifer Morman, Adam Wood, Skylar Hake, Nicole Landon, Armando Fuentes, Merlese Pickett for the Estate of Emmanuel Pickett, Brian Coke, Johnny Javier Miles, Sr., Nancy Fuentes, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Stephanie Gibson Webster, Nancy Fuentes for the Estate of Daniel A. Fuentes, R.J.S., a minor, Tracy Anderson, James Smith, Joedi Wood, Kousay Al-Taie for the Estate of Ahmed Al-Taie, A.B., Robert Bartlett, Don Jason Stone, Bashar Al-Taie, George D. White, Tony Gonzales, Linda Gibson, Rosemarie Alfonso, Ashley Gudridge, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, Angel Munoz, David Noble, Robert Funcheon, Robert Canine, Amy Lynn Robinson, Donna Lewis for the Estate of Jason Dale Lewis, Donald C. Bandhold, Jeanette West, Julie Chism, Patrick Farr, Harry Pickett, Ariana Reyes, Wayne Newby, Esther Wolfer, John Vandegrift for the Estate of Matthew R. Vandegrift, Christopher Miller, Shelby West, Tracie Arsiaga, Les Kuglics, Sean Slaven, Philip S. Ford, L.T., a minor, Dixie Flagg, Randolph Freeman, Elizabeth Brown, Shaula Shaffer, T.F., a minor, Anna Karcher, Jill Ann Bock, William Parker, Michelle Kim, Robin Roberts, Wayne Brown, Russel York, Helen Fraser, G.H., Tammy Vanderwaal, Amanda B. Adair, George J. White, Trina Jackson, Roberto Andrade, Sr., Dan Dixon for the Estate of Robert J. Dixon, Jolene Lilley, Lisa Ramaci, Jean Mariano, Mackenzie Haines, Kynesha Dhanoolal for the Estate of Dayne D. Dhanoolal, Floyd Burton Robinson, S.J., N.C.E., Ryan Sabinish, Theresa Hart, Stephanie Howard, Walter Bailey, T.B., Cynthia Delgado for the Estate of George Delgado, Cassie Collins for the Estate of Shannon M. Smith, Brett Coke, K.L., a minor, Holly Burson-Gilpin, Victoria Denisse Andrade, Linda Pritchett, Deborah Noble, Merlese Pickett, Steve Morin, Sr., Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Ann Christopher, Denice York, Kemely Pickett, Julio Fuentes, Dakota Smith-Lizotte, Leonard Wolfer, R.N.R., a minor, K.B., Wood Megan, David Eugene Hickman, Linda Jones, John Vacho, Kimberley Vesey, James Craig Roberts, Edna Luz Burgos, Nichole Lohring, Shannon Millican, Ardith Cecil Dressler, Kathy Stillwell, Tabitha McCoy for the Estate of Steve A. McCoy, A.B., a minor, N.W.E., Kimberlee Austin-Oliver, Hyunjung Glawson, Tiffany M. Little for the Estate of Kyle A. Little, Michael Habsieger, Shyanne Smith-Lizotte, Kyshia Sutton, Shaylyn C. Reece, T.M., a minor, Kari Carosella, Tiffany M. Little, Peter Hake, Linda David, C.F., a minor, Tifany Haupt, Shelley Ann Smith, Glenda Starcevich, Gilbert Arsiaga, Jr., Emily Levi, Audrey Karcher, Jeremy Blohm, Kacey Gilmore, David W. Haines, Nancy Umbrell, Debbie Smith, Chad Farr, A.S.E., Curtis Glawson, Sr., Tonya K. Dressler, Rayanne Hunter, D.W., Terrel Charles Bartlett, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, Hathal K. Taie, Daniel C. Oliver, Megan Smith, Mary Jane Vandegrift, Kathleen Snyder, Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, Joanne Gutcher, Cassandra Bailey, Nawal Al-Taie, Billy Wallace, Kristy Kruger, Marsha Novak, Mitchell Millican, Donna Engeman, Michael Smith, Seop Steve Kim, Donna Kuglics, Mark Umbrell, Bryan Montgomery, Nathan Newby, Yolanda M. Brooks, T.H. and Linda Falter
Defendant: Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Barclays, HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank Middle East Limited
Amicus Curiae: Major General Anthony A. Cucolo, Lieutenant General Keith Walker, Brigadier General William H. Forrester, General James D Thurman and Lieutenant General Daniel P. Bolger
Case Number: 1:2014cv06601
Filed: November 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 214 Letter dated, February 15, 2019, to Hon. Dora L. Irizarry from Jonathan I. Blackman by Commerzbank AG (Attachments: #1 Case Status Chart) (Blackman, Jonathan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 213 Letter To The Hon. Dora L. Irizarry by Bank Saderat PLC (Frey, Jeremy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc R. Cohen on behalf of Credit Suisse (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Marc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 7, 2018, before Judge Pollak. Court Reporter/Transcriber Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number 203-929-9992. Email address: cmfiore@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 2/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2019. (Hong, Loan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex C. Lakatos on behalf of Credit Suisse (aty to be noticed) (Lakatos, Alex)
January 17, 2019 Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Charles Kelly on behalf of Credit Suisse (aty to be noticed) (Kelly, Kevin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Hamburg on behalf of Credit Suisse (aty to be noticed) (Hamburg, Robert)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #207 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Michael T. Reynolds, John D. Buretta, and Richard Wayland Clary of Cravath, Swaine & Moore are substituted for Mark G. Hanchet of Mayer Brown LLP. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/17/2019. (Zisa, Marie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 207 MOTION to Substitute Attorney STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Credit Suisse. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark G. Hanchet) (Hanchet, Mark)
January 16, 2019 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Hanchet on behalf of Credit Suisse (aty to be noticed) (Hanchet, Mark)
January 14, 2019 Filing 205 Letter to Hon. Dora L. Irizarry from Jonathan Blackman dated January 14, 2019 regarding recent Seventh Circuit Order by Commerzbank AG (Attachments: #1 Enclosure (January 10, 2019 Order in Kemper v. Deutsche Bank AG, 18-1031)) (Blackman, Jonathan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 204 Letter from Gary M. Osen to Chief Judge Dora L. Irizarry regarding Defendants' letter dated December 19, 2018 by Charlotte Freeman (Osen, Gary)
December 19, 2018 Filing 203 Letter from John D. Buretta to Chief Judge Dora L. Irizarry dated December 19, 2017 by Credit Suisse (Buretta, John)
December 11, 2018 Filing 202 Letter to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding filing additional claims by Charlotte Freeman (Radine, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 201 Letter from John D. Buretta to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak dated November 30, 2018 by Credit Suisse (Buretta, John)
November 30, 2018 Filing 200 Letter To Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak From Jeremy D. Frey. by Bank Saderat PLC (Frey, Jeremy)
November 21, 2018 Filing 199 Letter from Gary M. Osen to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding proposed Third Amended Complaint by Charlotte Freeman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Osen, Gary)
November 7, 2018 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/7/2018. For plaintiffs: Aaron Schlanger / Clyde T. Turner / Gary M. Osen / Ari Ungar / Michael Radine; for defendants HSBC: Robert W. Hamburg / Mark G. Hanchet; for defendant Barclays Bank: Michael Tomaino, Jr.; for defendant Standard Chartered Bank: Bradley P. Smith; for defendant Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V.: Robert G. Houck; for defendant Credit Suisse: John D. Buretta / Richard W. Clary; for defendant Bank Saderat PLC: Jeremy D. Frey (by phone); for defendant Commerzbank AG: Jonathan I. Blackman. Plaintiffs shall provide proposed amended complaint by 11/21/2018. Defendants to notify the Court by 11/30/2018 if a motion to amend is required. The Court reserved decision with respect to the motion to lift the stay of discovery. (Zisa, Marie)
November 5, 2018 Filing 198 Letter To Honorable Cheryl L. Pollak re: call in details for status conference by Bank Saderat PLC (Frey, Jeremy)
November 5, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Avraham C. Moskowitz on behalf of Mick Bednarek (Ret.), Daniel P. Bolger, Anthony A. Cucolo, William H. Forrester, James D Thurman, Keith Walker (aty to be noticed) (Moskowitz, Avraham)
November 5, 2018 Filing 196 MOTION for Leave to File Document by Mick Bednarek (Ret.), Daniel P. Bolger, Anthony A. Cucolo, William H. Forrester, James D Thurman, Keith Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amici Brief) (Neff, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Roesch Neff on behalf of William H. Forrester (aty to be noticed) (Neff, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Roesch Neff on behalf of Anthony A. Cucolo (aty to be noticed) (Neff, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Roesch Neff on behalf of Keith Walker (aty to be noticed) (Neff, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Roesch Neff on behalf of Daniel P. Bolger (aty to be noticed) (Neff, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Roesch Neff on behalf of Mick Bednarek (Ret.) (aty to be noticed) (Neff, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Roesch Neff on behalf of James D Thurman (aty to be noticed) (Neff, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER re #189 . Parties who wish to attend the conference in person are permitted to do so. Parties who wish to attend by telephone shall coordinate before the call and dial into Chambers with those parties on the line. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/5/2018. (Zisa, Marie)
November 2, 2018 Filing 189 Letter to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding the Court's November 2, 2018 Order by Charlotte Freeman (Radine, Michael)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of #188 , the parties are permitted to appear by telephone for the Status Conference on November 7, 2018. The parties are to initiate the call and dial into Chambers (718-613-2360) with all parties on the line. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/2/2018. (Zisa, Marie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 188 Letter To The Honorable Cheryl L. Pollak by Bank Saderat PLC (Frey, Jeremy)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER: re #186 - #187 . In light of the parties' letters to the Court, the Status Conference is adjourned to 11/7/2018 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/1/2018. (Zisa, Marie)
October 31, 2018 Filing 187 Letter to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak in response to Plaintiffs' October 31 letter by Credit Suisse (Buretta, John)
October 31, 2018 Filing 186 Letter to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak requesting adjournment of the November 5, 2018 status conference by Charlotte Freeman (Radine, Michael)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference re #185 is for 11/5/2018 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/31/2018. (Caggiano, Diana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 185 Letter MOTION for Joinder adding new Plaintiffs by Charlotte Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Radine, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re #184 Letter filed by Credit Suisse -- The request is denied. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/16/2018. (Carosella, Christy)
October 15, 2018 Filing 184 Letter requesting Leave to File Document (Reply to Plaintiffs' Response (Dkt. 183)) by Credit Suisse (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Buretta, John)
October 5, 2018 Filing 183 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #174 Objection to Report and Recommendations, #173 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Charlotte Freeman. (Friedman, William)
October 5, 2018 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Dina Gielchinsky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Gielchinsky, Dina)
September 14, 2018 Filing 181 MEMORANDUM in Support re #179 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae filed by The Institute of International Bankers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gottridge, Marc)
September 14, 2018 Filing 180 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re #179 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae filed by The Institute of International Bankers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae, #2 Certificate of Service) (Gottridge, Marc)
September 14, 2018 Filing 179 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae by The Institute of International Bankers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gottridge, Marc)
September 10, 2018 Filing 178 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Institute of International Bankers (Gottridge, Marc)
September 10, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Andrew Fleming on behalf of The Institute of International Bankers (aty to be noticed) (Fleming, Benjamin)
September 10, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Fried on behalf of The Institute of International Bankers (aty to be noticed) (Fried, Lisa)
September 10, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Gottridge on behalf of The Institute of International Bankers (aty to be noticed) (Gottridge, Marc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 174 OBJECTION to #165 Report and Recommendations ("Moving Defendants' Joint Objections To The Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation") filed by Credit Suisse. (Buretta, John)
August 31, 2018 Filing 173 OBJECTION to #165 Report and Recommendations filed by Bank Saderat PLC. (Frey, Jeremy)
August 30, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmine Daniel Boccuzzi on behalf of Commerzbank AG (aty to be noticed) (Boccuzzi, Carmine)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adam B. Michaels terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/29/2018. (Caggiano, Diana)
August 20, 2018 Filing 171 Letter dated August 20, 2018 to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak from John D. Buretta regarding recent decision in O'Sullivan v. Deutsche Bank AG, 17-cv-08709 (SDNY), overruling objections to stay of discovery by Credit Suisse (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Buretta, John)
August 16, 2018 Filing 170 REPLY in Support re #167 Letter MOTION to Vacate #37 Telephone Conference Staying Discovery filed by Charlotte Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Radine, Michael)
August 14, 2018 Filing 169 Letter To the Honorable Cheryl L. Pollak by Bank Saderat PLC (Frey, Jeremy)
August 14, 2018 Filing 168 RESPONSE to Motion re #167 Letter MOTION to Vacate #37 Telephone Conference Staying Discovery filed by Credit Suisse. (Buretta, John)
August 7, 2018 Filing 167 Letter MOTION to Vacate #37 Telephone Conference Staying Discovery by Charlotte Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Radine, Michael)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER re #166 Letter filed by Credit Suisse --- Defendants' request for an extension of time to file objections to the Report and Recommendation ("R&R") on consent is granted in part and denied in part as the Court finds the length of the extension excessive. Objections to the R&R must be filed and served NO LATER THAN AUGUST 31, 2018. Responses to any objections must be filed and served NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 5, 2018. The parties' consent request for leave to file excess pages is granted in part and denied in part as this request too is excessive. Memoranda in support of all Defendants' objections are NOT TO EXCEED 50 pages IN TOTAL, to be divided at Defendants' discretion. Responses to Defendants' objections ARE NOT TO EXCEED 50 pages IN TOTAL, to be divided at Plaintiffs' discretion. The parties are directed not to include preliminary statements of their arguments or recite factual and procedural background already contained in the parties' moving papers. Any excess pages will not be considered. No further request for an extension of the deadlines will be considered. The parties are reminded that my Individual Rules require memoranda to be produced in size 12 (or higher) Times New Roman font and with one-inch margins on all sides and that hard courtesy copies to chambers immediately upon filing. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/6/2018. (Irizarry, Dora)
August 2, 2018 Filing 166 Letter to Chief Judge Irizarry from John D. Buretta regarding the submission of objections and responses to the Report and Recommendation by Credit Suisse (Buretta, John)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #116 - #119 : Having carefully analyzed the SAC and considered all of the parties' arguments, this Court respectfully recommends that defendants' motions to dismiss be denied in their entirety. Not only have the plaintiffs alleged sufficient facts to state a plausible claim as to each of the named defendants, but the briefing has exposed many issues of fact, which are best left for a properly-instructed jury to decide after the parties have conducted discovery. Indeed, this Court respectfully submits that recent congressional action in passing JASTA, coupled with the Second Circuit's case law interpreting this recent congressional action, see Linde v. Arab Bank, PLC, urges judicial restraint at this preliminary stage in the litigation. Accordingly, this Court respectfully recommends denying the Moving defendant' motion to dismiss, and denying Bank Saderat's motion to dismiss at this time. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/27/2018. (Caggiano, Diana)
July 26, 2018 Filing 164 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak providing Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Bank Saderat's Motion to Dismiss by Charlotte Freeman (Osen, Gary)
July 26, 2018 Filing 163 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bank Saderat PLC. (Michaels, Adam)
May 9, 2018 Filing 162 Letter from Gary M. Osen to Judge Pollak dated May 9, 2018, in response to the Court's Order of April 25, 2018 by Charlotte Freeman (Osen, Gary)
May 9, 2018 Filing 161 Letter The Honorable Cheryl L. Pollak in Response to The Court's Order of April 25, 2018 by Bank Saderat PLC (Frey, Jeremy)
May 9, 2018 Filing 160 Letter from John D. Buretta to Judge Pollak dated May 9, 2018, in response to the Court's Order of April 25, 2018, directing the parties to file letter briefs describing the effect of the Supreme Court's decision in Jesner v. Arab Bank by Credit Suisse (Buretta, John)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER: In light of the Supreme Court's decision in Jesner v. Arab Bank, No. 16-499, slip op. (U.S. Apr. 24, 2018), the parties are directed to file letter briefs no later than May 9, 2018 describing the effect of the Court's decision, if any, on the motions currently pending before this Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/25/2018. (Rutbeck-Goldman, Ariela)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #158 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/27/2018. (Caggiano, Diana)
March 23, 2018 Filing 158 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-10297557. by Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Barlow, Katie)
March 2, 2018 Filing 157 Letter dated March 2, 2018 to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak from John D. Buretta regarding Plaintiffs' Letter of February 22, 2018 by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank (Buretta, John)
February 22, 2018 Filing 156 Letter dated February 22, 2018 from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding Defendants' Letter of February 15, 2018 by Charlotte Freeman (Friedman, William)
February 15, 2018 Filing 155 Letter dated February 15, 2018 to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak from John D. Buretta regarding recent decision by the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit in Linde v. Arab Bank, PLC, No. 16-2119-cv(L) by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank (Attachments: #1 Linde v. Arab Bank, PLC Decision) (Buretta, John)
January 30, 2018 Filing 154 Letter , dated January 30, 2018 from Jonathan I. Blackman to Judge Pollak in reply to Plaintiffs' January 25th letter, etc. by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank (Blackman, Jonathan)
January 25, 2018 Filing 153 Letter dated January 25, 2018 from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding Defendants' Letter of January 16, 2018 by Charlotte Freeman (Friedman, William)
January 16, 2018 Filing 152 Letter dated January 16, 2018 to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollack from Jonathan I. Blackman regarding recent decision by the United States District Court for the District of Columbia in Ofisi v. BNP Paribas, 15-cv-02010-JDB, by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank (Blackman, Jonathan)
December 26, 2017 Filing 151 Letter from Gary M. Osen to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak in Reply to Defendants' Letter of December 19, 2017 by Charlotte Freeman (Friedman, William)
December 19, 2017 Filing 150 Letter Addressed to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak from John D. Buretta in Response to Plaintiffs' December 18, 2017 Letter by Credit Suisse (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Buretta, John)
December 18, 2017 Filing 149 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Charlotte Freeman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Osen, Gary)
October 30, 2017 Filing 148 Letter dated October 30, 2017 from Lawrence B. Friedman to Judge Pollak in reply to plaintiffs' October 25 letter, etc., by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank (Friedman, Lawrence)
October 25, 2017 Filing 147 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak responding to Defendants' October 16, 2017 Letter providing Supplemental Authority by Charlotte Freeman (Osen, Gary)
October 16, 2017 Filing 146 Letter , dated October 16, 2017, from Lawrence B. Friedman to Judge Pollak, with Exhibit A, bringing the Court's attention to a recent decision by the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, etc., by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank (Friedman, Lawrence)
August 25, 2017 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Golimowski on behalf of Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V. (notification declined or already on case) (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2017 Filing 144 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding Plaintiffs' Supplemental Authority by Charlotte Freeman (Osen, Gary)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #142 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/21/2017. (Caggiano, Diana)
August 18, 2017 Filing 142 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9769234. by Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Golimowski, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2017 Filing 141 Letter from John D. Buretta to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding Plaintiffs' August 7, 2017 letter by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank (Buretta, John)
August 10, 2017 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael George Lightfoot on behalf of Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V. (aty to be noticed) (Lightfoot, Michael)
August 7, 2017 Filing 139 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak providing Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Charlotte Freeman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Osen, Gary)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER DENYING REQUEST RE: REASSIGNMENT AND CONSOLIDATION OF 17-cv-2474(NGG)(RER) re #132 Notice (Other) --- While no formal motion was made before me, Defendants' request buried in DE #132 to reassign Martinez v. Deutsche Bank AG, et. al, Case Docket No. 1:17-cv-2474 (NGG)(RER) to the undersigned district judge is denied. While Martinez and this case have some similarities, the cases are not "related" as contemplated in Local Civil Rule 1.6 and Rule for Division of Business Among District Judges 50.3.1. The two relevant presiding judges have conferred, and agree that there is little likelihood that a substantial saving of judicial resources would result from assigning both cases to the same district judge. The Court further directs the parties that, moving forward, they use in the captions in their written submissions and their filings in ECF, an abbreviated caption using the first named plaintiff, and first named defendant, followed by "et. al.", as opposed to listing each plaintiff and each defendant. To the extent that a filing relates only to a particular defendant, only that defendant should be named followed by "et. al.". The current practice of naming everyone unduly clutters the docket and takes up too much paper unnecessarily. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/28/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: #116 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bank Saderat PLC, #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Credit Suisse -- These motions are referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak for the preparation of a Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/11/2017. (Carosella, Christy)
July 5, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Anne Tirrell on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (aty to be noticed) (Tirrell, Kerry)
March 3, 2017 Filing 137 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Dora L. Irizarry regarding Defendants' February 28, 2017 letter (ECF No. 136) by Charlotte Freeman (Friedman, William)
February 28, 2017 Filing 136 Letter from John D. Buretta to the Hon. Dora L. Irizarry regarding Plaintiffs' February 21, 2017 letter (ECF No. 134) by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank (Buretta, John)
February 21, 2017 Filing 135 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Dora L. Irizarry regarding Notice of New Authorities - Corrected by Charlotte Freeman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Friedman, William)
February 21, 2017 Filing 134 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Dora L. Irizarry regarding Notice of New Authorities by Charlotte Freeman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Friedman, William)
December 7, 2016 Filing 133 Letter enclosing copy of the following documents from the JPML Pursuant To 28 USC SEC 1407 For Transfer Of Actions To the EDNY For Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings re: Freeman, et al. v. HSBC Holdings PLC, et al.. (See attached). (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Schedule Of Actions, #4 Proof Of Service, #5 Amd. Proof Of Service) (Layne, Monique)
December 7, 2016 Filing 132 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LELCHOOK PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1407, advising pursuant to Rule 4.1(a) of the Rules for Multidistrict Litigation, notice is given that plaintiffs in Lelchook, et al v. Iran, et al. (Case No. 15-13715), (D. Mass.) withdraw their motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for transfer of the Lelchook Case and Martinez, et al. v. Deutsche Bank AG, et al., (Case No. 16-01207) (S.D.III.) to the Eastern District of New York for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with Freeman, et al. v. HSBC Holdings PLC, et al., Case No. 14-06601 (E.D.N.Y.)(DLI)(CLP). (Layne, Monique)
November 18, 2016 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by William Adam Friedman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Friedman, William)
November 10, 2016 Filing 130 REPLY in Support re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Defendant Standard Chartered Bank's Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 129 REPLY in Support re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Supplemental Reply of HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., and the Royal Bank of Scotland N.V. in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 128 REPLY in Support re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Reply Memorandum of Law of Defendant Credit Suisse AG in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 127 REPLY in Support re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Defendant Commerzbank AG's Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 126 REPLY in Support re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Defendants' Joint Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 125 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Plaintiffs' Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint") filed by Credit Suisse. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Radine, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L) (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM in Support re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Defendant Commerzbank AG's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM in Support re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Defendant Standard Chartered Bank's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM in Support re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Supplemental Memorandum of Law of HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., and the Royal Bank of Scotland N.V. in Support of Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM in Support re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Memorandum of Law of Defendant Credit Suisse AG in Support of Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM in Support re #119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Defendants' Joint Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 119 Joint Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Credit Suisse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3), #4 Exhibit A (Part 4)) (Clary, Richard)
November 10, 2016 Filing 118 REPLY in Support re #116 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bank Saderat PLC. (Michaels, Adam)
November 10, 2016 Filing 117 Plaintiff's Ommibus MEMORANDUM In Opposition re #116 Motion to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bank Saderat PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L) (Michaels, Adam). Modified on 11/14/2016 to correct the filer. (Layne, Monique).
November 10, 2016 Filing 116 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank Saderat PLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Michaels, Adam)
August 17, 2016 Filing 115 AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Floyd Burton Robinson, Anastasia Fuller, Dixie Flagg, C.H., Elizabeth Brown, Bradley Starcevich, Julio Fuentes, Alesia Karcher, Noala Fritz for the Estate of Jacob Fritz, Zachary Hake, Stefanie Wallace, Kimberlee Austin-Oliver, A.L.R., a minor, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, John Gibson, Tonya Lotto, Ronald William Crabtree, Chad Farr, Jacqueline A. Smith, Cynthia Thornsberry, Jeffrey Anderson, Matthew Menke, Amy Lynn Robinson, Silver Farr, Linda Falter, Adrian McCann, Paul D. Harris, Jill Ann Bock, Harry Riley Bock, Esther Wolfer, Audrey Morin, M.C., a minor, Armando Fuentes, David Eugene Hickman, William Farrar, Sr, Judy Huenink, Billy Wallace, Brett Coke, Cassandra Bailey, Cynthia Delgado for the Estate of George Delgado, Richard Tomson, Michelle Kim, Elizabeth Chism for the Estate of Jonathan B. Chism, Bryan Montgomery, Richard Fraser, Misti Fisher, Matthew Arsiaga, Tifany Haupt, Skylar Hake, Donna Lewis, John Sackett, Shaylyn C. Reece, Christopher Levi, Veronica Hickman, John D. Lamie, Evan Kirby, Erik Roberts, Raymond Montgomery, Noala Fritz for the Estate of Lyle Fritz, Ryanne Hunter for the Estate of Wesley Hunter, Daniel Fritz, Kyshia Sutton, Marjorie Falter, T.M., a minor, Kemely Pickett, Audrey Karcher, T.B., Mitchell Millican, Christopher Miller, Brittany Marionique Joshua, Russel York, Jeanette West, Christina Smith, Lisa Ramaci, K.B., Vivian Pickett, Brenda Habsieger, Kousay Al-Taie for the Estate of Ahmed Al-Taie, S.J.S., a minor, Ethan Fritz, Edna Luz Burgos, Ariana Reyes, Donna Kuglics, Victoria Denisse Andrade, Johnny Javier Miles, Sr, Christina Biederman, Megan People, Kathy Stillwell, Tim Lucas, Kacey Gilmore, Samantha Tomson, Carrol Alderete, Kousay Al-Taie, Shawn Bartlett, L.M., a minor, Curtis Glawson, Sr, Jolene Lilley, Rachel M. Gillette, Kynesha Dhanoolal for the Estate of Dayne D. Dhanoolal, Anthony Alderete, Michelle Klemensberg, Wesley Williamson, J.L., a minor, Travis Gibson, Rebekah A. Coldewe, John Vacho, William Parker, G.F., Ann Christopher, Patricia Montgomery, Tammy Vanderwaal, Shyanne Smith-Lizotte, Rayanne Hunter, H. Joseph Bandhold, Marvin Thornsberry, Jerry L. Myers, Tony Wood, Stephanie Howard, M.T., a minor, Cedric Hunt, Sr, John Vandegrift for the Estate of Matthew R. Vandegrift, George Arsiaga, Kimberley Vesey, Kenneth J. Drevnick, Marian Brown, Daniel Benavidez, Sr, Andrew Lucas, Michael Smith, Preston Shane Reece, Seop Steve Kim, Janet Jones, Robin Roberts, Nicole Landon, Tonya K. Dressler, Carol Kruger, Glenda Starcevich, Kierra Glawson, Amanda B. Adair, Michael J. Miller, Roberto Andrade, Sr, George J. White, Shelley Ann Smith, John McCully, Walter Bailey, Theresa Davis, Marsha Novak, A.F., Robert Funcheon, Megan Marie Rice for the Estate of Zachary T. Myers, Joanne Gutcher, Daniel Menke, Tricia English, Nathan Newby, T.H., Lynn Forehand, Ryan Sabinish, G.L., a minor, Lorenzo Sandoval, Sr, Cara Roberts, Terrel Charles Bartlett, Russell Falter, Suzzettee Lawson, L.T., a minor, Nanette Saenz, Linda Jones, Harry Cromity, Gregory Bauer, Sabrina Cumbe, Mackenzie Haines, Charlotte Freeman, Flora Hood, Ashley Gudridge, Ardith Cecil Dressler, Denice York, Ava Tomson, Tiffany M. Little, Anna Karcher, Isabell Vincent, Wayne Brown, Linda Gibson, Jean Mariano, Nancy Fuentes, Rosemarie Alfonso, Michael Lucas, Elizabeth Chism, Cory Smith, A.B., A.K., a minor, Kelli D. Hake, Lorenzo Sandoval, Jr, Harry Pickett, James Canine, Robert Bartlett, D.J.F., a minor, Juan Saenz, Keri Cotton, Jeffrey D. Price, Kathleen Snyder, Merlese Pickett for the Estate of Emmanuel Pickett, Patrick Farr, Shaula Shaffer, Jennifer Morman, Hyunjung Glawson, Donna Engeman, James Craig Roberts, Mary Jane Vandegrift, J.J.M., Jr, Stephanie McCully, Tabitha McCoy, Pam Marion, Robert Canine, Megan Marie Rice, Vanessa Chism, C.F., a minor, Dakota Smith-Lizotte, David Noble, Judy Huenink for the Estate of Benjamin J. Slaven, Marlynn Gonzales, Devon Fletcher Hickman, Leonard Wolfer, C.W., Les Kuglics, Donald C. Bandhold, Mariah Simoneaux, Nancy Fuentes for the Estate of Daniel A. Fuentes, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, Patricia Smith, Linda David, Yolanda M. Brooks, Angel Munoz, Debbie Smith, Robi Ann Galindo, Tracie Arsiaga, Sylvia Macias, Nancy Umbrell, Erika Neuman, Kim Miller, G.H., Cassie Smith, Lawrence Kruger, N.W.E., Jason Sackett, Karen Funcheon, Merlese Pickett, Noala Fritz, Lance Haupt, Wayne Newby, Julie Chism, Timothy W. Elledge, Marion Crimens, Todd Daily, Chastity Dawn Slaven, Stephanie Gibson Webster, Bashar Al-Taie, Jeremy Blohm, Debbie Beavers, Tony Gonzales, Wood Megan, Allen Swinton, Daniel C. Oliver, D.W., Austin Wallace, Rebecca J. Oliver, Cassie Collins for the Estate of Shannon M. Smith, Dan Dixon for the Estate of Robert J. Dixon, Scott Hood, Trina Jackson, Mark Umbrell, Philip S. Ford, Linda Pritchett, Peter Hake, Andrew Tomson, Sean Elliott, Frank Lilley, Colin Roberts, Kari Carosella, Dan Dixon, David W. Haines, Michael David, Donnie Marion, Victoria Pena Andrade, Kristy Kruger, S.J., Debra Levi, Dan Dixon for the Estate of Ilene Dixon, James Smith, Matthew Lilley, Douglas Kruger, Danielle Sweet, N.C.E., Patricia Arsiaga for the Estate of Jeremy Arsiaga, Chastity Dawn Laflin, Marlen Pickett, Katherine McRill-Fellini, Thomas Smith, Scott Lilley, Emily Kuglics, T.F., a minor, Adam Wood, David Lucas, Nichole Lohring, N.T., a minor, Melissa Dressler, John Vandegrift, Deborah Noble, Megan Smith, Fred Frigo, Randolph Freeman, Charles Vincent, A.S.E., Brian Coke, D.J.F., Michelle Benavidez, Sangsoon Kim, Tabitha McCoy for the Estate of Steve A. McCoy, Donna Engeman for the Estate of John W. Engeman, Daniel Benavidez, Jr, Johnny Washburn, Calvin Canine, Tiffany M. Little for the Estate of Kyle A. Little, Holly Burson-Gilpin, Eric Levi, Anne F. Harris, Tamara Runzel, Danny Chism, Jacob Michael Habsieger, T.S., Ashley Vacho, Meghan Parker-Crockett, Natalia White, Hathal K. Taie, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, Maria E. Calle, G.B., Shelby West, Angelica Andrade, R.M., a minor, Joedi Wood, Don Jason Stone, Paula Menke, Debra Wigbels, A.B., a minor, Rhonda Haupt, A.W., Judy Ann Crabtree, Nawal Al-Taie, Dawn Haines, Gilbert Arsiaga, Jr, Temika Swinton, Tracy Anderson, Steve Morin, Steve Morin, Sr, Michael Habsieger, Michelle Klemensberg for the Estate of Larry R. Bowman, Raymond Nigel Spencer, Sr, B.D., a minor, E.M., Helen Fraser, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Ursula Ann Joshua, Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Donna Lewis for the Estate of Jason Dale Lewis, Anastasia Fuller for the Estate of Alexander H. Fuller, Timothy Karcher, Sean Slaven, Brian Neuman, K.L., a minor, Kathy Stillwell for the Estate of Daniel Crabtree, George D. White, Cynthia Delgado, Nicholas Baumhoer, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, Terrell Gilmore, Jr, C.L., Shilyn Jackson, Cortez Glawson, Adam G. Stout, E.C.R., a minor, Shannon Millican, Trenton Starcevich, Denise Blohm, Angie Jackson, R.J.S., a minor, Ilene Dixon, Jill Hake, I.F., R.N.R., a minor, W.H., Russell C. Falter, K.W., a minor, Charles E. Matheny, III, David Hartley, Theresa Hart, Emily Levi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (part 2), #3 Exhibit B) (Osen, Gary)
August 16, 2016 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jacob Radine on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Radine, Michael)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #89 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; ORDER re #111 Letter filed by Credit Suisse -- Defendants' motions to dismiss the First Amended Complaint is denied as moot since plaintiffs have filed a Second Amended Complaint. Defendants have submitted a proposed briefing schedule concerning proposed motions to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, with requests for over-sized briefs. The request was directed to the magistrate judge improperly. Dispositive matters are to be directed to my attention as the district judge presiding over the case. The proposed briefing schedule is approved: September 14, 2016, defendants will serve their motions on plaintiffs; October 14, 2016 Plaintiffs shall serve their opposition to the motions; and November 10, defendants will serve their replies on plaintiffs and file the fully briefed motions in accord with my bundling rule. As to page limits, defendants' requests are granted in part. Defendants' joint motions to dismiss must not exceed 30 pages. To the extent that individual defendants will file individual motions to dismiss that raise issues unique to them, the briefs are not to exceed 10 pages. Defendant Bank Saderat PLC's separate motion to dismiss is not to exceed 25 pages and this defendant is responsible for filing its motion in accord with the approved schedule and my bundle rule. Plaintiffs' briefs shall be the same size as those for defendants. Defendants' joint reply brief and Bank Saderat PLC's reply brief will not exceed 15 pages and the individual defendant replies shall not exceed 8 pages. The parties are reminded that hard courtesy copies of all filings must be forwarded to chambers immediately upon filing. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/29/2016. (Irizarry, Dora)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ENDORSED LETTER ORDER re #112 Request granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/25/2016. (Caggiano, Diana)
July 22, 2016 Filing 112 Letter from Aaron Schlanger to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Charlotte Freeman (Schlanger, Aaron)
July 22, 2016 Filing 111 Letter to Judge Pollak from John D. Buretta re: the schedule for briefing motions to dismiss by Credit Suisse (Buretta, John)
July 12, 2016 Filing 110 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Floyd Burton Robinson, Anastasia Fuller, C.H., Elizabeth Brown, Bradley Starcevich, Julio Fuentes, Zachary Hake, Stefanie Wallace, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, John Gibson, Tonya Lotto, Ronald William Crabtree, Jacqueline A. Smith, Cynthia Thornsberry, Jeffrey Anderson, Matthew Menke, Amy Lynn Robinson, Silver Farr, Linda Falter, Paul D. Harris, Audrey Morin, Armando Fuentes, David Eugene Hickman, William Farrar, Sr, Judy Huenink, Billy Wallace, Cassandra Bailey, Cynthia Delgado for the Estate of George Delgado, Richard Tomson, Michelle Kim, Richard Fraser, Misti Fisher, Tifany Haupt, Skylar Hake, Christopher Levi, Veronica Hickman, John D. Lamie, Evan Kirby, Erik Roberts, T.M., a minor, T.B., Mitchell Millican, Christopher Miller, Brittany Marionique Joshua, Russel York, Jeanette West, Christina Smith, Lisa Ramaci, K.B., Brenda Habsieger, Edna Luz Burgos, Ariana Reyes, Donna Kuglics, Johnny Javier Miles, Sr, Christina Biederman, Kacey Gilmore, Shawn Bartlett, Carrol Alderete, Curtis Glawson, Sr, Rachel M. Gillette, Anthony Alderete, Travis Gibson, Rebekah A. Coldewe, John Vacho, G.F., Ann Christopher, Rayanne Hunter, H. Joseph Bandhold, Marvin Thornsberry, Jerry L. Myers, M.T., a minor, Cedric Hunt, Sr, John Vandegrift for the Estate of Matthew R. Vandegrift, Kenneth J. Drevnick, Marian Brown, Daniel Benavidez, Sr, Michael Smith, Seop Steve Kim, Robin Roberts, Nicole Landon, Tonya K. Dressler, Glenda Starcevich, Michael J. Miller, George J. White, Shelley Ann Smith, John McCully, Walter Bailey, Theresa Davis, A.F., Robert Funcheon, Megan Marie Rice for the Estate of Zachary T. Myers, Joanne Gutcher, Daniel Menke, Tricia English, T.H., Lynn Forehand, Ryan Sabinish, Lorenzo Sandoval, Sr, Cara Roberts, Terrel Charles Bartlett, Russell Falter, Suzzettee Lawson, L.T., a minor, Nanette Saenz, Harry Cromity, Sabrina Cumbe, Gregory Bauer, Mackenzie Haines, Charlotte Freeman, Ardith Cecil Dressler, Ashley Gudridge, Denice York, Ava Tomson, Isabell Vincent, Wayne Brown, Linda Gibson, Nancy Fuentes, Rosemarie Alfonso, Cory Smith, A.B., Kelli D. Hake, Lorenzo Sandoval, Jr, Harry Pickett, D.J.F., a minor, Robert Bartlett, Juan Saenz, Keri Cotton, Jeffrey D. Price, Kathleen Snyder, Patrick Farr, Jennifer Morman, Hyunjung Glawson, Donna Engeman, James Craig Roberts, Mary Jane Vandegrift, J.J.M., Jr, Stephanie McCully, Pam Marion, Megan Marie Rice, Judy Huenink for the Estate of Benjamin J. Slaven, Devon Fletcher Hickman, C.W., Les Kuglics, Donald C. Bandhold, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, Linda David, Patricia Smith, Yolanda M. Brooks, Debbie Smith, Tracie Arsiaga, Nancy Umbrell, Kim Miller, G.H., Cassie Smith, N.W.E., Karen Funcheon, Merlese Pickett, Lance Haupt, Wayne Newby, Timothy W. Elledge, Marion Crimens, Todd Daily, Chastity Dawn Slaven, Stephanie Gibson Webster, Jeremy Blohm, Daniel C. Oliver, Allen Swinton, D.W., Rebecca J. Oliver, Trina Jackson, Philip S. Ford, Mark Umbrell, Peter Hake, Sean Elliott, Dan Dixon, David W. Haines, Colin Roberts, Michael David, Donnie Marion, S.J., Dan Dixon for the Estate of Ilene Dixon, James Smith, N.C.E., Danielle Sweet, Chastity Dawn Laflin, Emily Kuglics, T.F., a minor, Nichole Lohring, N.T., a minor, Melissa Dressler, John Vandegrift, Deborah Noble, Fred Frigo, Randolph Freeman, A.S.E., Charles Vincent, D.J.F., Michelle Benavidez, Sangsoon Kim, Daniel Benavidez, Jr, Johnny Washburn, Holly Burson-Gilpin, Anne F. Harris, Danny Chism, Jacob Michael Habsieger, T.S., Ashley Vacho, Natalia White, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, G.B., Maria E. Calle, Shelby West, Paula Menke, Debra Wigbels, Rhonda Haupt, A.B., a minor, A.W., Judy Ann Crabtree, Dawn Haines, Temika Swinton, Tracy Anderson, Michael Habsieger, Steve Morin, Steve Morin, Sr, Raymond Nigel Spencer, Sr, B.D., a minor, E.M., Helen Fraser, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Ursula Ann Joshua, Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Timothy Karcher, Sean Slaven, Cynthia Delgado, George D. White, Terrell Gilmore, Jr, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, C.L., R.M., a minor, Shannon Millican, Trenton Starcevich, Denise Blohm, Angie Jackson, I.F., Jill Hake, Ilene Dixon, R.N.R., a minor, W.H., K.W., a minor, Charles E. Matheny, III, David Hartley, Theresa Hart, Vivian Pickett, Andrew Tomson, Flora Hood, Patricia Montgomery, Patricia Arsiaga for the Estate of Jeremy Arsiaga, Don Jason Stone, Matthew Arsiaga, Alesia Karcher, Lawrence Kruger, Audrey Karcher, Thomas Smith, Shaylyn C. Reece, Andrew Lucas, John Sackett, Noala Fritz for the Estate of Jacob Fritz, Noala Fritz, Shaula Shaffer, Noala Fritz for the Estate of Lyle Fritz, Shyanne Smith-Lizotte, Megan People, Nathan Newby, Tony Gonzales, Katherine McRill-Fellini, Victoria Denisse Andrade, Kristy Kruger, Joedi Wood, Austin Wallace, Tammy Vanderwaal, Angelica Andrade, Tiffany M. Little, Brian Neuman, Esther Wolfer, Samantha Tomson, Matthew Lilley, Bryan Montgomery, Angel Munoz, Kemely Pickett, Mariah Simoneaux, James Canine, Vanessa Chism, A.K., a minor, Raymond Montgomery, Donna Engeman for the Estate of John W. Engeman, Carol Kruger, Nawal Al-Taie, Megan Smith, Leonard Wolfer, Tim Lucas, David Noble, Marsha Novak, Michelle Klemensberg for the Estate of Larry R. Bowman, Emily Levi, Tony Wood, E.C.R., a minor, Kousay Al-Taie for the Estate of Ahmed Al-Taie, Donna Lewis for the Estate of Jason Dale Lewis, Kierra Glawson, Ethan Fritz, Stephanie Howard, Russell C. Falter, Kynesha Dhanoolal for the Estate of Dayne D. Dhanoolal, Douglas Kruger, L.M., a minor, Brian Coke, Preston Shane Reece, Jean Mariano, A.L.R., a minor, Cassie Collins for the Estate of Shannon M. Smith, G.L., a minor, Erika Neuman, Michael Lucas, Calvin Canine, Dixie Flagg, Bashar Al-Taie, Marjorie Falter, Jolene Lilley, Victoria Pena Andrade, Tiffany M. Little for the Estate of Kyle A. Little, Elizabeth Chism, Tamara Runzel, K.L., a minor, Marlen Pickett, Tabitha McCoy, Shilyn Jackson, Kimberlee Austin-Oliver, Sylvia Macias, Merlese Pickett for the Estate of Emmanuel Pickett, David Lucas, Michelle Klemensberg, Roberto Andrade, Sr, Robi Ann Galindo, Ryanne Hunter for the Estate of Wesley Hunter, Debra Levi, Cortez Glawson, Linda Jones, Donna Lewis, Tabitha McCoy for the Estate of Steve A. McCoy, J.L., a minor, Wood Megan, Gilbert Arsiaga, Jr, Adrian McCann, Frank Lilley, Harry Riley Bock, Anna Karcher, Anastasia Fuller for the Estate of Alexander H. Fuller, Elizabeth Chism for the Estate of Jonathan B. Chism, Nancy Fuentes for the Estate of Daniel A. Fuentes, Jill Ann Bock, Brett Coke, Dan Dixon for the Estate of Robert J. Dixon, M.C., a minor, Meghan Parker-Crockett, Janet Jones, Wesley Williamson, Debbie Beavers, Eric Levi, Dakota Smith-Lizotte, George Arsiaga, Hathal K. Taie, C.F., a minor, Amanda B. Adair, Nicholas Baumhoer, Kimberley Vesey, Kousay Al-Taie, Adam G. Stout, Scott Hood, Kathy Stillwell, Kathy Stillwell for the Estate of Daniel Crabtree, Chad Farr, R.J.S., a minor, Linda Pritchett, Daniel Fritz, Marlynn Gonzales, Julie Chism, Kari Carosella, William Parker, Scott Lilley, Kyshia Sutton, Jason Sackett, Robert Canine, S.J.S., a minor, Adam Wood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (part 2), #3 Exhibit B) (Schlanger, Aaron)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #108 re: #109 . In light of defendants' representation that they do not oppose plaintiffs' motion, plaintiffs are granted leave to amend the Complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/12/2016. (Chandran, Ashok)
July 10, 2016 Filing 109 Letter from John D. Buretta to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding plaintiffs' motion to file Second Amended Complaint by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Standard Chartered Bank (Buretta, John)
July 10, 2016 Filing 108 Notice of MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #77 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Charlotte Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of C. Tab Turner, #3 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit A to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (part 1), #5 Exhibit A to Proposed Second Amended Complaint (part 2), #6 Exhibit B to Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Second Amended Complaint Redline) (Osen, Gary)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ENDORSED LETTER ORDER re #106 Request granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 6/14/2016. (Caggiano, Diana)
June 10, 2016 Filing 106 Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend their Complaint by Charlotte Freeman (Schlanger, Aaron)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #104 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jamie Lynn Hoxie terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 12/2/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
December 1, 2015 Filing 104 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Jamie L. Hoxie moves to Withdraw Appearance as counsel for Defendant The Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V. by Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hoxie, Jamie)
August 11, 2015 Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Please disregard docket entry #102. A corrected version has been filed as docket entry #103. (Chee, Alvin)
August 10, 2015 Filing 103 REPLY in Support re #91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) . [CORRECTED] Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law of HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., and The Royal Bank of Scotland N.V. in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V.. (Hanchet, Mark)
August 7, 2015 Filing 102 REPLY in Support re #91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law of HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., and The Royal Bank of Scotland N.V. in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V.. (Hanchet, Mark)
August 7, 2015 Filing 101 REPLY in Support re #91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) ("Reply Memorandum of Law of Defendant Credit Suisse AG in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
August 7, 2015 Filing 100 REPLY in Support re #91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) ("Defendants' Joint Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss") filed by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank. (Clary, Richard)
August 7, 2015 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank Saderat PLC re #98 Reply in Support (Michaels, Adam)
August 7, 2015 Filing 98 REPLY in Support re #89 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by Bank Saderat PLC. (Michaels, Adam)
August 7, 2015 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in Support re #91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) /Defendant Commerzbank AG's Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, dated August 7, 2015, filed by Commerzbank AG. (Friedman, Lawrence)
July 10, 2015 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint), #91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) Plaintiffs Omnibus Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and the Declaration of Aaron Schlanger with Exhibits filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Schlanger, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K) (Schlanger, Aaron)
May 29, 2015 Duplicate / Incorrect Document # 90 removed from the Court record. (See doc.#91 .) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
May 29, 2015 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Support re #91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) /Defendant Commerzbank AG'S Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, dated May 29, 2015 filed by Commerzbank AG. (Friedman, Lawrence)
May 29, 2015 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM in Support re #91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V.. (Hanchet, Mark)
May 29, 2015 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Support re #91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
May 29, 2015 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Support re #91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) filed by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank. (Clary, Richard)
May 29, 2015 Filing 91 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) by Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank. (Attachments: #1 Supplement ("Amended Complaint")) (Clary, Richard)
May 29, 2015 Filing 89 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Amended Complaint) by Bank Saderat PLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service) (Michaels, Adam)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/22/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
May 21, 2015 Filing 87 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by A.B., A.B., a minor, A.F., A.S.E., A.W., Anthony Alderete, Carrol Alderete, Rosemarie Alfonso, Jeffrey Anderson, Tracy Anderson, Tracie Arsiaga, B.D., a minor, Cassandra Bailey, Walter Bailey, Donald C. Bandhold, H. Joseph Bandhold, Robert Bartlett, Shawn Bartlett, Terrel Charles Bartlett, Gregory Bauer, Daniel Benavidez, Sr, Daniel Benavidez, Jr, Michelle Benavidez, Christina Biederman, Denise Blohm, Jeremy Blohm, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, Yolanda M. Brooks, Elizabeth Brown, Marian Brown, Wayne Brown, Edna Luz Burgos, Holly Burson-Gilpin, C.H., C.L., C.W., Maria E. Calle, Danny Chism, Ann Christopher, Rebekah A. Coldewe, Keri Cotton, Judy Ann Crabtree, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, Ronald William Crabtree, Marion Crimens, Harry Cromity, Sabrina Cumbe, D.J.F., D.J.F., a minor, D.W., Todd Daily, Linda David, Michael David, Theresa Davis, Cynthia Delgado, Cynthia Delgado for the Estate of George Delgado, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Dan Dixon, Ilene Dixon, Dan Dixon for the Estate of Ilene Dixon, Ardith Cecil Dressler, Melissa Dressler, Tonya K. Dressler, Kenneth J. Drevnick, E.M., Timothy W. Elledge, Sean Elliott, Donna Engeman, Tricia English, Linda Falter, Russell Falter, Patrick Farr, Silver Farr, William Farrar, Sr, Misti Fisher, Philip S. Ford, Lynn Forehand, Helen Fraser, Richard Fraser, Charlotte Freeman, Randolph Freeman, Fred Frigo, Armando Fuentes, Julio Fuentes, Nancy Fuentes, Anastasia Fuller, Karen Funcheon, Robert Funcheon, G.B., G.F., G.H., John Gibson, Linda Gibson, Travis Gibson, Rachel M. Gillette, Kacey Gilmore, Terrell Gilmore, Jr, Curtis Glawson, Sr, Hyunjung Glawson, Ashley Gudridge, Joanne Gutcher, Brenda Habsieger, Jacob Michael Habsieger, Michael Habsieger, David W. Haines, Dawn Haines, Mackenzie Haines, Jill Hake, Kelli D. Hake, Peter Hake, Skylar Hake, Zachary Hake, Anne F. Harris, Paul D. Harris, Theresa Hart, David Hartley, Lance Haupt, Rhonda Haupt, Tifany Haupt, David Eugene Hickman, Devon Fletcher Hickman, Veronica Hickman, Judy Huenink, Judy Huenink for the Estate of Benjamin J. Slaven, Cedric Hunt, Sr, Rayanne Hunter, I.F., J.J.M., Jr, Angie Jackson, Trina Jackson, Brittany Marionique Joshua, Ursula Ann Joshua, K.B., K.W., a minor, Timothy Karcher, Michelle Kim, Sangsoon Kim, Seop Steve Kim, Evan Kirby, Donna Kuglics, Emily Kuglics, Les Kuglics, L.T., a minor, Chastity Dawn Laflin, John D. Lamie, Nicole Landon, Suzzettee Lawson, Christopher Levi, Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Nichole Lohring, Tonya Lotto, M.T., a minor, Donnie Marion, Pam Marion, Charles E. Matheny, III, John McCully, Stephanie McCully, Daniel Menke, Matthew Menke, Paula Menke, Johnny Javier Miles, Sr, Christopher Miller, Kim Miller, Michael J. Miller, Mitchell Millican, Shannon Millican, Audrey Morin, Steve Morin, Steve Morin, Sr, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, Jennifer Morman, Jerry L. Myers, N.C.E., N.T., a minor, N.W.E., Wayne Newby, Deborah Noble, Daniel C. Oliver, Rebecca J. Oliver, Harry Pickett, Merlese Pickett, Jeffrey D. Price, R.M., a minor, R.N.R., a minor, Lisa Ramaci, Ariana Reyes, Megan Marie Rice, Megan Marie Rice for the Estate of Zachary T. Myers, Cara Roberts, Colin Roberts, Erik Roberts, James Craig Roberts, Robin Roberts, Amy Lynn Robinson, Floyd Burton Robinson, S.J., Ryan Sabinish, Juan Saenz, Nanette Saenz, Lorenzo Sandoval, Sr, Lorenzo Sandoval, Jr, Chastity Dawn Slaven, Sean Slaven, Cassie Smith, Christina Smith, Cory Smith, Debbie Smith, Jacqueline A. Smith, James Smith, Michael Smith, Patricia Smith, Shelley Ann Smith, Kathleen Snyder, Raymond Nigel Spencer, Sr, Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Bradley Starcevich, Glenda Starcevich, Trenton Starcevich, Danielle Sweet, Allen Swinton, Temika Swinton, T.B., T.F., a minor, T.H., T.M., a minor, T.S., Cynthia Thornsberry, Marvin Thornsberry, Ava Tomson, Richard Tomson, Mark Umbrell, Nancy Umbrell, Ashley Vacho, John Vacho, John Vandegrift, Mary Jane Vandegrift, John Vandegrift for the Estate of Matthew R. Vandegrift, Charles Vincent, Isabell Vincent, W.H., Billy Wallace, Stefanie Wallace, Johnny Washburn, Stephanie Gibson Webster, Jeanette West, Shelby West, George J. White, George D. White, Natalia White, Debra Wigbels, Denice York, Russel York. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua D. Glatter) (Glatter, Joshua)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #86 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #86 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages -- Reset deadlines: Motions to dismiss due May 29, 2015. Opposition by July 10, 2015. Reply by August 7, 2015. So Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/7/2015. (Carosella, Christy)
May 6, 2015 Filing 86 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File , Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bank Saderat PLC, Barclays, Commerzbank AG, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank. (Buretta, John)
May 4, 2015 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commerzbank AG (Friedman, Lawrence)
May 4, 2015 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Avram E. Luft on behalf of Commerzbank AG (aty to be noticed) (Luft, Avram)
May 4, 2015 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis J Liman on behalf of Commerzbank AG (aty to be noticed) (Liman, Lewis)
May 4, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence B. Friedman on behalf of Commerzbank AG (aty to be noticed) (Friedman, Lawrence)
May 4, 2015 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan I. Blackman on behalf of Commerzbank AG (aty to be noticed) (Blackman, Jonathan)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #80 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #80 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages --- Motions to dismiss due May 15, 2015. Opposition by June 29, 2015. Reply by July 24, 2015. So Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 4/17/2015. (Carosella, Christy)
April 15, 2015 Filing 80 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bank Saderat PLC, Barclays, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank. (Buretta, John)
April 9, 2015 Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Freeman. Commerzbank AG served on 4/8/2015, answer due 4/29/2015. (Schlanger, Aaron)
April 6, 2015 Filing 78 AMENDED Summons Issued as to Commerzbank AG. (Layne, Monique)
April 2, 2015 Filing 77 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Floyd Burton Robinson, Anastasia Fuller, C.H., Elizabeth Brown, Bradley Starcevich, Stefanie Wallace, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, John Gibson, Tonya Lotto, Ronald William Crabtree, Jacqueline A. Smith, Jeffrey Anderson, Matthew Menke, Amy Lynn Robinson, Silver Farr, Linda Falter, Paul D. Harris, Audrey Morin, David Eugene Hickman, William Farrar, Sr, Judy Huenink, Billy Wallace, Cassandra Bailey, Richard Tomson, Michelle Kim, Richard Fraser, Misti Fisher, Tifany Haupt, Christopher Levi, Veronica Hickman, John D. Lamie, T.B., Mitchell Millican, Christopher Miller, Brittany Marionique Joshua, Russel York, Jeanette West, Lisa Ramaci, K.B., Brenda Habsieger, Ariana Reyes, Donna Kuglics, Johnny Javier Miles, Sr, Christina Biederman, Kacey Gilmore, Shawn Bartlett, Curtis Glawson, Sr, Rachel M. Gillette, Rebekah A. Coldewe, John Vacho, G.F., Ann Christopher, Rayanne Hunter, H. Joseph Bandhold, Jerry L. Myers, Cedric Hunt, Sr, Kenneth J. Drevnick, Marian Brown, Daniel Benavidez, Sr, Michael Smith, Seop Steve Kim, Nicole Landon, Tonya K. Dressler, Glenda Starcevich, Shelley Ann Smith, Walter Bailey, Theresa Davis, A.F., Robert Funcheon, Joanne Gutcher, Daniel Menke, Tricia English, T.H., Lynn Forehand, Ryan Sabinish, Lorenzo Sandoval, Sr, Russell Falter, Suzzettee Lawson, Nanette Saenz, Sabrina Cumbe, Gregory Bauer, Charlotte Freeman, Ardith Cecil Dressler, Ashley Gudridge, Denice York, Ava Tomson, Isabell Vincent, Wayne Brown, Linda Gibson, Rosemarie Alfonso, A.B., Kelli D. Hake, Lorenzo Sandoval, Jr, Harry Pickett, Robert Bartlett, Juan Saenz, Kathleen Snyder, Patrick Farr, Jennifer Morman, Hyunjung Glawson, Donna Engeman, Mary Jane Vandegrift, J.J.M., Jr, Pam Marion, Devon Fletcher Hickman, C.W., Les Kuglics, Donald C. Bandhold, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, Linda David, Patricia Smith, Yolanda M. Brooks, Tracie Arsiaga, Nancy Umbrell, Kim Miller, G.H., N.W.E., Karen Funcheon, Merlese Pickett, Lance Haupt, Wayne Newby, Timothy W. Elledge, Marion Crimens, Todd Daily, Chastity Dawn Slaven, Jeremy Blohm, Allen Swinton, D.W., Trina Jackson, Philip S. Ford, Mark Umbrell, Peter Hake, Dan Dixon, David W. Haines, Michael David, Donnie Marion, S.J., N.C.E., Danielle Sweet, Emily Kuglics, Nichole Lohring, Melissa Dressler, John Vandegrift, Deborah Noble, Fred Frigo, Randolph Freeman, A.S.E., Charles Vincent, D.J.F., Sangsoon Kim, Michelle Benavidez, Daniel Benavidez, Jr, Holly Burson-Gilpin, Anne F. Harris, Danny Chism, Jacob Michael Habsieger, T.S., Ashley Vacho, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, G.B., Maria E. Calle, Shelby West, Paula Menke, Debra Wigbels, Rhonda Haupt, A.W., Judy Ann Crabtree, Dawn Haines, Temika Swinton, Tracy Anderson, Michael Habsieger, Steve Morin, Raymond Nigel Spencer, Sr, E.M., Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Ursula Ann Joshua, Helen Fraser, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Timothy Karcher, Sean Slaven, Cynthia Delgado, Terrell Gilmore, Jr, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, C.L., Shannon Millican, Trenton Starcevich, Denise Blohm, Angie Jackson, I.F., Jill Hake, Ilene Dixon, W.H., Charles E. Matheny, III, David Hartley, Theresa Hart, Rebecca J. Oliver, Armando Fuentes, Sean Elliott, Edna Luz Burgos, Erik Roberts, N.T., a minor, Colin Roberts, Robin Roberts, Chastity Dawn Laflin, T.M., a minor, Keri Cotton, Julio Fuentes, Daniel C. Oliver, Travis Gibson, George J. White, Johnny Washburn, Dan Dixon for the Estate of Ilene Dixon, R.N.R., a minor, John McCully, James Smith, Anthony Alderete, Michael J. Miller, Steve Morin, Sr, Zachary Hake, Megan Marie Rice, George D. White, Cara Roberts, M.T., a minor, Stephanie McCully, T.F., a minor, Terrel Charles Bartlett, Cory Smith, A.B., a minor, Evan Kirby, Judy Huenink for the Estate of Benjamin J. Slaven, Carrol Alderete, B.D., a minor, Nancy Fuentes, John Vandegrift for the Estate of Matthew R. Vandegrift, D.J.F., a minor, Cynthia Delgado for the Estate of George Delgado, Mackenzie Haines, Natalia White, Cynthia Thornsberry, K.W., a minor, Megan Marie Rice for the Estate of Zachary T. Myers, R.M., a minor, Stephanie Gibson Webster, Christina Smith, Debbie Smith, Jeffrey D. Price, Cassie Smith, Harry Cromity, James Craig Roberts, Marvin Thornsberry, L.T., a minor, Skylar Hake. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons) (Schlanger, Aaron)
March 17, 2015 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank Saderat PLC identifying Corporate Parent Bank Saderat Iran for Bank Saderat PLC. (Michaels, Adam)
March 16, 2015 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM in Support re #71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Supplemental Memorandum of Law of HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank plc, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited and HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and The Royal Bank of Scotland N.V. in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V.. (Hanchet, Mark)
March 16, 2015 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC identifying Corporate Parent HSBC USA Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings plc. for HSBC Bank USA, N.A.; Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc. for HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC. (Hanchet, Mark)
March 16, 2015 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Support re #71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Memorandum of Law of Defendant Credit Suisse AG in Support of Motion to Dismiss") filed by Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
March 16, 2015 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Support re #71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ("Defendants' Joint Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss") filed by Barclays, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank. (Clary, Richard)
March 16, 2015 Filing 71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Barclays, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed November 10, 2014) (Clary, Richard)
March 16, 2015 Filing 70 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank Saderat PLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service) (Michaels, Adam)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #67 Joint Motion for an extension of the page limits for the briefing for defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss is granted. So Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/13/2015. (Carosella, Christy)
March 13, 2015 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Scott on behalf of Barclays (aty to be noticed) (Scott, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Thomas Cottreau on behalf of Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V. (aty to be noticed) (Cottreau, Steven)
March 12, 2015 Filing 67 Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for memoranda of law re the defendants' motions to dismiss, which are due on March 16, 2015 by Credit Suisse. (Buretta, John)
March 4, 2015 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc R. Cohen on behalf of HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (notification declined or already on case) (Cohen, Marc)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (counsel must file a notice of appearance) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/4/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
March 4, 2015 Filing 64 Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Marc R. Cohen Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7563954. by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Cohen, Marc)
February 26, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Hughes on behalf of HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (notification declined or already on case) (Hughes, Paul)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (COUNSEL MUST FILE A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/24/2015. (Caggiano, Diana) (Main Document 62 replaced on 2/24/2015) (Caggiano, Diana).
February 24, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Paul Hughes Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7543999. by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Hughes, Paul)
February 23, 2015 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark G. Hanchet (Hanchet, Mark)
February 13, 2015 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Chartered Bank identifying Corporate Parent Standard Chartered Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Standard Chartered PLC for Standard Chartered Bank. (Nelles, Sharon)
February 12, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex C. Lakatos on behalf of HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (notification declined or already on case) (Lakatos, Alex)
February 12, 2015 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Raven-Hansen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Raven-Hansen, Peter)
February 11, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy D. Frey on behalf of Bank Saderat PLC (aty to be noticed) (Frey, Jeremy)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (counsel must file a notice of appearance) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/11/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
February 11, 2015 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7517204. by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Lakatos, Alex)
February 6, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Pincus on behalf of HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (notification declined or already on case) (Pincus, Andrew)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (COUNSEL MUST FILE A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/5/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (COUNSEL MUST FILE A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/5/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
February 5, 2015 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7505845. by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support AFFIDAVIT OF ANDREW J. PINCUS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE) (Pincus, Andrew)
February 4, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Peter Raven-Hansen Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7502237. by A.B., A.F., A.S.E., A.W., Rosemarie Alfonso, Jeffrey Anderson, Tracy Anderson, Tracie Arsiaga, Cassandra Bailey, Walter Bailey, Donald C. Bandhold, H. Joseph Bandhold, Robert Bartlett, Shawn Bartlett, Gregory Bauer, Daniel Benavidez, Sr, Daniel Benavidez, Jr, Michelle Benavidez, Christina Biederman, Denise Blohm, Jeremy Blohm, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, Yolanda M. Brooks, Elizabeth Brown, Marian Brown, Wayne Brown, Holly Burson-Gilpin, C.H., C.L., C.W., Maria E. Calle, Danny Chism, Ann Christopher, Rebekah A. Coldewe, Judy Ann Crabtree, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, Ronald William Crabtree, Marion Crimens, Sabrina Cumbe, D.J.F., D.W., Todd Daily, Linda David, Michael David, Theresa Davis, Cynthia Delgado, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Dan Dixon, Ilene Dixon, Ardith Cecil Dressler, Melissa Dressler, Tonya K. Dressler, Kenneth J. Drevnick, E.M., Timothy W. Elledge, Donna Engeman, Tricia English, Linda Falter, Russell Falter, Patrick Farr, Silver Farr, William Farrar, Sr, Misti Fisher, Philip S. Ford, Lynn Forehand, Helen Fraser, Richard Fraser, Charlotte Freeman, Randolph Freeman, Fred Frigo, Anastasia Fuller, Karen Funcheon, Robert Funcheon, G.B., G.F., G.H., John Gibson, Linda Gibson, Rachel M. Gillette, Kacey Gilmore, Terrell Gilmore, Jr, Curtis Glawson, Sr, Hyunjung Glawson, Ashley Gudridge, Joanne Gutcher, Brenda Habsieger, Jacob Michael Habsieger, Michael Habsieger, David W. Haines, Dawn Haines, Jill Hake, Kelli D. Hake, Peter Hake, Anne F. Harris, Paul D. Harris, Theresa Hart, David Hartley, Lance Haupt, Rhonda Haupt, Tifany Haupt, David Eugene Hickman, Devon Fletcher Hickman, Veronica Hickman, Judy Huenink, Cedric Hunt, Sr, Rayanne Hunter, I.F., J.J.M., Jr, Angie Jackson, Trina Jackson, Brittany Marionique Joshua, Ursula Ann Joshua, K.B., Timothy Karcher, Michelle Kim, Sangsoon Kim, Seop Steve Kim, Donna Kuglics, Emily Kuglics, Les Kuglics, John D. Lamie, Nicole Landon, Suzzettee Lawson, Christopher Levi, Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Nichole Lohring, Tonya Lotto, Donnie Marion, Pam Marion, Charles E. Matheny, III, Daniel Menke, Matthew Menke, Paula Menke, Johnny Javier Miles, Sr, Christopher Miller, Kim Miller, Mitchell Millican, Shannon Millican, Audrey Morin, Steve Morin, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, Jennifer Morman, Jerry L. Myers, N.C.E., N.W.E., Wayne Newby, Deborah Noble, Harry Pickett, Merlese Pickett, Lisa Ramaci, Ariana Reyes, Amy Lynn Robinson, Floyd Burton Robinson, S.J., Ryan Sabinish, Juan Saenz, Nanette Saenz, Lorenzo Sandoval, Sr, Lorenzo Sandoval, Jr, Chastity Dawn Slaven, Sean Slaven, Jacqueline A. Smith, Michael Smith, Patricia Smith, Shelley Ann Smith, Kathleen Snyder, Raymond Nigel Spencer, Sr, Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Bradley Starcevich, Glenda Starcevich, Trenton Starcevich, Danielle Sweet, Allen Swinton, Temika Swinton, T.B., T.H., T.S., Ava Tomson, Richard Tomson, Mark Umbrell, Nancy Umbrell, Ashley Vacho, John Vacho, John Vandegrift, Mary Jane Vandegrift, Charles Vincent, Isabell Vincent, W.H., Billy Wallace, Stefanie Wallace, Jeanette West, Shelby West, Debra Wigbels, Denice York, Russel York. (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 29, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Lynn Hoxie on behalf of Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V. (aty to be noticed) (Hoxie, Jamie)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the following briefing schedule: Defendants are to file their motion to dismiss on or before 3/16/15. Plaintiffs shall have 21 days from the date that defendants file their motion to amend their complaint and/or file their opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. If plaintiffs oppose defendants' motion to dismiss, defendants shall have three weeks from the date that plaintiffs file their opposition to file their reply. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/26/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
January 23, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Foster on behalf of Bank Saderat PLC (aty to be noticed) (Foster, Matthew)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion granted subject of the payment of appropriate fees. (counsel must file a notice of appearance) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/23/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
January 21, 2015 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7472279. by Bank Saderat PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jeremy D. Frey) (Michaels, Adam)
January 20, 2015 Filing 43 Letter to Judge Pollak joining co-Defendants' proposed motion to dismiss briefing schedule by Bank Saderat PLC (Michaels, Adam)
January 20, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Clyde T. Turner on behalf of Charlotte Freeman (aty to be noticed) (Turner, Clyde)
January 20, 2015 Filing 41 Letter from Joshua D. Glatter to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding Defendants' letter of even date and schedule for briefing motions to dismiss by Charlotte Freeman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 20, 2015 Filing 40 Letter to Judge Pollak from John D. Buretta re: the schedule for briefing motions to dismiss by Credit Suisse (Buretta, John)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (counsel must file a notice of appearance) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/20/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
January 16, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7461381. by Bank Saderat PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew Foster, #2 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission) (Michaels, Adam)
January 16, 2015 Filing 37 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 1/15/2015. Discovery held in abeyance pending motion practice. Parties to confer and propose a schedule by 1/20/15. (Caggiano, Diana)
January 14, 2015 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barclays identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays. (Sedlak, Jonathan)
January 13, 2015 Filing 35 Letter Addressed to Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak From Mark G. Hanchet in Response to Plaintiffs' January 13, 2015 Letter by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Hanchet, Mark)
January 13, 2015 Filing 34 Letter from Ari Ungar to the Hon. Cheryl L. Pollak regarding the June 15, 2015 teleconference by Charlotte Freeman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC RESCHEDULING ORDER: The telephone conference previously scheduled for 1/16/15 before MJ Pollak has been rescheduled to 1/15/15 @ 10:30 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/13/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (COUNSEL MUST FILE A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/9/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
January 8, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for C. Tab Turner Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-7441569. by A.B., A.F., A.S.E., A.W., Rosemarie Alfonso, Jeffrey Anderson, Tracy Anderson, Tracie Arsiaga, Cassandra Bailey, Walter Bailey, Donald C. Bandhold, H. Joseph Bandhold, Robert Bartlett, Shawn Bartlett, Gregory Bauer, Daniel Benavidez, Sr, Daniel Benavidez, Jr, Michelle Benavidez, Christina Biederman, Denise Blohm, Jeremy Blohm, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, Yolanda M. Brooks, Elizabeth Brown, Marian Brown, Wayne Brown, Holly Burson-Gilpin, C.H., C.L., C.W., Maria E. Calle, Danny Chism, Ann Christopher, Rebekah A. Coldewe, Judy Ann Crabtree, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, Ronald William Crabtree, Marion Crimens, Sabrina Cumbe, D.J.F., D.W., Todd Daily, Linda David, Michael David, Theresa Davis, Cynthia Delgado, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Dan Dixon, Ilene Dixon, Ardith Cecil Dressler, Melissa Dressler, Tonya K. Dressler, Kenneth J. Drevnick, E.M., Timothy W. Elledge, Donna Engeman, Tricia English, Linda Falter, Russell Falter, Patrick Farr, Silver Farr, William Farrar, Sr, Misti Fisher, Philip S. Ford, Lynn Forehand, Helen Fraser, Richard Fraser, Charlotte Freeman, Randolph Freeman, Fred Frigo, Anastasia Fuller, Karen Funcheon, Robert Funcheon, G.B., G.F., G.H., John Gibson, Linda Gibson, Rachel M. Gillette, Kacey Gilmore, Terrell Gilmore, Jr, Curtis Glawson, Sr, Hyunjung Glawson, Ashley Gudridge, Joanne Gutcher, Brenda Habsieger, Jacob Michael Habsieger, Michael Habsieger, David W. Haines, Dawn Haines, Jill Hake, Kelli D. Hake, Peter Hake, Anne F. Harris, Paul D. Harris, Theresa Hart, David Hartley, Lance Haupt, Rhonda Haupt, Tifany Haupt, David Eugene Hickman, Devon Fletcher Hickman, Veronica Hickman, Judy Huenink, Cedric Hunt, Sr, Rayanne Hunter, I.F., J.J.M., Jr, Angie Jackson, Trina Jackson, Brittany Marionique Joshua, Ursula Ann Joshua, K.B., Timothy Karcher, Michelle Kim, Sangsoon Kim, Seop Steve Kim, Donna Kuglics, Emily Kuglics, Les Kuglics, John D. Lamie, Nicole Landon, Suzzettee Lawson, Christopher Levi, Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Nichole Lohring, Tonya Lotto, Donnie Marion, Pam Marion, Charles E. Matheny, III, Daniel Menke, Matthew Menke, Paula Menke, Johnny Javier Miles, Sr, Christopher Miller, Kim Miller, Mitchell Millican, Shannon Millican, Audrey Morin, Steve Morin, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, Jennifer Morman, Jerry L. Myers, N.C.E., N.W.E., Wayne Newby, Deborah Noble, Harry Pickett, Merlese Pickett, Lisa Ramaci, Ariana Reyes, Amy Lynn Robinson, Floyd Burton Robinson, S.J., Ryan Sabinish, Juan Saenz, Nanette Saenz, Lorenzo Sandoval, Sr, Lorenzo Sandoval, Jr, Chastity Dawn Slaven, Sean Slaven, Jacqueline A. Smith, Michael Smith, Patricia Smith, Shelley Ann Smith, Kathleen Snyder, Raymond Nigel Spencer, Sr, Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Bradley Starcevich, Glenda Starcevich, Trenton Starcevich, Danielle Sweet, Allen Swinton, Temika Swinton, T.B., T.H., T.S., Ava Tomson, Richard Tomson, Mark Umbrell, Nancy Umbrell, Ashley Vacho, John Vacho, John Vandegrift, Mary Jane Vandegrift, Charles Vincent, Isabell Vincent, W.H., Billy Wallace, Stefanie Wallace, Jeanette West, Shelby West, Debra Wigbels, Denice York, Russel York. (Schlanger, Aaron)
January 7, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Smith on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Bradley)
January 7, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon L. Nelles on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (aty to be noticed) (Nelles, Sharon)
January 7, 2015 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V. identifying Corporate Parent The Royal Bank Of Scotland Group PLC, Corporate Parent RBS Holdings N.V., Corporate Parent RFS Holdings B.V. for Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V.. (Houck, Robert)
January 7, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Houck on behalf of Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V. (aty to be noticed) (Houck, Robert)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED LETTER ORDER re #26 The schedule will be discussed at the (telephone) conference on 1/16/15 @ 11:30 AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/7/2015. (Caggiano, Diana)
January 7, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Bank Saderat PLC. (Michaels, Adam)
January 7, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam B. Michaels on behalf of Bank Saderat PLC (aty to be noticed) (Michaels, Adam)
January 6, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert William Hamburg on behalf of HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (aty to be noticed) (Hamburg, Robert)
January 6, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Tomaino, Jr on behalf of Barclays (aty to be noticed) (Tomaino, Michael)
January 5, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Sedlak on behalf of Barclays (aty to be noticed) (Sedlak, Jonathan)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of #11 , a telephone conference before M.J. Pollak is scheduled for January 16, 2015 at 11:30 a.m. The parties are to contact one another and conference the Court into the call once all of the parties are on the line. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/5/2015. (Wiener, Benjamin)
January 2, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of e-mail address by Joshua D. Glatter (Glatter, Joshua)
January 2, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of e-mail address by Ari Ungar (Ungar, Ari)
January 2, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of e-mail address by Naomi B Weinberg (Weinberg, Naomi)
January 2, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Glatter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Glatter, Joshua)
January 2, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of e-mail address by Gary M. Osen (Osen, Gary)
January 2, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of e-mail address by Aaron Schlanger (Schlanger, Aaron)
December 31, 2014 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credit Suisse identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse. (Clary, Richard)
December 31, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Buretta on behalf of Credit Suisse (aty to be noticed) (Buretta, John)
December 31, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Reynolds on behalf of Credit Suisse (aty to be noticed) (Reynolds, Michael)
December 31, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wayland Clary on behalf of Credit Suisse (aty to be noticed) (Clary, Richard)
December 30, 2014 Filing 11 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak from Mark G. Hanchet re: Proposed Briefing Schedule by HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Hanchet, Mark)
December 23, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Hanchet on behalf of HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (aty to be noticed) (Hanchet, Mark)
December 22, 2014 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Freeman. Standard Chartered Bank served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. (Schlanger, Aaron)
December 22, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Freeman. Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V. served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. (Schlanger, Aaron)
December 22, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Freeman. Barclays served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. (Schlanger, Aaron)
December 22, 2014 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Freeman. Credit Suisse served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. (Schlanger, Aaron)
December 22, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Freeman. HSBC Bank PLC served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. (Schlanger, Aaron)
December 22, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Freeman. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. served on 12/10/2014, answer due 12/31/2014. (Schlanger, Aaron)
November 10, 2014 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653081017 (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 10, 2014 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 10, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bank Saderat PLC, Barclays, Credit Suisse, HSBC Bank Middle East Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Standard Chartered Bank. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 10, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Sylvia Johnson Spencer, Floyd Burton Robinson, Anastasia Fuller, C.H., Elizabeth Brown, Bradley Starcevich, Devon Fletcher Hickman, C.W., Les Kuglics, Stefanie Wallace, Donald C. Bandhold, Ronald Wayne Crabtree, Gwendolyn Morin-Marentes, John Gibson, Patricia Smith, Linda David, Tonya Lotto, Ronald William Crabtree, Yolanda M. Brooks, Tracie Arsiaga, Nancy Umbrell, Jacqueline A. Smith, Kim Miller, Jeffrey Anderson, Matthew Menke, G.H., Amy Lynn Robinson, Silver Farr, Linda Falter, N.W.E., Paul D. Harris, Karen Funcheon, Merlese Pickett, Audrey Morin, Lance Haupt, Wayne Newby, Timothy W. Elledge, David Eugene Hickman, William Farrar, Sr, Judy Huenink, Billy Wallace, Cassandra Bailey, Todd Daily, Marion Crimens, Chastity Dawn Slaven, Richard Tomson, Michelle Kim, Richard Fraser, Jeremy Blohm, Misti Fisher, Tifany Haupt, Allen Swinton, Christopher Levi, Veronica Hickman, John D. Lamie, D.W., Trina Jackson, Mark Umbrell, Philip S. Ford, Peter Hake, T.B., Mitchell Millican, Christopher Miller, Brittany Marionique Joshua, David W. Haines, Dan Dixon, Donnie Marion, Michael David, Russel York, Jeanette West, Lisa Ramaci, K.B., S.J., Brenda Habsieger, Ariana Reyes, Donna Kuglics, Johnny Javier Miles, Sr, Christina Biederman, Danielle Sweet, N.C.E., Kacey Gilmore, Shawn Bartlett, Curtis Glawson, Sr, Emily Kuglics, Rachel M. Gillette, Rebekah A. Coldewe, John Vacho, Nichole Lohring, G.F., Ann Christopher, Rayanne Hunter, H. Joseph Bandhold, Melissa Dressler, Jerry L. Myers, John Vandegrift, Deborah Noble, Fred Frigo, Cedric Hunt, Sr, Randolph Freeman, Charles Vincent, A.S.E., Kenneth J. Drevnick, Marian Brown, Daniel Benavidez, Sr, D.J.F., Michael Smith, Michelle Benavidez, Sangsoon Kim, Seop Steve Kim, Daniel Benavidez, Jr, Nicole Landon, Holly Burson-Gilpin, Tonya K. Dressler, Anne F. Harris, Glenda Starcevich, Danny Chism, Shelley Ann Smith, Walter Bailey, Theresa Davis, Jacob Michael Habsieger, A.F., T.S., Ashley Vacho, Robert Funcheon, Joanne Gutcher, Daniel Menke, Tricia English, Racquel Arnae Bobb Miles, Maria E. Calle, G.B., Shelby West, T.H., Lynn Forehand, Ryan Sabinish, Lorenzo Sandoval, Sr, Russell Falter, Suzzettee Lawson, Paula Menke, Debra Wigbels, Nanette Saenz, Rhonda Haupt, A.W., Judy Ann Crabtree, Dawn Haines, Sabrina Cumbe, Gregory Bauer, Temika Swinton, Charlotte Freeman, Ardith Cecil Dressler, Tracy Anderson, Ashley Gudridge, Denice York, Steve Morin, Michael Habsieger, Ava Tomson, Isabell Vincent, Raymond Nigel Spencer, Sr, E.M., Wayne Brown, Kynesha Dhanoolal, Helen Fraser, Linda Gibson, Ursula Ann Joshua, Fabersha Flynt Lewis, Timothy Karcher, Sean Slaven, Rosemarie Alfonso, Cynthia Delgado, Paula C. Bobb-Miles, Terrell Gilmore, Jr, C.L., A.B., Kelli D. Hake, Lorenzo Sandoval, Jr, Harry Pickett, Robert Bartlett, Juan Saenz, Shannon Millican, Trenton Starcevich, Kathleen Snyder, Denise Blohm, Patrick Farr, Angie Jackson, Jennifer Morman, Hyunjung Glawson, Donna Engeman, Ilene Dixon, Jill Hake, I.F., W.H., Charles E. Matheny, III, Mary Jane Vandegrift, David Hartley, J.J.M., Jr, Theresa Hart, Pam Marion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman et al v. HSBC Holdings PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D. Harris
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tricia English
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Menke
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Price
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Arsiaga for the Estate of Jeremy Arsiaga
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.W., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Washburn
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Sackett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.F.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Sweet
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Hake
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline A. Smith
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie McCully
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Hunt, Sr.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael David
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.B.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.H.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Stillwell for the Estate of Daniel Crabtree
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lucas
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Klemensberg
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Jones
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah Simoneaux
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Benavidez
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Engeman for the Estate of John W. Engeman
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Fuller for the Estate of Alexander H. Fuller
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Frigo
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.S.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy W. Elledge
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lilley
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hartley
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Haines
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.T., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Roberts
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lewis
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temika Swinton
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanette Saenz
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Farrar, Sr.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keri Cotton
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.T., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortez Glawson
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Anderson
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noala Fritz for the Estate of Lyle Fritz
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Thornsberry
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Blohm
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.J.S., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lucas
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Habsieger
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Huenink
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Dressler
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sangsoon Kim
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.K., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Lamie
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Fletcher Hickman
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lucas
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.D., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrol Alderete
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tomson
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ava Tomson
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine McRill-Fellini
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gibson
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Starcevich
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam G. Stout
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noala Fritz for the Estate of Jacob Fritz
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hood
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Myers
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Farr
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Joseph Bandhold
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Levi
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Smith
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha McCoy
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Vincent
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli D. Hake
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.M.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noala Fritz
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Marionique Joshua
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Hake
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Macias
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlynn Gonzales
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Canine
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Daily
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Fraser
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Smith
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Baumhoer
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Neuman
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Canine
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McCully
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula C. Bobb-Miles
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Williamson
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.W.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Menke
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Elliott
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.L., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Pickett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan People
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Cumbe
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Kruger
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J.M., Jr.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Michael Habsieger
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Arsiaga
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Bartlett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilene Dixon
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.L.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Morman
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Wood
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skylar Hake
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Landon
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Fuentes
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlese Pickett for the Estate of Emmanuel Pickett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Coke
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Javier Miles, Sr.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Fuentes
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kynesha Dhanoolal
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Gibson Webster
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Fuentes for the Estate of Daniel A. Fuentes
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J.S., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Anderson
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Smith
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joedi Wood
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kousay Al-Taie for the Estate of Ahmed Al-Taie
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.B.
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bartlett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Jason Stone
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bashar Al-Taie
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George D. White
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Gonzales
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Gibson
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Alfonso
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Gudridge
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Wayne Crabtree
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Munoz
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Noble
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Funcheon
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Canine
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lynn Robinson
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lewis for the Estate of Jason Dale Lewis
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C. Bandhold
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette West
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Chism
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Farr
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Pickett
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Reyes
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Newby
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Wolfer
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vandegrift for the Estate of Matthew R. Vandegrift
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby West
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Arsiaga
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Kuglics
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Slaven
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip S. Ford
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.T., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixie Flagg
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Freeman
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Brown
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaula Shaffer
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.F., a minor
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Karcher
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Ann Bock
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Parker
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Kim
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Roberts
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Brown
Represented By: William Adam Friedman
Represented By: Joshua D. Glatter
Represented By: Dina Gielchinsky
Represented By: Naomi B Weinberg
Represented By: Gary M. Osen
Represented By: Peter Raven-Hansen
Represented By: Ari Ungar
Represented By: Aaron Schlanger
Represented By: Michael Jacob Radine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]