McIver v. New York City Police Department et al
Plaintiff: |
Altariq G. McIver |
Defendant: |
New York City Police Department and Police Officer Thomas Redmond |
Case Number: |
1:2018cv00333 |
Filed: |
January 16, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of New York |
Office: |
Brooklyn Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Lois Bloom |
Presiding Judge: |
Brian M. Cogan |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 19, 2020 |
Filing
56
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to 55 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Bloom. Plaintiff has failed to file any objections to Judge Bloom's Report and Recommendation. The Court has reviewed it and finds ample cause for dismissal. The R&R is therefore adopted as the Order of this Court and the case is dismissed. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/19/2020 ) *forwarded for jgm. Copy will be mailed to plaintiff w/jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann)
|
September 5, 2018 |
Filing
16
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's motions to proceed in forma pauperis and to reopen the case 9 are granted. This Court's 5 Order of 3/19/2018 and the Clerk's 6 Judgment of 3/22/2018 are vacated. All of the claims in plaintiff's complaint against the NYPD are dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). No summons shall issue against the NYPD. Plaintiff's claims may proceed against the named police officer. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to issue a summons for Officer Thomas Redmond of the 67th Police Precinct and directs the United States Marshals Service to serve the complaint and the summons on the defendant. T he Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order and the complaint to the New York City Law Department and to plaintiff. The Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for pretrial supervision. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian M. Cogan, on 9/5/2018. C/mailed. (Plaintiff's 9 Motions are granted; Party: New York City Police Department terminated.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?