Bey v. Fernandez et al
Plaintiff: |
Tehuti Bat'z Elohim Bey |
Defendant: |
Michael Fernandez, James Holt and Kevin Trowel |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv07237 |
Filed: |
December 18, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pamela K. Chen |
Presiding Judge: |
Marilyn D. Go |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 5, 2018 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, Defendants' 42 motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and 42 motion for summary judgment are both granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment for Defendants and terminate this action. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 9/5/2018. (Cuevas Ingram, Joanna)
|
May 31, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER denying 27 Motion to Stay: For the reasons stated in the attached order, Plaintiff's motion to stay this action is denied. If and when Plaintiff successfully exhausts his claims against DHS, Plaintiff may move in the ordinary course fo r permission to amend his complaint to add DHS as a defendant. In the meantime, pursuant to Valentin v. Dinkins, 121 F.3d 72 (2d Cir. 1997), the Court directs the U.S. Attorneys Office toprovide the proper service address for Defendants Fernan dez and Holt by June 21, 2017. The Court also respectfully requests that Magistrate Judge Tiscione coordinate with the U.S. Marshals Service to serve a summons and a copy of the Amended Complaint (Dkt. 20) on Defendants Fernandez and Holt. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 5/31/2017. (Chivers, Jeffrey)
|
March 2, 2016 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum and order, the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court grants Plai ntiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis solely for the purpose of this Order. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. The Clerk's Office is respectfully directed to close this case and enter judgment accordingly. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/2/2016. (Merin, Eric)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?