United States of America v. Two Hundred Seventy-Two Thousand Dollars and No Cents ($272,000)
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Two Hundred Seventy-Two Thousand Dollars and No Cents ($272,000)
Case Number: 1:2016cv06564
Filed: November 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. I adopt the Report and Recommendation in its entirety. Zhou's claim to the Defendant Funds is stricken and default judgment is entered in the Government's favor. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 10/30/2018. (Greene, Donna)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: if counsel's motion to withdraw is granted, Mr. Zhou will be expected to proceed in this action with or without new counsel. If Mr. Zhou fails to appear at the April 25th court conference, and/or if he persists in his failure to particip ate in this action, this Court will recommend to the Honorable Ann M. Donnelly, the District Judge assigned to his case, that his claim be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute. See attached for further discussion. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 4/19/2018. (Proujansky, Josh)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: The claimant's motion to dismiss the complaint 15 is denied. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 2/16/2018. (Greene, Donna)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Two Hundred Seventy-Two Thousand Dollars and No Cents ($272,000)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Hundred Seventy-Two Thousand Dollars and No Cents ($272,000)
Represented By: Duncan Patrick Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary M. Dickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?