Luxclub, Inc. v. DGL Group Ltd.
Plaintiff: Luxclub, Inc.
Defendant: Victor Sardar, Ezra Zaafarani, Solomon Kohl, Elie Wahba, DGL Group LTD and Mark Nakash
Case Number: 1:2018cv04741
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Margo K Brodie
Referring Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on December 17, 2018 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N504 in the North Wing. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than December 14th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/19/2018. (Vasquez, Lea)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to DGL Group LTD, Solomon Kohl, Mark Nakash, Victor Sardar, Elie Wahba, Ezra Zaafarani. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Luxclub, Inc. (Sofield, Thomas)
August 22, 2018 NOTICE :The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without an updated and completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to utilize the Civil Cover Sheet on our website and forward a completed (2 Page Form)Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions ***INCLUDING THE CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY section on the second page***. Please use the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (Davis, Kimberly)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory Rosenbaum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Rosenbaum, Cory)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Luxclub, Inc. (Sofield, Thomas)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Luxclub, Inc. (Sofield, Thomas)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10674244 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Luxclub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Abraham Mosseri) (Sofield, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luxclub, Inc. v. DGL Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Sardar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezra Zaafarani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elie Wahba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGL Group LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Nakash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luxclub, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Robert Sofield
Represented By: Cory Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?