Sulaymu-Bey et al v. City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Aleshia M. Sulaymu-Bey and S. Sharpe Sulaymu-Bey
Defendant: Gladys Carrion, Linda Cato, City of New York, Sasha Dawson, Health and Hospitals Corporation, John and Jane Does Police 1-4, Kings County Hospital and LUciana Michelle
Respondent: Kathy Ann Best
Case Number: 1:2017cv03563
Filed: June 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Presiding Judge: Vera M. Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. I adopt Judge Bulsara's thorough and well-reasoned Report and Recommendation in its entirety. The defendants' motion to enforce the October 11, 2019 settlement is denied. The plaintiffs' motion to rescind the settlement is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 11/16/2020. (Greene, Donna)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted in part and denied in part in accordance with the reasons set forth in this opinion. The plaintiffs' motion for judgment on the pleadings is denied. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 3/29/2019. (Greene, Donna)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: The Court grants the plaintiffs' requests to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court directs the plaintiffs to obtain counsel for their four minor children listed in the caption within 30 days from the date o f this Order. The attorney is to file a notice of appearance on the docket. If the plaintiffs fail to do so, the complaint shall be dismissed, without prejudice, as to the minor children. The adult plaintiffs' complaint shall proceed as to their claims against the defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons and the United States Marshal Service is directed to serve the following Defendants without prepayment of fees: the City of New York, the Commissioner of ACS , Gladys Carrion, Sasha Dawson, Kathy Ann Best, and Linda Cato, Nikia Williams, employees of ACS, Sergeant John Pheifer, Badge #732, Dr. Luciana Michele, Kings County Hospital, and the Health and Hospitals Corporation. The plaintiffs also sue thr ee unidentified police officers who were involved in the removal of the children on 4/25/2014. Accordingly, within 45 days from the date of this Order, the Court requests that Corporation Counsel for the City of New York ascertain the full name s of the individuals whom the plaintiffs have identified as police officers John and Jane Doe # 2-4, and provide the addresses where these individuals can be served. The plaintiffs, who have not yet provided the Court with the defendants' ad dresses, are directed to submit a letter to the Clerk of Court with the addresses for the remaining defendants within 14 days from the date of this order in order to effect service of process. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Order to the plaintiffs and to the Corporation Counsel for the City of New York, Special Federal Litigation Division. The case is referred to the Honorable Vera M. Scanlon, United States Magistrate Judge, for pretrial supervision. The Court certifies purs uant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. SO ORDERED by Judge Ann M Donnelly, on 8/2/2017. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sulaymu-Bey et al v. City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kathy Ann Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys Carrion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Cato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sasha Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health and Hospitals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does Police 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings County Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUciana Michelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleshia M. Sulaymu-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Sharpe Sulaymu-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?