United States Securities and Exchange Commission et al v. Platinum Management (NY) LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
United States Securities and Exchange Commission |
Defendant: |
Uri Landesman, David Levy, Joseph Mann, Mark Nordlicht, Platinum Credit Management, L.P., Platinum Management (NY) LLC, Joseph Sanfilippo, Jeffrey Shulse and Daniel Small |
Trustee: |
Richard Schmidt |
Receiver: |
Bart Schwartz |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv06848 |
Filed: |
December 19, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Dora Lizette Irizarry |
Presiding Judge: |
Vera M. Scanlon |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 25, 2018 |
Filing
417
ORDER denying 392 402 405 406 Motions to Compel payment or advancement of legal fees. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/25/2018. (Cogan, Brian)
|
September 26, 2018 |
Filing
383
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 9/25/18 denying S&W's 326 Motion for fees and expenses is DENIED. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/25/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
|
July 17, 2018 |
Filing
353
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 7/16/18 denying Non-Party Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. 342 Motion Non-party Navidea Biopharmaceuticals, Inc. seeks an order lifting the litigation stay in this receivership case so that it may implead one o f the companies in receivership in an action pending outside the receivership. Because the costs to the Receivership and resulting prejudice to other parties-in-interest outweigh the prejudice that Navidea might suffer from deferring its litigation, the motion is denied. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/16/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
|
November 21, 2017 |
Filing
285
MEMORANDUM OPINION dated 11/20/17 re: that by Order dated November 11, 2017, I granted the Receivers application to approve the retention of Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc. (Houlihan), nunc pro tunc to September 11, 2017(the Application), overruling th e opposition to the Application filed by a large group of non-insider Platinum Partners Credit Opportunities (PPCO) investors (the Objecting Investors). This Memorandum Opinion sets forth the basis for that Order. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/20/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
|
July 7, 2017 |
Filing
217
ORDER granting 42 Motion to Intervene; granting 42 Motion to Stay -- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Government's (represented by the Office of the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of New York) motion to intervene and to stay civil proceedings is granted. The SEC action is stayed pending the resolution of the criminal proceeding against the Individual Defendants. Nothing contained in this Electronic Order or the Attached Memorandum and Order is to be construed as affecting the responsibilities and actions of the Receiver in disposing of the receivership assets. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/7/2017. (Irizarry, Dora)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?