Picinich v. New York Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: |
Gregory Picinich |
Defendant: |
Principal Michael Athy, Gabriella Antiocho, Esq., Assistant Principal Elizabeth M. Guglielmo and New York Department of Education |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00844 |
Filed: |
February 19, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Carol Bagley Amon |
Presiding Judge: |
Lois Bloom |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 20, 2018 |
Filing
50
ORDER ADOPTING 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, The Court has reviewed the record and, finding no clear error, adopts the well-reasoned R&R as the opinion of the Court. Accordingly, the Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss Picinich's amended complaint and hereby directs the Clerk of Court to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 8/17/2018. (c/m to pro se; fwd'd for jgm) (Lee, Tiffeny)
|
March 22, 2017 |
Filing
36
ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Bloom. Accordingly, defendants' motion to dismiss in granted. Picinich's federal claims are dismissed with prejudice, save for his equal protection claim premised on a selective enforcement theory, which Picinich may replead within thirty days of this Order. Having dismissed all of the federal claims over which this Court has original jurisdiction and there being no basis for jurisdiction pursuan t to 28 U.S.C. § 1332, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Picinich's additional state and city law claims, which are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States. 368 U.S. 438,444-45 (1962). So Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 3/21/2017. (c/m) (Lee, Tiffeny)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?