Gissim, Inc. v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gissim, Inc.
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv03306
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: I. Leo Glasser
Presiding Judge: Steven L. Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND OPINIONOrdered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/17/2018. (Perlman, Alexa)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 11/7/2018. (Perlman, Alexa)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 16 Motion to Remand to State Court. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/22/2016. (McBride, Katherine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gissim, Inc. v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gissim, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd D. Kremin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?