Guaman et al v. Patterson et al
Plaintiff: Julio Guaman and Miriam Mizhquiri
Defendant: Godfrey Patterson, AA Truck Renting Corp. and I IRISEN LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv06116
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Carol Bagley Amon
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for those below listed parties to the above-entitled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above-entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued with prejudice as against those defendants whose attorneys of record are listed below, without costs to either party as against the other. This stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 1/25/2019. (Fernandez, Erica)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: re #23 Stipulation of Dismissal -- In light of the parties' stipulation of dismissal, all scheduled conferences before me are cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/28/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
January 25, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal by AA Truck Renting Corp., I Irisen LLC, Godfrey Patterson (Belmont, Allyson)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted; the telephone conference previously scheduled for January 23, 2019, is rescheduled for January 29, 2019, at 12:30 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/22/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Adjourn Conference Letter to Hon. James Orenstein re: adjournment of telephone conference on 1.23.19 by I Irisen LLC, Godfrey Patterson. (Belmont, Allyson)
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/20/2018, Settlement Conference held on 12/20/2018. Scheduling: The next telephone conference will be held on January 23, 2019, at 12:30 p.m. Summary: The parties agreed to settle the case. If they file a stipulation of dismissal before the next conference scheduled above, I will cancel it; otherwise I respectfully direct the plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the telephone conference call. (Orenstein, James)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs' expert reports to be completed by: September 6, 2018. Defendants' expert reports to be completed by: November 9, 2018. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: November 9, 2018. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): December 20, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. Dispositive motion process started by: January 3, 2019. Joint pretrial order due by: January 31, 2019. The deadlines in this order will be enforced, and in light of the history of this case, will be modified only upon a timely showing of extraordinary circumstances. SEE ATTACHED ORDER Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/5/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery -- The application is granted. I will enter a separate amended scheduling order reflecting the new deadlines. If plaintiff Guaman again fails to appear for his medical examination, I will order him to show cause why he should not be precluded from offering any evidence of injury at trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/5/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
September 4, 2018 Filing 19 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to extend expert discovery cut-off date to reschedule Plaintiff Guamans Rule 35 medical examination by AA Truck Renting Corp., I Irisen LLC, Godfrey Patterson. (Catalano, Thomas)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #18 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted. The conference previously scheduled for May 3, 2018 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 5/2/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
May 2, 2018 Filing 18 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference for May 3, 2018 because the deposition of Defendants was held today by AA Truck Renting Corp., I Irisen LLC, Godfrey Patterson. (Catalano, Thomas)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact discovery to be completed by: August 6, 2018. Plaintiffs' expert reports to be completed by: September 6, 2018. Defendants' expert reports to be completed by: October 9, 2018. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: October 9, 2018. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): October 17, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: October 31, 2018. Joint pretrial order due by: December 5, 2018. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/26/2018. (Orenstein, James)
April 26, 2018 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Status Conference held on 4/26/2018. SCHEDULING: (1) The next status conference will be held on May 3, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on October 17, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. SUMMARY: (1) The parties do not know whether defendant Patterson will appear for his scheduled deposition tomorrow because he has not responded to his counsel's communications. If the parties report that the defendant has completed his deposition, I will cancel the conference scheduled above; otherwise, defendant Patterson must appear in person along with all counsel. (2) I granted the parties' request to extend all remaining pretrial deadlines by 60 days. I will enter an amended case management and scheduling order accordingly, but I do not anticipate approving further delay for any reason. (Orenstein, James)
April 25, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Catalano on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Catalano, Thomas)
April 24, 2018 Filing 14 Letter Case Status Update by Julio Guaman, Miriam Mizhquiri (Jodre, Jordan)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER -- Due to a conflict in the court's calendar, the status conference previously scheduled for April 23, 2018 is rescheduled for April 26, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/18/2018. (Drake, Shaw)
April 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Payne on behalf of AA Truck Renting Corp., I Irisen LLC, Godfrey Patterson (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service of Notice of Appearance) (Payne, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: December 1, 2017. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: January 30, 2018. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: February 16, 2018. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): April 23, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by: June 6, 2018. Plaintiffs' expert reports to be completed by: July 6, 2018. Defendants' expert reports to be completed by: August 6, 2018. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: August 6, 2018. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): August 17, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: August 31, 2018. Joint pretrial order due by: October 5, 2018. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/1/2017. (Orenstein, James)
December 1, 2017 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/1/2017. SCHEDULING: (1) The next status conference will be held on April 23, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on August 17, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. SUMMARY: I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. (Orenstein, James)
November 30, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Brian Bromfeld on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Bromfeld, Jeffrey)
November 30, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Adam Jodre on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Jodre, Jordan)
November 29, 2017 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Initial Conference Questionnaire (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment to the Initial Conference Questionnaire) (Belmont, Allyson)
November 29, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Jacqueline Leader on behalf of AA Truck Renting Corp., I Irisen LLC, Godfrey Patterson (aty to be noticed) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service of Notice of Appearance) (Leader, Robyn)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, December 1, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than November 29, 2017, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 10/26/2017. (Guy, Alicia)
October 20, 2017 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 20, 2017 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 20, 2017 Case Reassigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 20, 2017 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, by AA Truck Renting Corp., I IRISEN LLC, Godfrey Patterson (Belmont, Allyson)
October 20, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by I IRISEN LLC identifying Corporate Parent I IRISEN LLC for I IRISEN LLC. (Belmont, Allyson)
October 20, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AA Truck Renting Corp., I IRISEN LLC, Godfrey Patterson from Supreme Court, Kings County, case number 503612/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9919256) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Belmont, Allyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guaman et al v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godfrey Patterson
Represented By: Allyson B. Belmont
Represented By: Thomas A. Catalano
Represented By: Robyn Jacqueline Leader
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AA Truck Renting Corp.
Represented By: Allyson B. Belmont
Represented By: Thomas A. Catalano
Represented By: Robyn Jacqueline Leader
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I IRISEN LLC
Represented By: Allyson B. Belmont
Represented By: Thomas A. Catalano
Represented By: Robyn Jacqueline Leader
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Guaman
Represented By: Nicholas Elefterakis
Represented By: Jordan Adam Jodre
Represented By: Jeffrey Brian Bromfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Mizhquiri
Represented By: Nicholas Elefterakis
Represented By: Jordan Adam Jodre
Represented By: Jeffrey Brian Bromfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?