Harris v. BNC Mortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harris and Symonous-Greta Harris
Defendant: BNC Mortgage, Inc, BNC Mortgage, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. doing business as America's Servicing Company, N.A. doing business as America's Servicing Company, Lehman Brothers Holding Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust, Structured Asset Securities Corporation et. al and And All Other Parties of Interest 1-50 John and Jane Does
Case Number: 1:2016cv02126
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2018 Filing 21 MANDATE of USCA as to #20 Notice of Appeal, filed by Symonous-Greta Harris. It is Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. See document for further details. Issued as Mandate: 7/3/18. USCA #17-1280-cv (McGee, Mary Ann)
April 28, 2017 Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #20 Notice of Appeal, Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
April 27, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #19 Clerk's Judgment, #18 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Symonous-Greta Harris. Filing fee $ 505.00. Receipt #4653114223. Service done electronically. (McGee, Mary Ann)
March 28, 2017 Filing 19 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment is hereby entered granting Defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaint. ORDERED by Janet Hamilton, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 3/28/2017. (Copy of this Judgment and the attached appeals packet sent to pro se Plaintiff via first class mail.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims in this action are precluded by the State Court action. The Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaint. (ECF Nos.: #16 , #17 .) The Court also dismisses the Complaint against Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company pursuant to its sua sponte authority to dismiss a pro se complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted even where the plaintiff has paid the filing fee. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 3/28/2017. (Copy of this Order and the attached copies of all unpublished decisions cited herein sent to pro se Plaintiff.) Forwarded for Judgment. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
August 26, 2016 Filing 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Cameron E. Grant in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Certificate of Service) (Grant, Cameron)
July 22, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, BNC Mortgage, Inc., Lehman Brothers Holding Inc., Structured Asset Securities Corporation et. al. Responses due by 8/12/2016 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Memorandum in Support, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Affidavit of Service) (Sandelands, William)
July 12, 2016 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Attempted Not Known, Unable to Forward. Notice of Electronic Filing, Order dated 6/27/16 sent to Symonous-Greta Harris (Piper, Francine)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re #14 Proposed Briefing Schedule. Defendants shall serve their motions on or before July 22, 2016. Plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motions on or before August 12, 2016. Defendants shall serve any reply in further support of their motions on or before August 26, 2016 and file all papers on August 26, 2016. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/27/2016. (Reyneri, Rafael)
June 24, 2016 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Aurora Loan Services, LLC (Sandelands, William)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #9 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. All defendants shall confer and file a proposed briefing schedule for their respective anticipated motions. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/20/2016. (Reyneri, Rafael)
June 17, 2016 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order in accordance with the Court's Order entered June 14, 2016. by U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Grant, Cameron)
June 17, 2016 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL Corporate Disclosure Statement re #6 by U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Grant, Cameron)
June 17, 2016 Filing 11 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to BNC Mortgage, Inc.; Lehman Brothers Holding, Inc. and Structured Asset Securities Corporation by BNC Mortgage, Inc., Lehman Brothers Holding Inc., Structured Asset Securities Corporation et. al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sandelands, William)
June 17, 2016 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Loan Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lehman Brothers Holding Inc. for Aurora Loan Services, LLC. (Sandelands, William)
June 17, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for pre motion conference by Aurora Loan Services, LLC. (Sandelands, William)
June 17, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Fried on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Fried, Lisa)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #7 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Defendants shall file a proposed briefing schedule for their anticipated motion to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/14/2016. (Reyneri, Rafael)
June 3, 2016 Filing 7 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference with respect to their proposed motion to dismiss the complaint by U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Grant, Cameron)
June 3, 2016 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate America's Serving Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; Corporate Parent US Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. (Grant, Cameron)
June 1, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Symonous-Greta Harris. Aurora Loan Services, LLC served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016; BNC Mortgage, Inc. served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016; Deutsche Bank National Trust Company served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016; Lehman Brothers Holding Inc. served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016; Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016; Structured Asset Securities Corporation et. al served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016; U.S. Bank National Association served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (Guzzi, Roseann)
May 9, 2016 Case Reassigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie. Judge Carol Bagley Amon no longer assigned to the case.Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/6/2016. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 2, 2016 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 29, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly)
April 29, 2016 Filing 2 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 20056 (Davis, Kimberly)
April 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against And All Other Parties of Interest 1-50 John and Jane Does, Aurora Loan Services, LLC, BNC Mortgage, Inc., Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Lehman Brothers Holding Inc., Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust, Structured Asset Securities Corporation et. al, U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Symonous-Greta Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Pendency) (Davis, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. BNC Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symonous-Greta Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNC Mortgage, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNC Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Sandelands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. doing business as America's Servicing Company, N.A. doing business as America's Servicing Company
Represented By: Lisa Fried
Represented By: Cameron Everett Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers Holding Inc.
Represented By: William C. Sandelands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Lisa Fried
Represented By: Cameron Everett Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: William C. Sandelands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structured Asset Securities Corporation et. al
Represented By: William C. Sandelands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And All Other Parties of Interest 1-50 John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?