L&M Bus Corp. et al v. Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York

Plaintiff: 21st Avenue Transportation, Co., Inc., Alina Services Corp., B&F Skilled Inc., GVC Ltd., Happy Child Transportations LLC, Happy Day Transit Inc., Iridium Services Corp., L&M Bus Corp., Leesel Transportation Corp., Mar-Can Tranport Co., Inc., Montauk Student Transport LLC, Penny Transportation, Inc., Phillip Bus Corp., Selby Transportation Corp., Smart Pick, Inc., Van Trans LLC and Y&M Transit Corp.
Defendant: Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
Amicus: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 553, Local 1181-1061, Amalgamated Transit Union, AFL-CIO, Local 917, International Brotherhood of Teamsters and Reliant Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01902
Filed: March 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Nicholas G. Garaufis
Referring Judge: Steven M. Gold
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction (Dkt. 1) is DENIED. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/25/2018. (Panek, Gabriel)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, the court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Reliant's Motion for Intervention (Dkt. 20) and Local 1181's Motion for Intervention (Dkt. 22). The court GRANTS Reliant and Local 1181 leave to participate in the case as amici curiae in support of the DOE and notes that both amicus briefs are due on April 17, 2018. (See Apr. 6, 2018, Order.) The clerk of court is respectfully DIRECTED to place Reliant and Local 1181 on the electronic docket for this case. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/12/2018. (Panek, Gabriel)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, For the foregoing reasons, the Bus Companies' motion for a temporary restraining order (Dkt. 1) is DENIED. The parties are reminded that the DOE's supplemental memorandum in opposition is due on April 10, 2018, and th at the Bus Companies' reply memorandum, if any, is due on April 13, 2018. The court will permit the Bus Companies to submit a reply memorandum of up to fifteen pages in length, not including appendices or attachments. Cf Indiv. R. III(C). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/5/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L&M Bus Corp. et al v. Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 21st Avenue Transportation, Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alina Services Corp.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&F Skilled Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GVC Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Happy Child Transportations LLC
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Happy Day Transit Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iridium Services Corp.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L&M Bus Corp.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leesel Transportation Corp.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mar-Can Tranport Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montauk Student Transport LLC
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Bus Corp.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selby Transportation Corp.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smart Pick, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Trans LLC
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y&M Transit Corp.
Represented By: Andrew E. Graw
Represented By: Robert J. Kipnees
Represented By: Robert J Kipnees
Represented By: Kathryn S Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
Represented By: Michael Friel Fleming
Represented By: Melissa D. Hill
Represented By: Hanna Elizabeth Martin
Represented By: David Alan McManus
Represented By: Laura C Rowntree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local 553
Represented By: Jae W. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Local 1181-1061, Amalgamated Transit Union, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Richard A. Brook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Local 917, International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Paul Kevin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Reliant Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Saltarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?