Rodney v. Yale Realty LLC

Plaintiff: Abigail Rodney
Defendant: Yale Realty LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv03921
Filed: June 29, 2017
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Brooklyn Office
Referring Judge: Lois Bloom
Presiding Judge: Brian M. Cogan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Bloom. The case is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(f) and 37(b)(2)(A). ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/5/2017 ) *Forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann)
September 12, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 9/12/17 denying 7 Motion for Order to Show Cause. To the extent plaintiffs daughter seeks a stay of the state court proceedings, the motion is denied. If plaintiffs daughter wishes to continue the prosecution of this action, her counsel is granted leave to file an amended complaint within 14 days. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/12/2017 ) c/m (Guzzi, Roseann)
July 5, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: The Court grants plaintiff's 2 request to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 for the purpose of this Order. The claims alleged on behalf of plaintiff's daughter Annal iese Austin are dismissed without prejudice with leave to re-file should plaintiff obtain counsel to represent her daughter. However, the complaint shall proceed as to plaintiff Abigail Rodney. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons an d the United States Marshal Service is directed to serve the summons, the complaint, and this Order on the defendant without prepayment of fees. The case is referred to the Honorable Lois Bloom, United States Magistrate Judge, for pretrial supervi sion. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian M. Cogan, on 7/5/2017. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodney v. Yale Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Rodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?