Art And Cook, Inc. v. Haber
Plaintiff: Art And Cook, Inc.
Defendant: Haber and Abraham Haber
Case Number: 1:2017cv01634
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836 (a) - Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. The Court hereby directs the Clerk of the Court to request that the United States Treasuryreturn Plaintiffs security by mailing a check in the amount of $6,500 payable to "Lazar Grunsfeld Elnadav LLP, as Attorneys for Art and Cook, Inc." to Gerry Grunsfeld, Esq., Lazar Grunsfeld Elnadav LLP 1795 Coney Island Avenue Brooklyn, New York, 11210. So Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 12/6/2017. (Almonte, Giselle)
December 5, 2017 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,500 by Art And Cook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Grunsfeld, Gerald)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each side to bear its own costs and fees. So Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 11/27/2017. (Almonte, Giselle)
November 27, 2017 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Abraham Haber (Adler, Jonathan)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the parties' November 27, 2017 stipulation #24 of dismissal with prejudice, the November 29, 2017 pre-motion conference in connection with Defendant's pre-motion letter #20 is adjourned sine die. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 11/27/2017. (Garrett, Ruby)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Court's October 3, 2017 Memorandum of Decision and Order, Plaintiff's motion #12 #13 #14 for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. See attachment for details. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 10/3/2017. (Nuni, Joshua)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court shall hold a pre-motion conference in connection with Defendant's pre-motion letter #20 on November 29, 2017, at 12:00 PM, in Courtroom 4H North. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 10/3/2017. (Nuni, Joshua)
August 7, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/23/17, before Judge Matsumoto. Court Reporter/Transcriber Angela Grant. Email address: Angela.grant207@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 8/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2017. (Grant, Angela)
May 10, 2017 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to seek leave to file a motion to dismiss filed by Art And Cook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of Injunction Hearing) (Grunsfeld, Gerald)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: In violation of this Court's individual practices, Plaintiff failed to file a response to Defendant's April 27, 2017 pre-motion letter #20 by May 4, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its response to Defendant's pre-motion letter by May 10, 2017. Should Plaintiffs fail to file their response by May 10, 2017, the Court will issue an order to show cause as to why sanctions should not be issued. Failure to abide by this Order could also result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 5/8/2017. (Fernandez, Erica)
April 27, 2017 Filing 20 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to seek leave to file a motion to dismiss by Abraham Haber. (Adler, Jonathan)
April 10, 2017 Filing 19 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on consent by Abraham Haber. (Adler, Jonathan)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Abraham Haber answer due 4/27/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/10/2017. (Vasquez, Lea)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: For reasons that shall be set forth in an upcoming Memorandum of Decision, Plaintiff's motion #12 #13 #14 for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/7/2017. (Valentin, Winnethka)
April 6, 2017 Filing 18 Letter regarding bond for #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Abraham Haber (Adler, Jonathan)
April 3, 2017 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Attorney Declaration filed by Abraham Haber. (Adler, Jonathan)
April 3, 2017 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Attorney Declaration filed by Abraham Haber. (Adler, Jonathan)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff's April 1, 2017 #15 motion to is GRANTED. Plaintiff may file Exhibits D and J to the Affidavit of Allan Ben under seal. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 4/3/2017. (Valentin, Winnethka)
April 1, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibits D & J to Plaintiff's OSC by Art And Cook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Attorney Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit Exhibit J) (Grunsfeld, Gerald)
March 31, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Art And Cook, Inc.. (Grunsfeld, Gerald)
March 31, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AFFIDAVIT OF ALLAN BEN by Art And Cook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LETTER, #2 Exhibit WEBSITE HISTORY, #3 Exhibit SCREENSHOT, #4 Exhibit SCREENSHOT, #5 Exhibit SCREENSHOT, #6 Exhibit SCREENSHOT, #7 Exhibit SCREENSHOT, #8 Exhibit SCREENSHOT) (Grunsfeld, Gerald)
March 31, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Attorney Declaration by Art And Cook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-MAIL, #2 Exhibit COMPLAINT) (Grunsfeld, Gerald)
March 31, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Adler on behalf of Abraham Haber (aty to be noticed) (Adler, Jonathan)
March 24, 2017 Filing 10 FILING FEE: $ 6,500.00, receipt number 4653112996 by Art And Cook, Inc. (Basnight, Jasmine)
March 24, 2017 Filing 9 DECLARATION re Initial Conference Hearing,,,, Minute Entry Served on Defendant by Art And Cook, Inc. (Grunsfeld, Gerald)
March 24, 2017 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #6 Order to Show Cause,, Temporary Restraining Order, re Service of Motion Papers on Defendant by Art And Cook, Inc. (Grunsfeld, Gerald)
March 24, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Art And Cook, Inc.. Abraham Haber served on 3/23/2017, answer due 4/13/2017. (Grunsfeld, Gerald)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Show Cause Hearing set for 4/5/2017 at 2:00p.m. in Courtroom 4H North before Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 3/23/2017. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra)
March 23, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Abraham Haber. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 23, 2017 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 23, 2017 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 23, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Art And Cook, Inc. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 23, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abraham Haber, filed by Art And Cook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)
March 23, 2017 FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0207-9389157 (Davis, Kimberly)
March 23, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Steven L. Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
March 23, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto: Motion Hearing held on 3/23/2017 re Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Art and Cook, Inc. Appearances for plaintiff, Gerald D. Grunsfeld, Esq.; for defendant, Abraham Haber, pro se. Arguments heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Temporary Restraining Order was issued. The terms of the TRO were reviewed in open court by the parties, who were also provided with an executed copy. The parties shall appear for a hearing before Judge DeArcy Hall on April 5, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 4H North. Plaintiff shall file a declaration of service, certifying that plaintiff was served with the Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, and related documents on March 23, 2017. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's motion by no later than April 3, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiff shall post a bond in the amount of $6500 by March 24, 2017 at 4:30 p.m. Defense counsel is directed to serve plaintiff with a copy of this minute entry and note service on the docket. (Court Reporter Angela Grant.) (Newman, Alanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Art And Cook, Inc. v. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Haber
Represented By: Jonathan L. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art And Cook, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald D. Grunsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?