Castillo et al v. G&M Realty L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Maria Castillo, James Cochran, Luis Gomez, Bienbenido Guerra, Richard Miller, Kai Niederhausen, Carlo Nieva, Rodney Rodriguez and Kenji Takabayashi
Defendant: 22-50 Jackson Avenue Owners, L.P., 22-52 Jackson Avenue LLC, ACD Citiview Buildings, LLC, G&M Realty L.P. and Gerald Wolkoff
Case Number: 1:2015cv03230
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Presiding Judge: Roanne L. Mann
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying, without prejudice, 93 Motion for Bond. Defendants are directed to promptly disclose to plaintiffs' counsel the financial information with which they offered to furnish the Court. The parties shall further confer in good faith to resolve this dispute. If they are unable to reach a resolution, either side may seek the Court's approval of a particularized proposed form of security; the parties' submissions should be supported by evidentiary (financial) material, which may be filed under seal, with access limited to case participants. See attached for discussion. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/22/2018. (Proujansky, Josh)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: Defendants motions 83 are denied in their entirety. See attached Memorandum and Order for details. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/13/2018. (Innelli, Michael)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: While defendants proposed bond covers only the amount of judgment, the Court is satisfied that defendants, well-financed real estate companies and their wealthy owner, will be fiscally able to pay interest and costs after the appellate process ends. Therefore, the proposed bond is approved, and enforcement of judgment is stayed pending appeal. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/15/2018. (Innelli, Michael)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM and ORDER: Defendants motion 74 seeking a stay is granted in part and denied in part. In the exercise of its discretion, the Court grants defendants a seven-day extension of the current stay until March 14, 2018. This will afford defenda nts a total of 21 days from judgment to secure a supersedeas bond or, alternatively, an appropriate letter of credit. Regardless of which, if any, is presented to the Court, it will rule on its adequacy when submitted. Defendants alternative motion to stay pending post- trial motions is denied as premature, as no such motions have been filed. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/6/2018. (Innelli, Michael)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECISION: This is the Court's written decision in what has commonly become know as the 5Pointz litigation. The Court finds in favor of the plaintiffs in the amounts determined in this decision. Judgement will be entered shortly. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/12/2018. (Innelli, Michael)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 memorandum AND ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order, the defendants motion for summary judgment 29 is GRANTED as to the plaintiffs claims for conversion, property damage, and IIED, but DENIED as to the plaintiffs VA RA claim, and the plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is GRANTED with respect to the defendants counterclaim. Accordingly, the matter shall proceed to trial on the VARA claim issue. In addition, as the plaintiffs counsel was unable to specify the number of artwork at issue, counsel is directed to submit a final list to the defendants and the Court on or before May 1, 2017. Depending on the length of the list, the Court reserves judgment as to whether the list is short enough to be handled by a single jury. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/31/2017. (Innelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo et al v. G&M Realty L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 22-50 Jackson Avenue Owners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 22-52 Jackson Avenue LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACD Citiview Buildings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&M Realty L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Wolkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Castillo
Represented By: Eric Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cochran
Represented By: Eric Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Gomez
Represented By: Eric Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bienbenido Guerra
Represented By: Eric Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Miller
Represented By: Eric Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kai Niederhausen
Represented By: Eric Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Nieva
Represented By: Eric Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Rodriguez
Represented By: Eric Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenji Takabayashi
Represented By: Eric Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?